Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Clark VS Public Storage
On October 31, 2017 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Other PI/PD/WD Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 months and 28 days
Time To Trial
4 months and 13 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) |
|
March 15, 2018 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Referred to Court Mediation | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 06/13/2018 09:00 AM D- 16 | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial 02/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 16 | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Public Storage Filed |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Jeffrey B. Clark Filed |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Public Storage |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Public Storage Filed |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Public Storage Filed |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Notice of Case Management Order Filed |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 03/15/2018 09:00 AM D- 16 |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeffrey B. Clark |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed |
|