Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Williams VS Jenkins
On August 19, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Tara M. Desautels presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Unlawful Detainer
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
3 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Preston Jenkins |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Release of Funds Issued and Filed |
|
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Preston Jenkins |
|
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
October 02, 2014 |
Complaint Unlawful Detainer
Judge: Tara M. Desautels |
||
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Judgment for Plaintiff | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 10/02/2014 01:30 PM D- 109 |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Preston Jenkins Filed |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Preston Jenkins |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Preston Jenkins | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Preston Jenkins Granted | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Elizabeth Ann Williams |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed |
|