Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Huang VS Chui
On August 13, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Winifred Younge Smith presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Evelio Grillo;Category
Unlawful Detainer
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 6 days
Time To Trial
4 months and 6 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2014 |
Complaint Unlawful Detainer
Judge: Winifred Y. Smith |
||
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial 12/19/2014 01:30 PM D- 21 |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Representation of Respondent Filed for Cicilia Chui |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Master Jury Trial Called and Completed |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed |
|
December 12, 2014 |
Complaint Unlawful Detainer
Judge: Winifred Y. Smith |
||
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Representation of Respondent Filed for Cicilia Chui |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Master Jury Trial Called and Continued |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Master Jury Trial dept: 1 date: 12/19/2014 time: 08:45 AM |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Additional Court Fees As to Cicilia Chui Granted | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 12/04/2014 09:00 AM D- 109 | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Master Jury Trial 12/12/2014 08:45 AM D- 1 |
|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant |
|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Additional Court Fees Filed for Cicilia Chui | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 12/04/2014 09:00 AM D- 109 |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Cicilia Chui |
|
October 21, 2014 |
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment - Granted As to PARTY |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibits in Support of Motion to Vacate Judgment |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Cicilia Chui Granted | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Filed |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 10/21/2014 01:30 PM D- 14 |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Release of Funds Issued and Filed |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Cicilia Chui | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Hearing Confirmed for 10/21/2014 01:30 PM D- | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Filed for Debtor |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Cicilia Chui |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Judgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169/Money Pending Granted | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Cicilia Chui Filed |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cicilia Chui Filed |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shou Kun Huang |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed |
|