Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sanchez VS City of Oakland - Port of Oakland
On August 05, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Frank Roesch presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Other PI/PD/WD Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 16 days
Time To Trial
5 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/25/2016 09:01 AM D- 24 | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration RE OSC Filed |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 11/20/2015 09:01 AM D- 24 | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 01/08/2016 09:01 AM D- 24 |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed for Port of Oakland |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 02/01/2016 09:00 AM D- 24 | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 11/13/2015 09:01 AM D- 24 | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2016 10:00 AM D- 24 | |
November 13, 2015 |
Status re: ADR
Judge: Frank Roesch |
||
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 11/20/2015 09:01 AM D- 24 | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Port of Oakland Filed |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Maria Sanchez Filed |
|
June 10, 2015 |
Continuance of Trial Date
Judge: Frank Roesch |
||
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte 06/10/2015 04:00 PM D- 24 |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 11/13/2015 09:01 AM D- 24 | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Sanchez |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 02/01/2016 09:00 AM D- 24 | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Continuance of Trial Date Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 06/10/2015 time: 04:00 PM | |
January 21, 2015 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Frank Roesch |
||
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Referred to Private Mediation | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 07/24/2015 10:00 AM D- 24 | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial 08/03/2015 09:00 AM D- 24 | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party City of Oakland Filed |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal As to Defendant: City of Oakland Entered | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Maria Sanchez Filed |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Port of Oakland Filed |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Port of Oakland |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Proof of Service on Complaint |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/21/2015 09:00 AM D- 24 |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2014 09:00 AM D- 24 |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maria Sanchez |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|