Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: Marcella Rodriguez-Perez
On August 05, 2014 a civil case was filed by Rodriguez-Perez, Marcella Renee, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Change of Name
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Case Duration
4 months
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Completed |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Granted |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing name Filed |
|
November 14, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Uncontested dept: 14 date: 12/05/2014 time: 09:30 AM | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 11/14/2014 09:30 AM D- 14 |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication As to Marcella Renee Rodriguez-Perez Filed |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Marcella Renee Rodriguez-Perez Granted | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested 11/14/2014 09:30 AM D- 31 | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marcella Renee Rodriguez-Perez |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Marcella Renee Rodriguez-Perez |