Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: Jose Vega
On August 05, 2014 a civil case was filed by Vega, Jose Armando Tobar, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Change of Name
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Case Duration
3 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing name Filed |
|
November 10, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing name Filed |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Granted |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Completed |
|
November 07, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled |
|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Uncontested dept: 14 date: 11/10/2014 time: 09:30 AM | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 11/07/2014 09:30 AM D- 14 |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Jose Armando Tobar Vega | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Case is Confidential until 08/05/2015 | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Jose Armando Tobar Vega Granted | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested 11/07/2014 09:30 AM D- 31 |