Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: Milos Drezgic
On January 27, 2012 a civil case was filed by Drezgic, Sara, Drezgic, Milos, and Drezgic, Marija, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 27, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Change of Name
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Case Duration
9 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2012 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Decree Changing name Filed |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Completed |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Granted |
|
May 25, 2012 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Uncontested dept: 31 date: 11/16/2012 time: 09:30 AM | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter re Hearing Date for Petition Filed |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication As to Milos Drezgic, Marija Drezgic, Sara Drezgic Filed |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Milos Drezgic Granted | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested 05/25/2012 09:30 AM D- 31 | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name Filed |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Milos Drezgic |