Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torrence, Cheryl Denise, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Page, Victor John, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Trina Thompson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2013 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time531 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail - CLETS on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Victor Jo | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (CLETS) on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Victor J | |
July 19, 2013 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Trina Thompson |
||
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing Granted | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (CLETS) on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Victor J | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Signed TRO Filed | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 07/19/2013 08:31 AM D- 2 | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.