Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CASTRO VS ROSENBERG
A Dissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children case was filed by Castro, Ruben, Jr., against Rosenberg, Milan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Glennon, Donald P., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 28, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
5 years, 6 months and 19 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 3 months and 18 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY |
|
September 17, 2018 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY (CERTIFIED COPY OF STATUS ONLY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES PROVIDED. |
|
December 04, 2017 | hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY (CERTIFIED COPY OF STATUS ONLY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES PROVIDED. |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 10/8/15 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
November 30, 2017 | hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 10/8/15 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY |
|
November 17, 2017 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: LESLIE ANDERSON New Attorney: IN PRO PER |
|
April 24, 2017 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: LESLIE ANDERSON New Attorney: IN PRO PER |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objections objection letter to OAH for hearing date 1-19-17 |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 1/19/17 Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 29, 2017 | hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 1/19/17 Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 29, 2017 | hearing |
Objections objection letter to OAH for hearing date 1-19-17 |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY |
|
March 28, 2017 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY |
|
January 19, 2017 | hearing | Exhibit(s) List | |
January 19, 2017 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 18, 2017 | hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
January 11, 2017 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
December 13, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
December 07, 2016 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
November 03, 2016 | hearing | Affidavit | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Order for production of records | |
November 03, 2016 | hearing | Order for production of records | |
November 02, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
October 28, 2016 | hearing | Subpoenaed Records Received | |
October 28, 2016 | hearing |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
October 26, 2016 | hearing | Mother Failed to Appear for Mediation | |
October 26, 2016 | hearing | Mediation Appointment | |
October 05, 2016 | hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
October 03, 2016 | hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
September 30, 2016 | hearing | Request for Order (FL-300) | |
September 30, 2016 | hearing |
Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305)
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
September 30, 2016 | hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
September 29, 2016 | hearing | Supplemental Declaration | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Compliance Hearing Date: 09/30/16 Hearing Time: 1:15PM Hearing Department/Division: BR |
|
September 29, 2016 | hearing |
Ex Parte Compliance Hearing Date: 09/30/16 Hearing Time: 1:15PM Hearing Department/Division: BR |
|
May 23, 2016 | hearing |
Findings and Orders
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
April 13, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 09, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF COMPLETION OF ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF |
|
February 18, 2016 | hearing |
Certificate of Compliance SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF COMPLETION OF ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF |
|
February 17, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Legacy Progress Report/Completion for 52 Week Domestic Violence Program |
|
February 10, 2016 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Legacy Progress Report/Completion for 52 Week Domestic Violence Program |
|
February 03, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders Findings & order after hearing for 10/28/15 Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 29, 2016 | hearing |
Findings and Orders Findings & order after hearing for 10/28/15 Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 20, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
January 20, 2016 | hearing | Mediation Appointment | |
January 20, 2016 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
January 19, 2016 | hearing |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
December 18, 2015 | hearing | Proof of Service | |
December 17, 2015 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
December 15, 2015 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) Order Shortening Time Request denied |
|
December 14, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Order (FL-300) Order Shortening Time Request denied |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Request for Order |
|
December 11, 2015 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Request for Order |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Legacy Progress Report for 52 Week Domestic Violence Program |
|
December 02, 2015 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Legacy Progress Report for 52 Week Domestic Violence Program |
|
October 28, 2015 | hearing | Mediation Appointment | |
October 28, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 08, 2015 | hearing | Exhibit(s) List | |
October 08, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 07, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
October 02, 2015 | hearing |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report Failure to Appear by Father |
|
September 30, 2015 | hearing | Mediation Appointment | |
September 30, 2015 | hearing |
Mediation Report Failure to Appear by Father |
|
September 29, 2015 | hearing | Witness List (FL-321) | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt Subpoenaed records received from Immanuel Child Development Center |
|
September 23, 2015 | hearing |
Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt Subpoenaed records received from Immanuel Child Development Center |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Personal Service on 9/12/15 |
|
September 14, 2015 | hearing |
Proof of Service by Personal Service on 9/12/15 |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) Re: Modify CC/ V/ CS/ Attorney Fees and Costs Filed 9/9/15. Mediation set for 9/30/15 at 10:30 am |
|
September 09, 2015 | hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
September 09, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) Re: Modify CC/ V/ CS/ Attorney Fees and Costs Filed 9/9/15. Mediation set for 9/30/15 at 10:30 am |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Compliance Hearing Date: 9/9/15 Hearing Time: 1:15 pm Hearing Department/Division: BR |
|
September 08, 2015 | hearing | Ex Parte Application / Petition | |
September 08, 2015 | hearing |
Ex Parte Compliance Hearing Date: 9/9/15 Hearing Time: 1:15 pm Hearing Department/Division: BR |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service service date 8/4/15 |
|
August 05, 2015 | hearing |
Proof of Service service date 8/4/15 |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Report Re Batterers Treatment Program Petitioner's CLIENT Progress Report |
|
May 26, 2015 | hearing |
Report Re Batterers Treatment Program Petitioner's CLIENT Progress Report |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order TO SET HOLIDAY VISITATION SCHEDULE AND CS PAYMENTS |
|
April 14, 2015 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order TO SET HOLIDAY VISITATION SCHEDULE AND CS PAYMENTS |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
172E Pmt: Family Law Motion-No Hearing GC 70677(C) Amount of $20.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 13245. Receipt #833064 for amount of $20.00. |
|
April 09, 2015 | hearing |
172E Pmt: Family Law Motion-No Hearing GC 70677(C) Amount of $20.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 13245. Receipt #833064 for amount of $20.00. |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Document Image |
|
April 07, 2015 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Document Image |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders from hearing on 12/17/14 |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders for contempt hearing on 12/10/14 & 12/17/14 |
|
March 23, 2015 | hearing |
Findings and Orders from hearing on 12/17/14 |
|
March 23, 2015 | hearing |
Findings and Orders for contempt hearing on 12/10/14 & 12/17/14 |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NPCTP100 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH PHYLLIS M HIX. RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS GRANTED. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
4110 OSC Re Contempt (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
March 11, 2015 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 11, 2015 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Petitioner)
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 11, 2015 | hearing |
NPCTP100 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH PHYLLIS M HIX. RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS GRANTED. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 11, 2015 | hearing |
4110 OSC Re Contempt (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated duplicate ~ calid=2774272 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4110, CourtDate:03/11/2015, Courtroom:BR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:56, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DPG, SystemDate:2/3/2015 2:28:28 PM |
|
February 03, 2015 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated duplicate ~ calid=2774272 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4110, CourtDate:03/11/2015, Courtroom:BR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:56, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DPG, SystemDate:2/3/2015 2:28:28 PM |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NPCTP100 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MR. STEIN REPRESENTS TO THE COURT HIS CLIENT IS UNABLE TO RETAIN HIM FOR THE CONTEMPT MATTER AND IS REQUESTS A COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR MS. ROSENBERG. MILAN ROSENBERG IS ADVISED OF HIS/HER CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS. THE COURT INFORMS RESPONDENT A CIVIL CONTEMPT ACTION IS A QUASI-CRIMINAL MATTER WITH POTENTIAL JAIL TIME IF THE ORDERS WERE WILLFULLY VIOLATED; 5 DAYS JAIL FOR EVERY PROVEN VIOLATION. THE COURT CAN APPOINT AN ATTORNEY TO HER FOR ALL STAGES OF THE PROCEEDINGS. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) ALL COUNTS. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT QUALIFIES FOR COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL. THE COURT APPOINTS COUNSEL PHYLLIS M HIX TO REPRESENT MILAN ROSENBERG CAUSE CONTINUED TO 3/11/15 @ 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 12/18/14. THE RESPONDENT ENTERS A GENERAL TIME WAIVER. MILAN ROSENBERG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 3/11/15 AT 9:00 AM. THE MATTER IS TRAILED TO ALLOW THE CLERK TO CONTACT MS. HIX FOR HER AVAILABILITY ON FOR THE TIME AND DATE SET FOR HEARING. ;THE MATTER IS RECALLED AFTER THE LUNCH BREAK. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: MS. HIX IS AVAILABLE FOR THE HEARING DATE. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE THE RESPONDENT WITH MS. HIX'S CONTACT INFORMATION AND FORWARD THE NECESSARY PAPERWORK RE: CONTEMPT TO MS. HIX. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
4106 Order to Show Cause (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
January 28, 2015 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Petitioner
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 28, 2015 | hearing |
NPCTP100 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MR. STEIN REPRESENTS TO THE COURT HIS CLIENT IS UNABLE TO RETAIN HIM FOR THE CONTEMPT MATTER AND IS REQUESTS A COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR MS. ROSENBERG. MILAN ROSENBERG IS ADVISED OF HIS/HER CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS. THE COURT INFORMS RESPONDENT A CIVIL CONTEMPT ACTION IS A QUASI-CRIMINAL MATTER WITH POTENTIAL JAIL TIME IF THE ORDERS WERE WILLFULLY VIOLATED; 5 DAYS JAIL FOR EVERY PROVEN VIOLATION. THE COURT CAN APPOINT AN ATTORNEY TO HER FOR ALL STAGES OF THE PROCEEDINGS. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) ALL COUNTS. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT QUALIFIES FOR COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL. THE COURT APPOINTS COUNSEL PHYLLIS M HIX TO REPRESENT MILAN ROSENBERG CAUSE CONTINUED TO 3/11/15 @ 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 12/18/14. THE RESPONDENT ENTERS A GENERAL TIME WAIVER. MILAN ROSENBERG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 3/11/15 AT 9:00 AM. THE MATTER IS TRAILED TO ALLOW THE CLERK TO CONTACT MS. HIX FOR HER AVAILABILITY ON FOR THE TIME AND DATE SET FOR HEARING. ;THE MATTER IS RECALLED AFTER THE LUNCH BREAK. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: MS. HIX IS AVAILABLE FOR THE HEARING DATE. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE THE RESPONDENT WITH MS. HIX'S CONTACT INFORMATION AND FORWARD THE NECESSARY PAPERWORK RE: CONTEMPT TO MS. HIX. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 28, 2015 | hearing |
4106 Order to Show Cause (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing VOLUME #2 CLOSED ON 1/23/15 FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 1/3/14 AND 4/2/14. VOLUME #3 OPENED FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BEGINNING 4/3/14. |
|
January 23, 2015 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing VOLUME #2 CLOSED ON 1/23/15 FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 1/3/14 AND 4/2/14. VOLUME #3 OPENED FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BEGINNING 4/3/14. |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF ENROLLMENT IN DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PROGRAM AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF SAME ON OPPOSING COUNSEL |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice LEGACY BEHAVIORAL SERVICES INC. REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY/POLICE REPORT |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing CLIENT ENROLLMENT VERIFICATION FOR 52 WEEK DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PROGRAM |
|
January 12, 2015 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice LEGACY BEHAVIORAL SERVICES INC. REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY/POLICE REPORT |
|
January 12, 2015 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF ENROLLMENT IN DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PROGRAM AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF SAME ON OPPOSING COUNSEL |
|
January 12, 2015 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing CLIENT ENROLLMENT VERIFICATION FOR 52 WEEK DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PROGRAM |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 12/24/14 |
|
December 29, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 12/24/14 |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt PETITIONERS |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONERS, check no(s) 9056. Receipt #814700 for amount of $90.00. |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONERS, check no(s) 9056. Receipt #814700 for amount of $90.00. |
|
December 18, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt PETITIONERS |
|
December 18, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONERS, check no(s) 9056. Receipt #814700 for amount of $90.00. |
|
December 18, 2014 | hearing |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONERS, check no(s) 9056. Receipt #814700 for amount of $90.00. |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: SENTENCING OF THE PETITIONER FROM RESPONDENT'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 10/15/14 RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 10/14/14. REVIEW RE: PROOF OF COMPLIANCE/COMPLETION OF ENROLLMENT IN 16 HOURS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT FROM CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT WAYNE SILVA, DONALD ROSENBERG COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE MATTERS BEFORE THE COURT TODAY MS. ANDERSON INFORMS THE COURT SHE IS FILING CONTEMPT AGAINST THE RESPONDENT. MOTION FOR EXCLUDING WITNESSES IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS WHEN THE FINDING OF CONTEMPT WAS MADE AND THE TIMING OF PETITIONER'S COMMENTS THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COURT SHALL BE IN RECESS SO THE CLERK MAY LISTEN TO THE RECORDING TO DETERMINE IF THE PETITIONERS COMMENT WAS MADE BEFORE OR AFTER THE COURT FOUND HIM GUILTY OF CONTEMPT. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS SENTENCING OPTIONS MOTION FOR WITHDRAWING THE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS TO THE CONTEMPT AND REQUEST FOR ORDER IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES ARGUE THE MATTER FOR SENTENCING THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: THIS COURT PREVIOUSLY FOUND THE RESPONDENT IN CONTEMPT OF COURT ON 5/22/14. THE RESPONDENT WAS ORDERED TO TAKE 16 HOURS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT. THE MATTER WAS CONTINUED TO TODAY FOR PROOF OF COMPLIANCE AND POSSIBLE DISMISSAL IF THE PETITIONER COMPLIED WITH THE COURT'S ORDER'S. HOWEVER BEFORE THAT COULD HAPPEN THE RESPONDENT FILED ANOTHER CONTEMPT AGAINST THE PETITIONER ON 10/15/14 AND THIS COURT FOUND THE PETITIONER GUILTY ON TWO COUNT'S OF CONTEMPT ON 12/3/14. THEN RIGHT AFTER THE COURT MADE FINDINGS OF GUILT AND WHILE COURT WAS IN RECESS THE PETITIONER GOES AND MAKES COMMENTS TO HARASS THE RESPONDENT AGAIN. THE SENTENCING BEFORE THE COURT TODAY DEVELOPED FROM CONDUCT BY THE PETITIONER THAT ALARMED THE RESPONDENT. THE PETITIONER POSTED ITEMS FROM A GROUP CALLED "SINGLE DADS/FIGHTING FATHER" TO HIS FACEBOOK WALL AND SENT THE RESPONDENT A TEXT MESSAGE WITH AN ARTICLE ABOUT CHILDREN BEING ABDUCTED. THE CONTEXT OF THE TEXT MESSAGE AND POSTS WHERE AGGRESSIVE AND THIS COURT BELIEVES THEY WHERE INTENDED TO SCARE AND SHOCK THE RESPONDENT. IT'S VERY CLEAR TO THIS COURT THAT THE PETITIONER DISLIKE'S THE RESPONDENT AND DOES NOT CARE HOW HIS ACTIONS AFFECT HER. THIS COURT FINDS THE PETITIONER'S BEHAVIOR OFFENSE AND BELIEVES HIS BEHAVIOR IS A FORM OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON THE COURT'S FINDINGS THE PETITIONER SHALL ENROLL IN A 52 WEEK BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM. THE PETITIONER SHALL PROVIDE MR. STEIN WITH PROOF OF ENROLLMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM TODAY AND PROOF OF COMPLIANCE EVERY 90 DAYS THEREAFTER UNTIL THE CLASS IS COMPLETED. THE PETITIONER IS FURTHER SENTENCED TO 5 DAYS IN JAIL AS TO COUNT 1 AND 5 DAYS IN JAIL AS TO COUNT 2, FOR A TOTAL OF 10 DAYS. COUNT ONE AND COUNT TWO SHALL BE SERVED CONSECUTIVE. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS STAY DATE MOTION FOR STAY DATE TOWARDS THE END OF JANUARY IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITIONER'S STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCE OF JAIL IS STAYED UNTIL FRIDAY JANUARY 30, 2015 AT 5:45PM. THE PETITIONER SHALL SURRENDER AT THE MAIN JAIL IN BAKERSFIELD. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS PETITIONER'S PROOF OF COMPLIANCE WITH 16 HOURS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THIS COURT HAS NOT BEEN PRESENTED WITH ANY SIGNIFICANT CHANGE IN CIRCUMSTANCES. THE RESPONDENT IS REQUESTING THAT THE PETITIONER HAVE SUPERVISED VISITATION HOWEVER NO EVIDENCE HAS BEEN PRESENTED THAT THE CHILD IS BEING ABUSED , THEREFORE THE REQUEST FOR A CHANGE IN VISITATION IS DENIED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PREVIOUS ORDER FOR FIFTEEN MINUTE TELEPHONE CALLS SHALL BE CHANGED; THE NEW ORDER SHALL FOR TEN MINUTES OF UNMONITORED PHONE CONTACT. MR. STEIN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Document Image |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
December 17, 2014 | hearing |
Review
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. |
|
December 17, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: SENTENCING OF THE PETITIONER FROM RESPONDENT'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 10/15/14 RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 10/14/14. REVIEW RE: PROOF OF COMPLIANCE/COMPLETION OF ENROLLMENT IN 16 HOURS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT FROM CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT WAYNE SILVA, DONALD ROSENBERG COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE MATTERS BEFORE THE COURT TODAY MS. ANDERSON INFORMS THE COURT SHE IS FILING CONTEMPT AGAINST THE RESPONDENT. MOTION FOR EXCLUDING WITNESSES IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS WHEN THE FINDING OF CONTEMPT WAS MADE AND THE TIMING OF PETITIONER'S COMMENTS THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COURT SHALL BE IN RECESS SO THE CLERK MAY LISTEN TO THE RECORDING TO DETERMINE IF THE PETITIONERS COMMENT WAS MADE BEFORE OR AFTER THE COURT FOUND HIM GUILTY OF CONTEMPT. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS SENTENCING OPTIONS MOTION FOR WITHDRAWING THE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS TO THE CONTEMPT AND REQUEST FOR ORDER IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES ARGUE THE MATTER FOR SENTENCING THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: THIS COURT PREVIOUSLY FOUND THE RESPONDENT IN CONTEMPT OF COURT ON 5/22/14. THE RESPONDENT WAS ORDERED TO TAKE 16 HOURS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT. THE MATTER WAS CONTINUED TO TODAY FOR PROOF OF COMPLIANCE AND POSSIBLE DISMISSAL IF THE PETITIONER COMPLIED WITH THE COURT'S ORDER'S. HOWEVER BEFORE THAT COULD HAPPEN THE RESPONDENT FILED ANOTHER CONTEMPT AGAINST THE PETITIONER ON 10/15/14 AND THIS COURT FOUND THE PETITIONER GUILTY ON TWO COUNT'S OF CONTEMPT ON 12/3/14. THEN RIGHT AFTER THE COURT MADE FINDINGS OF GUILT AND WHILE COURT WAS IN RECESS THE PETITIONER GOES AND MAKES COMMENTS TO HARASS THE RESPONDENT AGAIN. THE SENTENCING BEFORE THE COURT TODAY DEVELOPED FROM CONDUCT BY THE PETITIONER THAT ALARMED THE RESPONDENT. THE PETITIONER POSTED ITEMS FROM A GROUP CALLED "SINGLE DADS/FIGHTING FATHER" TO HIS FACEBOOK WALL AND SENT THE RESPONDENT A TEXT MESSAGE WITH AN ARTICLE ABOUT CHILDREN BEING ABDUCTED. THE CONTEXT OF THE TEXT MESSAGE AND POSTS WHERE AGGRESSIVE AND THIS COURT BELIEVES THEY WHERE INTENDED TO SCARE AND SHOCK THE RESPONDENT. IT'S VERY CLEAR TO THIS COURT THAT THE PETITIONER DISLIKE'S THE RESPONDENT AND DOES NOT CARE HOW HIS ACTIONS AFFECT HER. THIS COURT FINDS THE PETITIONER'S BEHAVIOR OFFENSE AND BELIEVES HIS BEHAVIOR IS A FORM OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON THE COURT'S FINDINGS THE PETITIONER SHALL ENROLL IN A 52 WEEK BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM. THE PETITIONER SHALL PROVIDE MR. STEIN WITH PROOF OF ENROLLMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM TODAY AND PROOF OF COMPLIANCE EVERY 90 DAYS THEREAFTER UNTIL THE CLASS IS COMPLETED. THE PETITIONER IS FURTHER SENTENCED TO 5 DAYS IN JAIL AS TO COUNT 1 AND 5 DAYS IN JAIL AS TO COUNT 2, FOR A TOTAL OF 10 DAYS. COUNT ONE AND COUNT TWO SHALL BE SERVED CONSECUTIVE. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS STAY DATE MOTION FOR STAY DATE TOWARDS THE END OF JANUARY IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITIONER'S STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCE OF JAIL IS STAYED UNTIL FRIDAY JANUARY 30, 2015 AT 5:45PM. THE PETITIONER SHALL SURRENDER AT THE MAIN JAIL IN BAKERSFIELD. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS PETITIONER'S PROOF OF COMPLIANCE WITH 16 HOURS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THIS COURT HAS NOT BEEN PRESENTED WITH ANY SIGNIFICANT CHANGE IN CIRCUMSTANCES. THE RESPONDENT IS REQUESTING THAT THE PETITIONER HAVE SUPERVISED VISITATION HOWEVER NO EVIDENCE HAS BEEN PRESENTED THAT THE CHILD IS BEING ABUSED , THEREFORE THE REQUEST FOR A CHANGE IN VISITATION IS DENIED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PREVIOUS ORDER FOR FIFTEEN MINUTE TELEPHONE CALLS SHALL BE CHANGED; THE NEW ORDER SHALL FOR TEN MINUTES OF UNMONITORED PHONE CONTACT. MR. STEIN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
December 17, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
December 17, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Document Image |
|
December 17, 2014 | hearing |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. |
|
December 10, 2014 | hearing | Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
4102 OSC re Contempt Hearing Entered. |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14 RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED 10/15/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN. RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION FOR EXCLUDING WITNESSES IS GRANTED. THE COURT PROCEEDS ON THE CONTEMPT. MILAN ROSENBERG DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON HER OWN BEHALF. MR. STEIN REQUESTS THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 11/15/13. THE MATTER IS TRAILED UNTIL AFTER THE LUNCH RECESS. THE PARTIES ARE ADMONISHED TO NOT DISCUSS THEIR TESTIMONY WITH ANYONE DURING THE BREAK. THE PARTIES RETURN TO OPEN COURT WITH APPEARANCES AS PREVIOUSLY INDICATED. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. RUBEN CASTRO DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON HIS OWN BEHALF. MILAN ROSENBERG HERETOFORE SWORN, RECALLED AND TESTIFIES FURTHER ON BEHALF OF HERSELF MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) MOTION FOR MOVING EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER INTO EVIDENCE IS GRANTED. (NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED UPON THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PRESENTED, THE COURT FINDS THE PETITIONER GUILTY ON BOTH COUNTS. CITEE FOUND GUILTY BY THE COURT. MR. CASTRO WILL NOT WAIVE TIME FOR SENTENCING. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR SENTENCING ON THE CONTEMPT. RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 12/17/14 AT 9:00 A.M. THE COURT PROCEEDS WITH THE REQUEST FOR ORDER. MILAN ROSENBERG DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON HER OWN BEHALF. RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION FOR OPENING THE SUBPOENAED RECORDS FROM RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL DURING THE AFTERNOON BREAK IS GRANTED. THE COURT IS IN RECESS FOR THE AFTERNOON BREAK. THE PARTIES RETURN TO OPEN COURT WITH APPEARANCES AS PREVIOUSLY INDICATED. PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CHAMBERS CONFERENCE ON THE MATTER AND WAIVE THE VERBATIM RECORD OF THE CHAMBERS CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 A.M. AND TRAILED UNTIL 1:30 P.M. FOR THE COMPLETION OF THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14, AND SENTENCING ON THE RESPONDENT'S CONTEMPT FILED 10/15/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
December 10, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
December 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
December 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14 RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED 10/15/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN. RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION FOR EXCLUDING WITNESSES IS GRANTED. THE COURT PROCEEDS ON THE CONTEMPT. MILAN ROSENBERG DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON HER OWN BEHALF. MR. STEIN REQUESTS THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 11/15/13. THE MATTER IS TRAILED UNTIL AFTER THE LUNCH RECESS. THE PARTIES ARE ADMONISHED TO NOT DISCUSS THEIR TESTIMONY WITH ANYONE DURING THE BREAK. THE PARTIES RETURN TO OPEN COURT WITH APPEARANCES AS PREVIOUSLY INDICATED. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. RUBEN CASTRO DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON HIS OWN BEHALF. MILAN ROSENBERG HERETOFORE SWORN, RECALLED AND TESTIFIES FURTHER ON BEHALF OF HERSELF MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) MOTION FOR MOVING EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER INTO EVIDENCE IS GRANTED. (NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED UPON THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PRESENTED, THE COURT FINDS THE PETITIONER GUILTY ON BOTH COUNTS. CITEE FOUND GUILTY BY THE COURT. MR. CASTRO WILL NOT WAIVE TIME FOR SENTENCING. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR SENTENCING ON THE CONTEMPT. RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 12/17/14 AT 9:00 A.M. THE COURT PROCEEDS WITH THE REQUEST FOR ORDER. MILAN ROSENBERG DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON HER OWN BEHALF. RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION FOR OPENING THE SUBPOENAED RECORDS FROM RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL DURING THE AFTERNOON BREAK IS GRANTED. THE COURT IS IN RECESS FOR THE AFTERNOON BREAK. THE PARTIES RETURN TO OPEN COURT WITH APPEARANCES AS PREVIOUSLY INDICATED. PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CHAMBERS CONFERENCE ON THE MATTER AND WAIVE THE VERBATIM RECORD OF THE CHAMBERS CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 A.M. AND TRAILED UNTIL 1:30 P.M. FOR THE COMPLETION OF THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14, AND SENTENCING ON THE RESPONDENT'S CONTEMPT FILED 10/15/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
December 10, 2014 | hearing |
4102 OSC re Contempt Hearing Entered. |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL |
|
December 05, 2014 | hearing |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $5.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from CASTRO, RUBEN. Receipt #809753 for amount of $5.00. Detail: 1 X $20.00 = $20.00 CHANGE GIVEN 3 X $5.00 = $15.00. |
|
November 13, 2014 | hearing |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $5.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from CASTRO, RUBEN. Receipt #809753 for amount of $5.00. Detail: 1 X $20.00 = $20.00 CHANGE GIVEN 3 X $5.00 = $15.00. |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear RETURN DATE: 12/10/14 |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
Mediation Report NO AGREEMENT |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14 RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED 10/15/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION THE PARTIES RETURN FROM MEDIATION WITHOUT AN AGREEMENT. RUBEN CASTRO IS ADVISED OF HIS/HER CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) ALL COUNTS. CITEE WAIVES TIME FOR TRIAL PLUS 45 DAYS. MR. STEIN OBJECTS TO SETTING THE CONTEMPT OUTSIDE OF STATUTORY TIME. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER AND CONTEMPT MATTER SHALL BE SET WITHIN STATUTORY TIME IN THE INTEREST OF JUDICIAL ECONOMY. RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 12/10/14 AT 9:00 A.M. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 12/10/14 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR HEARING ON CONTEMPT AFTER ARRAIGNMENT, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report NO AGREEMENT |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14 RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED 10/15/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION THE PARTIES RETURN FROM MEDIATION WITHOUT AN AGREEMENT. RUBEN CASTRO IS ADVISED OF HIS/HER CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) ALL COUNTS. CITEE WAIVES TIME FOR TRIAL PLUS 45 DAYS. MR. STEIN OBJECTS TO SETTING THE CONTEMPT OUTSIDE OF STATUTORY TIME. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER AND CONTEMPT MATTER SHALL BE SET WITHIN STATUTORY TIME IN THE INTEREST OF JUDICIAL ECONOMY. RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 12/10/14 AT 9:00 A.M. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 12/10/14 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR HEARING ON CONTEMPT AFTER ARRAIGNMENT, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED 10/14/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear RETURN DATE: 12/10/14 |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. |
|
November 05, 2014 | hearing |
Mediation Report BOTH PARENTS FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report BOTH PARENTS FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION |
|
October 16, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OSC RE: CONTMPT SERVED 10/15/14 |
|
October 16, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE RFO SERVED 10/16/14 |
|
October 16, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Document Image |
|
October 16, 2014 | hearing |
Judgment on Reserved Issues Document Image |
|
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OSC RE: CONTMPT SERVED 10/15/14 |
|
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE RFO SERVED 10/16/14 |
|
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Document Image |
|
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Reserved Issues Document Image |
|
October 15, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS |
|
October 14, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12820. Receipt #804370 for amount of $90.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | hearing |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12820. Receipt #804370 for amount of $90.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (FL-300) RESPONDENTS MEDIATION SET FOR 11/05/14 AT 10:30AM |
|
October 14, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12819. Receipt #804357 for amount of $115.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | hearing |
171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 Amount of $85.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12819. Receipt #804357 for amount of $115.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF COMPLETION OF ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12820. Receipt #804370 for amount of $90.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) RESPONDENTS MEDIATION SET FOR 11/05/14 AT 10:30AM |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12820. Receipt #804370 for amount of $90.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 Amount of $85.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12819. Receipt #804357 for amount of $115.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12819. Receipt #804357 for amount of $115.00. |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF COMPLETION OF ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF |
|
October 09, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Counseling Enrollment PROGRESS REPORT FROM LEGACY |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Counseling Enrollment PROGRESS REPORT FROM LEGACY |
|
September 12, 2014 | hearing |
Proposed Judgment Document Image |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Document Image |
|
September 10, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Counseling Enrollment PROGRESS REPORT FROM LEGACY |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Counseling Enrollment PROGRESS REPORT FROM LEGACY |
|
August 19, 2014 | hearing |
Findings and Orders from hearing on 4/10/14 |
|
August 19, 2014 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
August 19, 2014 | hearing |
Judgment - Status Only martial status ends 8/19/14 |
|
August 19, 2014 | hearing |
Findings and Orders order from 10/2/2013 |
|
August 19, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice judgment/ duplicate filing |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders from hearing on 4/10/14 |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice judgment/ duplicate filing |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders order from 10/2/2013 |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Status Only martial status ends 8/19/14 |
|
June 18, 2014 | hearing | Protective Order Entered into CLETS System | |
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
Findings and Orders FINDINGS AND ORDER REGARDING CONTEMPT FROM 5/22/14 HEARING |
|
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS 3RD AMENDED FROM HEARING ON 6/17/14 ORDERS EXPIRE ON 3/20/16 |
|
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14. RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: PETITIONER'S EXHIBITS 18 AND 19 AS WELL AS RESPONDENT'S EXHIBIT I SHALL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: OFFICER ERIC CLINTON, OFFICER KYLE CUSHMAN WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT MELVIN MEDE PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE CLERK SHALL OPEN THE SUBPOENAED DOCUMENT FROM RIDGECREST POLICE DEPARTMENT DATED 6/12/14. MOTION FOR RECALLING WITNESS MR. MEDE OUT OF ORDER IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL THE EXHIBIT'S MARKED DURING TODAYS HEARING BY BOTH SIDES SHALL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT 4 AND 17 THAT WERE MARKED DURING PREVIOUS HEARINGS SHALL ALSO BE ADMITTED. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES MAKE CLOSING ARGUMENTS THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL AMEND THE CURRENT RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING SO THE PETITIONER MAY GO TO HERITAGE MONTESSORI SCHOOL FOR THE PURPOSE OF PICKING UP CALAIT ,HOWEVER HE SHALL HAVE NO CONTACT WITH THE RESPONDENT'S SON BRAYSON WHILE AT THE SCHOOL. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PARTIES PRESENT AND SUBMIT A COPY TO CLETS FOR ENTRY. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE TESTIMONY PRESENTED THE COURT HAS NOT BEEN PROVIDED WITH SUFFICIENT PROOF THAT MR. CASTRO PARTICIPATED IN THE ALLEGATION THAT MS. SULLIVAN VIOLATED THE STAY AWAY ORDER FROM CALAIT DURING HIS VISITATION TIME, THEREFORE THE COURT IS NOT MAKING A FINDING ONE WAY OR THE OTHER THAT THE ORDER WAS VIOLATED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE TOTALITY OF FACTS AND EVIDENCE RECEIVED TO THIS COURT OVER MANY DAYS IT'S CLEAR THE PARTIES CANNOT WORK TOGETHER AND ARE UNABLE TO CO-PARENT. THE COURTS PRIMARY FOCUS IS ALWAYS WHAT'S IN THE BEST INTEREST OF THE MINOR CHILD. THE CHILD NEEDS CONTINUING AND FREQUENT CONTACT WITH BOTH PARENTS, THEREFORE THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE JOINT LEGAL AND JOINT PHYSICAL CUSTODY WITH THE RESPONDENT HAVING PRIMARY TIME SHARE. IF THE PARTIES CANNOT AGREE ON DECISIONS REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD THEN THE RESPONDENT WILL MAKE THE FINAL DECISION. THIS SHALL INCLUDE BUT NOT LIMITED TO WHAT DOCTOR THE CHILD SEES AS WELL THE LENGTH AND STYLE OF THE CHILDS HAIR. BEGINNING 6/20/14 AND EVERY OTHER WEEKEND THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, PETITIONER SHALL HAVE OVER NIGHT VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD FROM FRIDAY AT 12:00PM UNTIL MONDAY AT 8:00 AM. PETITIONER SHALL PICK THE CHILD UP FROM HERITAGE MONTESSORI ON FRIDAYS AND RETURN HER TO SCHOOL ON MONDAY MORNINGS. THE CHILD DOES NOT HAVE TO ATTEND AND EXTRA ACTIVITIES SHE MAY BE ENROLLED IN DURING THE PETITIONER'S TIME SHARE, THIS WILL ALLOW THE PETITIONER TO HAVE UNINTERRUPTED VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD DURING HIS TIME SHARE. FOR THE WEEKEND OF JULY 4TH, THE PETITIONER'S OVER NIGHT VISITATION SHALL BEGIN THURSDAY 7/3/14 AT 5:00PM. THE RESPONDENT SHALL NOTIFY HERITAGE MONTESSORI SCHOOL FORTHWITH THAT THE PETITIONER WILL BE PICKING UP AND DROPPING OFF THE MINOR CHILD DURING HIS VISITATION TIME. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES SHALL MEET WITH THEIR ATTORNEYS AND ATTEMPT TO REACH A STIPULATED HOLIDAY VISITATION THAT SHALL BE INCORPORATED INTO THE JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER SHALL ALSO HAVE UNMONITORED PHONE VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD EVERY TUESDAY AND THURSDAY FROM 7:00PM TO 7:15PM. ALL CONTACT AND COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES SHALL BE DONE VIA TEXT MESSAGE. NEITHER PARTY SHALL MAKE ANY NEGATIVE OR DEROGATORY COMMENTS ABOUT THE OTHER IN THE PRESENCE OF THE MINOR CHILD NOR ALLOW ANYONE ELSE TO DO SO. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER SHALL NOT ALLOW THE MINOR CHILD TO HAVE ANY CONTACT OR BE IN THE PRESENCE OF CAITLYN SULLIVAN, NOR SHALL HE ALLOW ANYONE ELSE TO DO SO. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO MODIFY THE PREVIOUS ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES IS GRANTED. THE PETITIONER IS CURRENTLY UNEMPLOYED ,THEREFORE THE ORDER FOR MONTHLY PAYMENTS OF $400.00 DIRECTLY TO MR. STEIN SHALL BE SUSPENDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT OR UNTIL THE PETITIONER BECOMES EMPLOYED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BOTH PARTIES ARE CURRENTLY UNEMPLOYED, HOWEVER IT'S CLEAR THEY ARE BOTH TRYING TO GET A JOB. THE COURT IS NOT GOING TO IMPUTE INCOME TO EITHER PARTY AT THIS TIME; THEREFORE CHILD SUPPORT SHALL REMAIN AT ZERO UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS IS DENIED BASED ON THE FINDINGS ABOVE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: FOR THE YEAR 2014 AND EVERY YEAR THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT THE RESPONDENT SHALL CLAIM THE TAX EXEMPTION FOR THE MINOR CHILD. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: ALL EXHIBITS SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE SUBMITTING PARTY. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - RESPONDENT. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. ON RESERVED ISSUES DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). MS. ANDERSON TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. (RESERVED ISSUES) THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
4001 Court Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
June 17, 2014 | hearing |
Court Trial
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS 3RD AMENDED FROM HEARING ON 6/17/14 ORDERS EXPIRE ON 3/20/16 |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders FINDINGS AND ORDER REGARDING CONTEMPT FROM 5/22/14 HEARING |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14. RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: PETITIONER'S EXHIBITS 18 AND 19 AS WELL AS RESPONDENT'S EXHIBIT I SHALL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: OFFICER ERIC CLINTON, OFFICER KYLE CUSHMAN WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT MELVIN MEDE PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE CLERK SHALL OPEN THE SUBPOENAED DOCUMENT FROM RIDGECREST POLICE DEPARTMENT DATED 6/12/14. MOTION FOR RECALLING WITNESS MR. MEDE OUT OF ORDER IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL THE EXHIBIT'S MARKED DURING TODAYS HEARING BY BOTH SIDES SHALL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT 4 AND 17 THAT WERE MARKED DURING PREVIOUS HEARINGS SHALL ALSO BE ADMITTED. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES MAKE CLOSING ARGUMENTS THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL AMEND THE CURRENT RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING SO THE PETITIONER MAY GO TO HERITAGE MONTESSORI SCHOOL FOR THE PURPOSE OF PICKING UP CALAIT ,HOWEVER HE SHALL HAVE NO CONTACT WITH THE RESPONDENT'S SON BRAYSON WHILE AT THE SCHOOL. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PARTIES PRESENT AND SUBMIT A COPY TO CLETS FOR ENTRY. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE TESTIMONY PRESENTED THE COURT HAS NOT BEEN PROVIDED WITH SUFFICIENT PROOF THAT MR. CASTRO PARTICIPATED IN THE ALLEGATION THAT MS. SULLIVAN VIOLATED THE STAY AWAY ORDER FROM CALAIT DURING HIS VISITATION TIME, THEREFORE THE COURT IS NOT MAKING A FINDING ONE WAY OR THE OTHER THAT THE ORDER WAS VIOLATED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE TOTALITY OF FACTS AND EVIDENCE RECEIVED TO THIS COURT OVER MANY DAYS IT'S CLEAR THE PARTIES CANNOT WORK TOGETHER AND ARE UNABLE TO CO-PARENT. THE COURTS PRIMARY FOCUS IS ALWAYS WHAT'S IN THE BEST INTEREST OF THE MINOR CHILD. THE CHILD NEEDS CONTINUING AND FREQUENT CONTACT WITH BOTH PARENTS, THEREFORE THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE JOINT LEGAL AND JOINT PHYSICAL CUSTODY WITH THE RESPONDENT HAVING PRIMARY TIME SHARE. IF THE PARTIES CANNOT AGREE ON DECISIONS REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD THEN THE RESPONDENT WILL MAKE THE FINAL DECISION. THIS SHALL INCLUDE BUT NOT LIMITED TO WHAT DOCTOR THE CHILD SEES AS WELL THE LENGTH AND STYLE OF THE CHILDS HAIR. BEGINNING 6/20/14 AND EVERY OTHER WEEKEND THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, PETITIONER SHALL HAVE OVER NIGHT VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD FROM FRIDAY AT 12:00PM UNTIL MONDAY AT 8:00 AM. PETITIONER SHALL PICK THE CHILD UP FROM HERITAGE MONTESSORI ON FRIDAYS AND RETURN HER TO SCHOOL ON MONDAY MORNINGS. THE CHILD DOES NOT HAVE TO ATTEND AND EXTRA ACTIVITIES SHE MAY BE ENROLLED IN DURING THE PETITIONER'S TIME SHARE, THIS WILL ALLOW THE PETITIONER TO HAVE UNINTERRUPTED VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD DURING HIS TIME SHARE. FOR THE WEEKEND OF JULY 4TH, THE PETITIONER'S OVER NIGHT VISITATION SHALL BEGIN THURSDAY 7/3/14 AT 5:00PM. THE RESPONDENT SHALL NOTIFY HERITAGE MONTESSORI SCHOOL FORTHWITH THAT THE PETITIONER WILL BE PICKING UP AND DROPPING OFF THE MINOR CHILD DURING HIS VISITATION TIME. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES SHALL MEET WITH THEIR ATTORNEYS AND ATTEMPT TO REACH A STIPULATED HOLIDAY VISITATION THAT SHALL BE INCORPORATED INTO THE JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER SHALL ALSO HAVE UNMONITORED PHONE VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD EVERY TUESDAY AND THURSDAY FROM 7:00PM TO 7:15PM. ALL CONTACT AND COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES SHALL BE DONE VIA TEXT MESSAGE. NEITHER PARTY SHALL MAKE ANY NEGATIVE OR DEROGATORY COMMENTS ABOUT THE OTHER IN THE PRESENCE OF THE MINOR CHILD NOR ALLOW ANYONE ELSE TO DO SO. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER SHALL NOT ALLOW THE MINOR CHILD TO HAVE ANY CONTACT OR BE IN THE PRESENCE OF CAITLYN SULLIVAN, NOR SHALL HE ALLOW ANYONE ELSE TO DO SO. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO MODIFY THE PREVIOUS ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES IS GRANTED. THE PETITIONER IS CURRENTLY UNEMPLOYED ,THEREFORE THE ORDER FOR MONTHLY PAYMENTS OF $400.00 DIRECTLY TO MR. STEIN SHALL BE SUSPENDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT OR UNTIL THE PETITIONER BECOMES EMPLOYED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BOTH PARTIES ARE CURRENTLY UNEMPLOYED, HOWEVER IT'S CLEAR THEY ARE BOTH TRYING TO GET A JOB. THE COURT IS NOT GOING TO IMPUTE INCOME TO EITHER PARTY AT THIS TIME; THEREFORE CHILD SUPPORT SHALL REMAIN AT ZERO UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS IS DENIED BASED ON THE FINDINGS ABOVE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: FOR THE YEAR 2014 AND EVERY YEAR THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT THE RESPONDENT SHALL CLAIM THE TAX EXEMPTION FOR THE MINOR CHILD. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: ALL EXHIBITS SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE SUBMITTING PARTY. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - RESPONDENT. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. ON RESERVED ISSUES DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). MS. ANDERSON TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. (RESERVED ISSUES) THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
4001 Court Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
June 13, 2014 | hearing |
Witness List (FL-321) RESPONDENTS |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List (FL-321) RESPONDENTS |
|
June 12, 2014 | hearing |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST POLICE DEPARTMENT |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST POLICE DEPARTMENT |
|
June 11, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 6/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER IS CONFIRMED FOR HEARING CAUSE CONTINUED TO 06/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 11, 2014 | hearing |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
June 11, 2014 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 6/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER IS CONFIRMED FOR HEARING CAUSE CONTINUED TO 06/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 09, 2014 | hearing |
Witness List (FL-321) PETITIONERS |
|
June 09, 2014 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF ENROLLMENT IN ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF. |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List (FL-321) PETITIONERS |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF ENROLLMENT IN ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF. |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear FOR HEARING ON 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION. RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT MELVEN MEDE WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: CAITLYN SULLIVAN COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE ISSUES BEFORE THE COURT TODAY THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT'S CONTEMPT MATTERS SHALL BE HEARD FIRST. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE REMAINING COUNT'S OF PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE REMAINING TWO COUNTS OF THE PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT IS GRANTED. MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 SHALL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED BY THE RESPONDENT ON 2/4/14 SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE EIGHT COUNT'S OF CONTEMPT REGARDING FAILURE TO PAY ATTORNEY FEES IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) MOTION FOR DISMISSING TWO OF THE FOUR COUNTS OF CONTEMPT FOR NON-PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE EIGHT COUNTS OF CONTEMPT AGAINST THE PETITIONER FOR FAILURE TO PAY ATTORNEY FEES WOULD FAIL BASED ON CCP 1209.5. TWO OF THE FOUR COUNTS FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT SHALL WOULD FAIL AS A MATTER OF LAW, THEREFORE TEN OF THE 13 COUNTS OF CONTEMPT SHALL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE REMAINING THREE PENDING COUNTS OF CONTEMPT ARE TWO COUNTS FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT IN JUNE AND JULY 2013 AND ONE COUNT OF VIOLATING THE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING. MS. ANDERSON REQUESTS THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF 2ND AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED ON 11/15/2013. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES MAKE CLOSING ARGUMENTS THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: ON THE 2ND AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED ON 11/15/13, PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS HAVE CLEARLY BEEN ORDERED AND REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL 3/20/2016. BASED ON THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PRESENTED THE PETITIONER SENDING CONTINUOUS TEXT MESSAGES TO THE RESPONDENT HAS AND CONTINUES TO DISTURB HER PEACE. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE PETITIONER HAD NOTICE OF THE ORDER. THE COURT HAS BEEN PRESENTED WITH SUFFICIENT EVIDENCE TO PROVE BEYOND A REASONABLE DOUBT THAT THE PETITIONER HAS VIOLATED THE RESTRAINING ORDER AND IS GUILTY OF CONTEMPT. THE TWO REMAINING COUNT'S FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT SHALL BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROVE. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PETITIONER WAIVES TIME FOR SENTENCING, SO HE MAY BE SENTENCED TODAY. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES MAKE ARGUMENT IN REGARDS TO SENTENCING PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS SHALL BE OPENED AND REVIEWED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE PETITIONER IS UNEMPLOYED AND INVOLVED IN A LONG DRAWN OUT BATTLE OVER CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION AND SEEMS TO PLACE A LOT OF ANGER IN HIS CONTACT WITH THE RESPONDENT. THE COURT BELIEVES PLACING A MONETARY ORDER AGAINST THE PETITIONER WOULD BE COUNTER PRODUCTIVE AT THIS TIME. THE COURT DOES BELIEVE THAT ANGER MANAGEMENT WOULD BENEFIT ALL PARTIES INVOLVED, THEREFORE THE PETITIONER SHALL ATTEND 16 WEEKS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT. THE PETITIONER SHALL PROVIDE MR. STEIN'S OFFICE WITH PROOF OF ENROLLMENT IN A 16 WEEK ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM BY 6/23/14. THE CLASSES SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/19/14. IF THE PETITIONER COMPLIES WITH THE COURT'S ORDERS BY THE DATES INDICATED ABOVE THE CONTEMPT MAY BE PURGED AND THE COURT WOULD CONSIDER REVERSING THE ORDER THAT THE PETITIONER VIOLATED THE ORDER. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL PREPARE THE FINDINGS AND ORDER REGARDING CONTEMPT FOR SIGNATURE. THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PROOF OF COMPLIANCE/COMPLETION. RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM THE COURT NOTES FOR THE RECORD THAT THE TESTIMONY REGARDING WHAT TOOK PLACE EARLIER THIS WEEK WAS NOT CONSIDERED BY THE COURT FOR THE CONTEMPT, HOWEVER IT DID SHOW CONTINUING CONDUCT. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE REMAINING ISSUES ON CALENDAR TODAY, AND WHERE THE COURT LEFT OFF AT THE LAST HEARING. MS. ANDERSON OBJECTS TO MR. STEIN REOPENING, AND REQUESTS THAT IF THE COURT ALLOWS HIM TO REOPEN THAT HE HAVE A LIMITED AMOUNT OF TIME. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT WILL ALLOW MR. STEIN TO CALL HIS WITNESS; HOWEVER WE WILL ONLY HAVE UNTIL 2:30PM. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: CAITLYN SULLIVAN WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT MELVEN MEDE THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO THE AMOUNT OF TIME LEFT TODAY, THE REMAINING MATTERS SHALL BE SET FOR A SPECIAL SETTING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AGAINST CAITLYN SULLIVAN IN CASE R-1502-CV-100738. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AGAINST CAITLYN SULLIVAN SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 5/28/14 AT 9:00 AM. ALL OTHER MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR A HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 6/17/14 AT 9:00 AM, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 6/11/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE RESPONDENT SHALL PRINT ALL TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN HERSELF AND THE PETITIONER FROM APRIL 11, 2014 THROUGH 5/21/14 AND BRING THEM TO THE CONTINUED HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PREVIOUS ORDERS FOR CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FROM 4/10/14 SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL PREPARE THE AMENDED TEMPORARY CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS TO REFLECT THE NEW HEARING DATE AND PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PARTIES PRESENT AND SUBMIT A COPY TO CLETS FOR ENTRY. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PROOF OF COMPLIANCE/COMPLETION FROM CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 CAUSE CONTINUED TO 05/28/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS IN CASE R-1502-CV-100738 FILED ON 2/25/14 CAUSE CONTINUED TO 06/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 6/11/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
May 22, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear FOR HEARING ON 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION. RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT MELVEN MEDE WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: CAITLYN SULLIVAN COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE ISSUES BEFORE THE COURT TODAY THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT'S CONTEMPT MATTERS SHALL BE HEARD FIRST. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE REMAINING COUNT'S OF PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE REMAINING TWO COUNTS OF THE PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT IS GRANTED. MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 SHALL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED BY THE RESPONDENT ON 2/4/14 SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE EIGHT COUNT'S OF CONTEMPT REGARDING FAILURE TO PAY ATTORNEY FEES IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) MOTION FOR DISMISSING TWO OF THE FOUR COUNTS OF CONTEMPT FOR NON-PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MS. ANDERSON) THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE EIGHT COUNTS OF CONTEMPT AGAINST THE PETITIONER FOR FAILURE TO PAY ATTORNEY FEES WOULD FAIL BASED ON CCP 1209.5. TWO OF THE FOUR COUNTS FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT SHALL WOULD FAIL AS A MATTER OF LAW, THEREFORE TEN OF THE 13 COUNTS OF CONTEMPT SHALL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE REMAINING THREE PENDING COUNTS OF CONTEMPT ARE TWO COUNTS FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT IN JUNE AND JULY 2013 AND ONE COUNT OF VIOLATING THE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING. MS. ANDERSON REQUESTS THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF 2ND AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED ON 11/15/2013. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES MAKE CLOSING ARGUMENTS THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: ON THE 2ND AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED ON 11/15/13, PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS HAVE CLEARLY BEEN ORDERED AND REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL 3/20/2016. BASED ON THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PRESENTED THE PETITIONER SENDING CONTINUOUS TEXT MESSAGES TO THE RESPONDENT HAS AND CONTINUES TO DISTURB HER PEACE. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE PETITIONER HAD NOTICE OF THE ORDER. THE COURT HAS BEEN PRESENTED WITH SUFFICIENT EVIDENCE TO PROVE BEYOND A REASONABLE DOUBT THAT THE PETITIONER HAS VIOLATED THE RESTRAINING ORDER AND IS GUILTY OF CONTEMPT. THE TWO REMAINING COUNT'S FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT SHALL BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROVE. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PETITIONER WAIVES TIME FOR SENTENCING, SO HE MAY BE SENTENCED TODAY. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES MAKE ARGUMENT IN REGARDS TO SENTENCING PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS SHALL BE OPENED AND REVIEWED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE PETITIONER IS UNEMPLOYED AND INVOLVED IN A LONG DRAWN OUT BATTLE OVER CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION AND SEEMS TO PLACE A LOT OF ANGER IN HIS CONTACT WITH THE RESPONDENT. THE COURT BELIEVES PLACING A MONETARY ORDER AGAINST THE PETITIONER WOULD BE COUNTER PRODUCTIVE AT THIS TIME. THE COURT DOES BELIEVE THAT ANGER MANAGEMENT WOULD BENEFIT ALL PARTIES INVOLVED, THEREFORE THE PETITIONER SHALL ATTEND 16 WEEKS OF ANGER MANAGEMENT. THE PETITIONER SHALL PROVIDE MR. STEIN'S OFFICE WITH PROOF OF ENROLLMENT IN A 16 WEEK ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM BY 6/23/14. THE CLASSES SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/19/14. IF THE PETITIONER COMPLIES WITH THE COURT'S ORDERS BY THE DATES INDICATED ABOVE THE CONTEMPT MAY BE PURGED AND THE COURT WOULD CONSIDER REVERSING THE ORDER THAT THE PETITIONER VIOLATED THE ORDER. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL PREPARE THE FINDINGS AND ORDER REGARDING CONTEMPT FOR SIGNATURE. THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PROOF OF COMPLIANCE/COMPLETION. RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM THE COURT NOTES FOR THE RECORD THAT THE TESTIMONY REGARDING WHAT TOOK PLACE EARLIER THIS WEEK WAS NOT CONSIDERED BY THE COURT FOR THE CONTEMPT, HOWEVER IT DID SHOW CONTINUING CONDUCT. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE REMAINING ISSUES ON CALENDAR TODAY, AND WHERE THE COURT LEFT OFF AT THE LAST HEARING. MS. ANDERSON OBJECTS TO MR. STEIN REOPENING, AND REQUESTS THAT IF THE COURT ALLOWS HIM TO REOPEN THAT HE HAVE A LIMITED AMOUNT OF TIME. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT WILL ALLOW MR. STEIN TO CALL HIS WITNESS; HOWEVER WE WILL ONLY HAVE UNTIL 2:30PM. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: CAITLYN SULLIVAN WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT MELVEN MEDE THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO THE AMOUNT OF TIME LEFT TODAY, THE REMAINING MATTERS SHALL BE SET FOR A SPECIAL SETTING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AGAINST CAITLYN SULLIVAN IN CASE R-1502-CV-100738. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AGAINST CAITLYN SULLIVAN SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 5/28/14 AT 9:00 AM. ALL OTHER MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR A HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 6/17/14 AT 9:00 AM, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 6/11/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE RESPONDENT SHALL PRINT ALL TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN HERSELF AND THE PETITIONER FROM APRIL 11, 2014 THROUGH 5/21/14 AND BRING THEM TO THE CONTINUED HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PREVIOUS ORDERS FOR CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FROM 4/10/14 SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL PREPARE THE AMENDED TEMPORARY CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS TO REFLECT THE NEW HEARING DATE AND PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PARTIES PRESENT AND SUBMIT A COPY TO CLETS FOR ENTRY. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PROOF OF COMPLIANCE/COMPLETION FROM CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 CAUSE CONTINUED TO 05/28/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS IN CASE R-1502-CV-100738 FILED ON 2/25/14 CAUSE CONTINUED TO 06/17/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, TAX EXEMPTION, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 6/11/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). MR. STEIN INDICATES HE CAN CONFIRM HOWEVER HE HAS A COURT ALL APPEARANCE TOMORROW AT 9:00 AM THAT SHOULD BE NO MORE THAN 30 MINUTES AND A MOTION ON THE 10:30 CRIMINAL CALENDAR IN DIVISION A. MS. ANDERSON INDICATES THAT SHE CAN CONFIRM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER IS CONFIRMED FOR HEARING AT 9:30 AM. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 05/22/14 AT 9:30 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing | Witness List (FL-321) | |
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). MR. STEIN INDICATES HE CAN CONFIRM HOWEVER HE HAS A COURT ALL APPEARANCE TOMORROW AT 9:00 AM THAT SHOULD BE NO MORE THAN 30 MINUTES AND A MOTION ON THE 10:30 CRIMINAL CALENDAR IN DIVISION A. MS. ANDERSON INDICATES THAT SHE CAN CONFIRM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER IS CONFIRMED FOR HEARING AT 9:30 AM. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 05/22/14 AT 9:30 AM FOR CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
May 20, 2014 | hearing |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM DR. VICTORIA SCHAUF'S OFFICE |
|
May 20, 2014 | hearing |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST POLICE DEPARTMENT |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM DR. VICTORIA SCHAUF'S OFFICE |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST POLICE DEPARTMENT |
|
May 13, 2014 | hearing |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST RIGIONAL HOSPITAL |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Subpoenaed Records Received FROM RIDGECREST RIGIONAL HOSPITAL |
|
May 06, 2014 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
April 18, 2014 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration PETITIONERS FYI #3D INCOMPLETE |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration PETITIONERS FYI #3D INCOMPLETE |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear FOR HEARING ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear HEARING DATE 5/22/14 AT 9:00 |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION,, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION. RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. CAITLYN SULLIVAN APPEARS WITH MS. ANDERSON PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: HEATHER MARTIN WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT AMANDA GARDNER, AMANDA MENZEL CAITLYN SULLIVAN SWORN AND TESTIFIED. MR. STEIN CALLS AMANDA GARDNER AND CAITLYN SULLIVAN UNDER 776 THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CASE R-1502-CV-100738 SHALL BE HEARD CONCURRENTLY TODAY WITH R-1502-FL-7727 COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS MATTERS SET FOR HEARING TODAY PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AND THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 2/25/14 ARE RELATED, THEREFORE THE COURT WILL HEAR THOSE MATTERS TODAY. ALL OTHER MATTERS ON CALENDAR SHALL BE SET FOR ANOTHER SPECIAL SETTING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE SUBPOENAED WITNESS TREVOR WILEY MAY BE RELEASED; HOWEVER HE IS STILL SUBJECT TO APPEAR WITHIN 15 MINUTES OF BEING CONTACTED. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MOTION FOR ADMITTING RESPONDENT'S EXHIBITS A,B AND C INTO EVIDENCE IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, MS. ANDERSON OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT S C BEING ADMITTED) MR. STEIN REQUESTS THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING DATED 3/29/13. MS. ANDERSON NOTES FOR THE RECORD THAT MR. STEIN HAS BEEN PUTTING ON HIS CASE SINCE 9:00 AM, AND IT'S NOW 2:00PM. MOTION FOR CALLING WITNESS HEATHER MARTIN OUT OF ORDER IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE WITNESS HEATHER MARTIN SHALL BE EXCUSED; HOWEVER SHE IS STILL SUBJECT TO RECALL. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON THE AMOUNT OF TIME LEFT IN THE DAY, THE PARTIES SHALL PICK A NEW SPECIAL SETTING DATE. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES CONTINUE TO HAVE THE SAME ISSUES THEY HAVE HAD IN THE PAST. THE PARTIES ARE ALLOWING THEIR PERSONAL FEELINGS ABOUT ONE ANOTHER TO EFFECT THEIR DECISIONS AND ACTIONS REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD. THE PARTIES MAY NOT LIKE EACH OTHER, HOWEVER THEY MUST LEARN TO CO-PARENT AND DO WHAT IS BEST FOR THE MINOR CHILD. THE COURT IS IMPRESSED WITH THE PETITIONER'S TESTIMONY REGARDING THE PARENTING CLASSES HE HAS TAKEN, HOWEVER THE PARTIES NEED TO START ACTING AND BEHAVING LIKE ABLE ADULT PARENTS. THE LAST THING THE COURT WANTS TO DO IS REMOVE THE CHILD FROM BOTH PARTIES. IN JANUARY THIS COURT ADMONISHED MS. SULLIVAN ABOUT HER ACTIONS AND BEHAVIOR AS WELL AS THE POSSIBLE CONSEQUENCES, HOWEVER MS. SULLIVAN IN ONE WAY OR ANOTHER APPEARS TO CONTINUALLY INVOLVE HERSELF IN MATTERS REGARDING THE PARTIES CHILD. THE COURT IS VERY DISTURBED BY THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE THAT MS. SULLIVAN UPDATED INFORMATION AT THE PEDIATRICIANS OFFICE, AND LISTED HERSELF AS MR. CASTRO'S WIFE AND CHILDS STEP-MOTHER. REMOVING THE RESPONDENT'S INFORMATION FROM DOCUMENTATION THAT IS RELIED ON BY PEDIATRICIANS OFFICE IS INEXCUSABLE. NOT ONLY IS THE INFORMATION ON THE DOCUMENT UNTRUE, MS. SULLIVAN HAS NO LEGAL RIGHT TO THE CHILD AND SHOULD NOT BE FILLING OUT ANY PAPERWORK. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PRESENTED SO FAR THE COURT DOES NOT BELIEVE THE CHILD IS IN ANY DANGER WITH EITHER PARENT, AND THE COURT SEES NO REASON MY THE PETITIONER'S VISITATION SHALL NO BE REINSTATED. THE MOST DISTURBING INFORMATION RECEIVED TODAY IS THE DOCUMENTATION FORGED BY MS. SULLIVAN, THEREFORE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT CAITLYN SULLIVAN SHALL NOT BE IN THE PRESENCE OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER ANY CIRCUMSTANCES NOR SHALL SHE BE INVOLVED IN ANY COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES. THE VISITATION ORDERS FROM 10/15/13 SHALL BE REINSTATED EXCEPT AS INDICATED BELOW. THE PETITIONER SHALL HAVE ALTERNATE WEEKEND VISITATION BEGINNING FRIDAY 4/11/14 AT 5:00PM UNTIL SUNDAY AT 5:00PM, AND EVERY OTHER WEEKEND THEREAFTER AFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE PETITIONER SHALL ALSO CONTINUE TO HAVE ONE OVERNIGHT VISITATION EVERY WEEK BEGINNING TUESDAY 4/15/14 AT 5:00 PM UNTIL WEDNESDAY AT 5:00PM, AND EVERY WEEK THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: IF EITHER PARTY BECOMES EMPLOYED THEY SHALL PROVIDE A COPY OF THEIR WORK SCHEDULE TO THE OTHER PARTY. IF THE PETITIONER CANNOT EXERCISE HIS VISITATION DUE TO EMPLOYMENT, THE MINOR CHILDREN SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE RESPONDENT. MO1004D: THE PETITIONER SHALL HAVE LIBERAL AND UNMONITORED PHONE CONTACT WITH THE MINOR CHILD. IN THE EVENT EITHER PARTY REQUIRES CHILD CARE FOR SIX HOURS OR MORE WHILE THE CHILD IS IN THEIR CUSTODY, THE OTHER PARENT SHALL BE GIVEN THE FIRST OPPORTUNITY WITH AS MUCH PRIOR NOTICE AS POSSIBLE TO CARE FOR THE CHILD BEFORE OTHER ARRANGEMENTS ARE MADE. THE MINOR CHILD SHALL NOT BE LEFT WITH A NON-PARENT OR A NON-GRANDPARENT. NEITHER PARTY SHALL MAKE ANY NEGATIVE COMMENTS ABOUT THE OTHER NOR ALLOW ANYONE ELSE TO DO SO IN THE PRESENCE OF THE MINOR CHILD. THE MINOR CHILD SHALL NOT BE IN THE PRESENCE OF AMANDA GARDNER. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTINUE TO COMMUNICATE VIA TEXT MESSAGE AND THE PARTIES SHALL RESPOND TO EACH OTHER'S TEXT MESSAGES. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN THE PARTIES MAY BE USED AS EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES SHALL SUPPLY COPIES OF THEIR 2013 TAX RETURNS TO THEIR ATTORNEYS. IF EITHER PARTY BECOMES EMPLOYED BEFORE THE NEXT HEARING DATE, THEY SHALL FILE AND SERVE UPDATED INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR A HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 5/21/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL AMEND THE CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER TO REFLECT THE NEW HEARING DATE AND PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PARTIES PRESENT AND SUBMIT A COPY TO CLETS FOR ENTRY. MS. ROSENBERG WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 5/22/14 HEARING DATE AS TO THE PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED AGAINST HER ON 1/15/14 MR. CASTRO WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 5/22/14 HEARING DATE AS TO THE CONTEMPT FILED AGAINST HIM BY THE RESPONDENT. MILAN ROSENBURG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00AM RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM CAUSE CONTINUED TO 05/22/14 AT 9:00 AM CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14, CONTINUED PLAINTIFFS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 2/25/14 IN CASE R-1502-CV-100738 WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 5/21/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. BY COUNSEL THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
April 10, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear FOR HEARING ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear HEARING DATE 5/22/14 AT 9:00 |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION,, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION. RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. CAITLYN SULLIVAN APPEARS WITH MS. ANDERSON PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER: HEATHER MARTIN WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT AMANDA GARDNER, AMANDA MENZEL CAITLYN SULLIVAN SWORN AND TESTIFIED. MR. STEIN CALLS AMANDA GARDNER AND CAITLYN SULLIVAN UNDER 776 THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CASE R-1502-CV-100738 SHALL BE HEARD CONCURRENTLY TODAY WITH R-1502-FL-7727 COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS MATTERS SET FOR HEARING TODAY PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AND THE RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 2/25/14 ARE RELATED, THEREFORE THE COURT WILL HEAR THOSE MATTERS TODAY. ALL OTHER MATTERS ON CALENDAR SHALL BE SET FOR ANOTHER SPECIAL SETTING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE SUBPOENAED WITNESS TREVOR WILEY MAY BE RELEASED; HOWEVER HE IS STILL SUBJECT TO APPEAR WITHIN 15 MINUTES OF BEING CONTACTED. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MOTION FOR ADMITTING RESPONDENT'S EXHIBITS A,B AND C INTO EVIDENCE IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, MS. ANDERSON OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT S C BEING ADMITTED) MR. STEIN REQUESTS THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING DATED 3/29/13. MS. ANDERSON NOTES FOR THE RECORD THAT MR. STEIN HAS BEEN PUTTING ON HIS CASE SINCE 9:00 AM, AND IT'S NOW 2:00PM. MOTION FOR CALLING WITNESS HEATHER MARTIN OUT OF ORDER IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE WITNESS HEATHER MARTIN SHALL BE EXCUSED; HOWEVER SHE IS STILL SUBJECT TO RECALL. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON THE AMOUNT OF TIME LEFT IN THE DAY, THE PARTIES SHALL PICK A NEW SPECIAL SETTING DATE. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES CONTINUE TO HAVE THE SAME ISSUES THEY HAVE HAD IN THE PAST. THE PARTIES ARE ALLOWING THEIR PERSONAL FEELINGS ABOUT ONE ANOTHER TO EFFECT THEIR DECISIONS AND ACTIONS REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD. THE PARTIES MAY NOT LIKE EACH OTHER, HOWEVER THEY MUST LEARN TO CO-PARENT AND DO WHAT IS BEST FOR THE MINOR CHILD. THE COURT IS IMPRESSED WITH THE PETITIONER'S TESTIMONY REGARDING THE PARENTING CLASSES HE HAS TAKEN, HOWEVER THE PARTIES NEED TO START ACTING AND BEHAVING LIKE ABLE ADULT PARENTS. THE LAST THING THE COURT WANTS TO DO IS REMOVE THE CHILD FROM BOTH PARTIES. IN JANUARY THIS COURT ADMONISHED MS. SULLIVAN ABOUT HER ACTIONS AND BEHAVIOR AS WELL AS THE POSSIBLE CONSEQUENCES, HOWEVER MS. SULLIVAN IN ONE WAY OR ANOTHER APPEARS TO CONTINUALLY INVOLVE HERSELF IN MATTERS REGARDING THE PARTIES CHILD. THE COURT IS VERY DISTURBED BY THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE THAT MS. SULLIVAN UPDATED INFORMATION AT THE PEDIATRICIANS OFFICE, AND LISTED HERSELF AS MR. CASTRO'S WIFE AND CHILDS STEP-MOTHER. REMOVING THE RESPONDENT'S INFORMATION FROM DOCUMENTATION THAT IS RELIED ON BY PEDIATRICIANS OFFICE IS INEXCUSABLE. NOT ONLY IS THE INFORMATION ON THE DOCUMENT UNTRUE, MS. SULLIVAN HAS NO LEGAL RIGHT TO THE CHILD AND SHOULD NOT BE FILLING OUT ANY PAPERWORK. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PRESENTED SO FAR THE COURT DOES NOT BELIEVE THE CHILD IS IN ANY DANGER WITH EITHER PARENT, AND THE COURT SEES NO REASON MY THE PETITIONER'S VISITATION SHALL NO BE REINSTATED. THE MOST DISTURBING INFORMATION RECEIVED TODAY IS THE DOCUMENTATION FORGED BY MS. SULLIVAN, THEREFORE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT CAITLYN SULLIVAN SHALL NOT BE IN THE PRESENCE OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER ANY CIRCUMSTANCES NOR SHALL SHE BE INVOLVED IN ANY COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES. THE VISITATION ORDERS FROM 10/15/13 SHALL BE REINSTATED EXCEPT AS INDICATED BELOW. THE PETITIONER SHALL HAVE ALTERNATE WEEKEND VISITATION BEGINNING FRIDAY 4/11/14 AT 5:00PM UNTIL SUNDAY AT 5:00PM, AND EVERY OTHER WEEKEND THEREAFTER AFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE PETITIONER SHALL ALSO CONTINUE TO HAVE ONE OVERNIGHT VISITATION EVERY WEEK BEGINNING TUESDAY 4/15/14 AT 5:00 PM UNTIL WEDNESDAY AT 5:00PM, AND EVERY WEEK THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: IF EITHER PARTY BECOMES EMPLOYED THEY SHALL PROVIDE A COPY OF THEIR WORK SCHEDULE TO THE OTHER PARTY. IF THE PETITIONER CANNOT EXERCISE HIS VISITATION DUE TO EMPLOYMENT, THE MINOR CHILDREN SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE RESPONDENT. MO1004D: THE PETITIONER SHALL HAVE LIBERAL AND UNMONITORED PHONE CONTACT WITH THE MINOR CHILD. IN THE EVENT EITHER PARTY REQUIRES CHILD CARE FOR SIX HOURS OR MORE WHILE THE CHILD IS IN THEIR CUSTODY, THE OTHER PARENT SHALL BE GIVEN THE FIRST OPPORTUNITY WITH AS MUCH PRIOR NOTICE AS POSSIBLE TO CARE FOR THE CHILD BEFORE OTHER ARRANGEMENTS ARE MADE. THE MINOR CHILD SHALL NOT BE LEFT WITH A NON-PARENT OR A NON-GRANDPARENT. NEITHER PARTY SHALL MAKE ANY NEGATIVE COMMENTS ABOUT THE OTHER NOR ALLOW ANYONE ELSE TO DO SO IN THE PRESENCE OF THE MINOR CHILD. THE MINOR CHILD SHALL NOT BE IN THE PRESENCE OF AMANDA GARDNER. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTINUE TO COMMUNICATE VIA TEXT MESSAGE AND THE PARTIES SHALL RESPOND TO EACH OTHER'S TEXT MESSAGES. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN THE PARTIES MAY BE USED AS EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES SHALL SUPPLY COPIES OF THEIR 2013 TAX RETURNS TO THEIR ATTORNEYS. IF EITHER PARTY BECOMES EMPLOYED BEFORE THE NEXT HEARING DATE, THEY SHALL FILE AND SERVE UPDATED INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR A HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 5/21/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL AMEND THE CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER TO REFLECT THE NEW HEARING DATE AND PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PARTIES PRESENT AND SUBMIT A COPY TO CLETS FOR ENTRY. MS. ROSENBERG WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 5/22/14 HEARING DATE AS TO THE PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED AGAINST HER ON 1/15/14 MR. CASTRO WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 5/22/14 HEARING DATE AS TO THE CONTEMPT FILED AGAINST HIM BY THE RESPONDENT. MILAN ROSENBURG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00AM RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 5/22/14 AT 9:00 AM CAUSE CONTINUED TO 05/22/14 AT 9:00 AM CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14, CONTINUED PLAINTIFFS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 2/25/14 IN CASE R-1502-CV-100738 WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 5/21/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. BY COUNSEL THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
April 09, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 4/10/14 FOR: 1.COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUE OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION,CHILD SUPPORT 2.CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED 02/04/14 3.CONTINUED PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14. 4.CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 5.CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATOIN FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT CAN CONFIRM FOR HEARING. MR. STEIN WANTS IT NOTED THAT HE CAN CONFIRM, HOWEVER HE DOES HAVE SEVERAL CRIMINAL MATTER ON CALENDAR TODAY AS WELL. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO MR. STEIN SCHEDULE, COUNSEL THE MATTER SHALL BE SET AT 8:30 FOR COUNSEL ONLY TO ADDRESS WHAT MATTERS ARE GOING TO BE HEARD FIRST. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 04/10/14 AT 8:30 AM FOR ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING FOR COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUE OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED 02/04/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 09, 2014 | hearing |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
April 09, 2014 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 4/10/14 FOR: 1.COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUE OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION,CHILD SUPPORT 2.CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED 02/04/14 3.CONTINUED PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14. 4.CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 5.CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATOIN FILED ON 2/25/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT CAN CONFIRM FOR HEARING. MR. STEIN WANTS IT NOTED THAT HE CAN CONFIRM, HOWEVER HE DOES HAVE SEVERAL CRIMINAL MATTER ON CALENDAR TODAY AS WELL. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO MR. STEIN SCHEDULE, COUNSEL THE MATTER SHALL BE SET AT 8:30 FOR COUNSEL ONLY TO ADDRESS WHAT MATTERS ARE GOING TO BE HEARD FIRST. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 04/10/14 AT 8:30 AM FOR ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING FOR COURT TRIAL ON THE RESERVED ISSUE OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED 02/04/14, CONTINUED PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14, CONTINUED RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 02, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 4/2/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 02, 2014 | hearing |
4102 OSC re Contempt Hearing Entered. |
|
April 02, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
4102 OSC re Contempt Hearing Entered. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 4/2/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE ANDERSON APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 25, 2014 | hearing | Responsive Declaration | |
March 21, 2014 | hearing |
Witness List (FL-321) PETITIONERS |
|
March 21, 2014 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys FORMER ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER NEW ATTORNEY:LESLIE ANDERSON |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List (FL-321) PETITIONERS |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys FORMER ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER NEW ATTORNEY:LESLIE ANDERSON |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear FOR HEARING ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 REVIEW RE: PICKING NEW SPECIAL SETTING DATE FOR COURT TRIAL ON RESERVES ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTIONS RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MOTION FOR SETTING ALL MATTERS ON CALENDAR TODAY FOR A SPECIAL SETTING IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS CRIMINAL MATTERS PENDING AGAINST THE PETITIONER COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS POSSIBLE SPECIAL SETTING DATES PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR AN ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 4/9/14 AT 9:00 AM. MR. STEIN INFORMS COUNSEL AND THE COURT THAT HE COULD HAVE A POSSIBLE HEARING IN BAKERSFIELD FOR A MOTION ON A CRIMINAL MATTER, HOWEVER HE DOES NOT ANTICIPATE THAT HAPPENING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS SUBPOENAING OFFICERS FOR THE SPECIAL SETTING THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. STEIN SHALL NOTIFY COUNSEL AS SOON AS POSSIBLE IF HE IS UNABLE TO CONFIRM FOR HEARING ON 4/10/14. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT IS TROUBLED BY THE ALLEGATIONS AGAINST THE PETITIONER IN THE DECLARATION FILED BY THE RESPONDENT ON 2/25/14; AND UNTIL WE HAVE A HEARING ON THE MATTER THE COURT IS NOT GOING TO ALLOW THE PETITIONER ANY VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD, THEREFORE RESPONDENT SHALL CONTINUE TO HAVE TEMPORARY SOLE LEGAL AND SOLE PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD WITH NO VISITATION TO THE PETITIONER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. MR. CASTRO WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 4/10/14 HEARING RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM MS. ROSENBERG WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 4/10/14 HEARING MILAN ROSENBERG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM PARTIES STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER GLENNON HEARING THE MATTERS CAUSE CONTINUED TO 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING FOR COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTIONS, CONTINUED RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14, CONTINUED RESPONDENTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 AND CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/17, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 4/9/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. |
|
March 12, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear FOR HEARING ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14 REVIEW RE: PICKING NEW SPECIAL SETTING DATE FOR COURT TRIAL ON RESERVES ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTIONS RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LESLIE ANDERSON. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MOTION FOR SETTING ALL MATTERS ON CALENDAR TODAY FOR A SPECIAL SETTING IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MS. ANDERSON NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS CRIMINAL MATTERS PENDING AGAINST THE PETITIONER COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS POSSIBLE SPECIAL SETTING DATES PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR AN ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 4/9/14 AT 9:00 AM. MR. STEIN INFORMS COUNSEL AND THE COURT THAT HE COULD HAVE A POSSIBLE HEARING IN BAKERSFIELD FOR A MOTION ON A CRIMINAL MATTER, HOWEVER HE DOES NOT ANTICIPATE THAT HAPPENING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS SUBPOENAING OFFICERS FOR THE SPECIAL SETTING THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. STEIN SHALL NOTIFY COUNSEL AS SOON AS POSSIBLE IF HE IS UNABLE TO CONFIRM FOR HEARING ON 4/10/14. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT IS TROUBLED BY THE ALLEGATIONS AGAINST THE PETITIONER IN THE DECLARATION FILED BY THE RESPONDENT ON 2/25/14; AND UNTIL WE HAVE A HEARING ON THE MATTER THE COURT IS NOT GOING TO ALLOW THE PETITIONER ANY VISITATION WITH THE MINOR CHILD, THEREFORE RESPONDENT SHALL CONTINUE TO HAVE TEMPORARY SOLE LEGAL AND SOLE PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD WITH NO VISITATION TO THE PETITIONER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. MR. CASTRO WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 4/10/14 HEARING RUBEN CASTRO SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM MS. ROSENBERG WAIVES TIME PLUS 45 DAYS FROM THE 4/10/14 HEARING MILAN ROSENBERG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM PARTIES STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER GLENNON HEARING THE MATTERS CAUSE CONTINUED TO 4/10/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR ALL DAY SPECIAL SETTING FOR COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTIONS, CONTINUED RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14, CONTINUED RESPONDENTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14, CONTINUED PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 AND CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/17, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 4/9/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. |
|
March 10, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. NO SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED - PARTY IS IN PRO PER 2. #6 ON THE FL330 IS INCOMPLETE |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. NO SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED - PARTY IS IN PRO PER 2. #6 ON THE FL330 IS INCOMPLETE |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear HEARING ON 3/12/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 3/6/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MS. ANDERSON INFORMS THE COURT THAT SHE HAS HAD A CONSULTATION WITH MR. CASTRO AND HE INTENDS TO RETAIN HER AS COUNSEL THIS FRIDAY. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE MATTERS ON CALENDAR TODAY COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON 2/19/14 PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL MATTERS ON CALENDAR TODAY SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 3/12/14 FOR STATUS AND FURTHER SETTING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: ON 2/19/14 PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 WAS ON CALENDAR FOR HEARING, THE COURT DISMISSED COUNT ONE BASED ON MR. STEIN MOTION. THE COURT THEN TOOK THE OTHER TWO COUNTS UNDER SUBMISSION, WITH A RULING TO ISSUE TODAY. UPON REVIEW OF THE COURTS NOTES, IT APPEARS THAT MR. CASTRO WAS NOT GIVEN THE OPPORTUNITY TO PRESENT HIS CASE; THEREFORE THE COURT IS GOING TO ALLOW THE PETITIONER TO REOPEN ON THE REMAINING TWO COUNTS AND PRESENT FURTHER EVIDENCE AT THE CONTINUED HEARING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS RESPONDENTS 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. CASTRO SHALL BE ARRAIGNED TODAY ON THE CONTEMPT FILED BY THE RESPONDENT; HOWEVER THE HEARING SHALL BE CONTINUED TO NEXT WEEK WITH EVERYTHING ELSE. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) ALL COUNTS RUBEN CASTRO AND MILAN ROSENBERG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 3/12/14 AT 9:00 AM MR. STEIN INFORMS THE COURT THAT HE MAY NOT BE AVAILABLE ON 3/12/14, DUE TO POSSIBLE JURY TRIAL IN BAKERSFIELD NEXT WEEK. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 03/12/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR STATUS AND FURTHER SETTING ON: 1. CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION 2.CONTINED RESPONDENT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 3: CONTINUED PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14. 4. CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
March 05, 2014 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear HEARING ON 3/12/14 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 3/6/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTINUED CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTINUED MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MS. ANDERSON INFORMS THE COURT THAT SHE HAS HAD A CONSULTATION WITH MR. CASTRO AND HE INTENDS TO RETAIN HER AS COUNSEL THIS FRIDAY. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS THE MATTERS ON CALENDAR TODAY COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON 2/19/14 PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: ALL MATTERS ON CALENDAR TODAY SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 3/12/14 FOR STATUS AND FURTHER SETTING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: ON 2/19/14 PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 WAS ON CALENDAR FOR HEARING, THE COURT DISMISSED COUNT ONE BASED ON MR. STEIN MOTION. THE COURT THEN TOOK THE OTHER TWO COUNTS UNDER SUBMISSION, WITH A RULING TO ISSUE TODAY. UPON REVIEW OF THE COURTS NOTES, IT APPEARS THAT MR. CASTRO WAS NOT GIVEN THE OPPORTUNITY TO PRESENT HIS CASE; THEREFORE THE COURT IS GOING TO ALLOW THE PETITIONER TO REOPEN ON THE REMAINING TWO COUNTS AND PRESENT FURTHER EVIDENCE AT THE CONTINUED HEARING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS RESPONDENTS 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. CASTRO SHALL BE ARRAIGNED TODAY ON THE CONTEMPT FILED BY THE RESPONDENT; HOWEVER THE HEARING SHALL BE CONTINUED TO NEXT WEEK WITH EVERYTHING ELSE. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) ALL COUNTS RUBEN CASTRO AND MILAN ROSENBERG SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 3/12/14 AT 9:00 AM MR. STEIN INFORMS THE COURT THAT HE MAY NOT BE AVAILABLE ON 3/12/14, DUE TO POSSIBLE JURY TRIAL IN BAKERSFIELD NEXT WEEK. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 03/12/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR STATUS AND FURTHER SETTING ON: 1. CONTINUED COURT TRIAL ON RESERVED ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX EXEMPTION 2.CONTINED RESPONDENT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 2ND AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED ON 2/4/14 3: CONTINUED PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14. 4. CONTINUED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: BR |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
February 28, 2014 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
February 28, 2014 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO SERVED 02/25/14 | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO SERVED 02/25/14 | |
February 26, 2014 | hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (FL-300) WHAT:MODIF CC/V COURT DATE:3/12/14 COURT TIME:9:00AM COURT DEPT/DIV:BR |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR EX PARTE HEARING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: UPON REVIEW OF THE EX PARTE DECLARATIOAN AND REQUEST FOR HEARING BY THE RESPONDENT THE COURT GRANTS THE REQUEST BASED ON THE PLEADINGS. MOTHER SHALL HAVE TEMPORARY SOLE LEGAL AND SOLE PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD WITH NO VISITATION TO THE FATHER THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING WITH AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME. SERVICE MUST BE ON OR BEFORE 3/5/14, ANY RESPONSIVE DECLARATION SHALL BE SERVED ON OR BEFORE 3/10/14. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 3/12/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
Ex Parte Compliance HEARING DATE:02/26/14 HEARING TIME:1:15PM HEARING DIV/DEPT:BR |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
Ex Parte Application / Petition FOR:MODIFY CC/V HEARING DATE:02/26/14 HEARING TIME:1:15PM HEARING DEPT/DIV:BR |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12217. Receipt #764696 for amount of $205.00. |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12217. Receipt #764696 for amount of $205.00. |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 Amount of $85.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12217. Receipt #764696 for amount of $205.00. |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt PETITIONERS |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Compliance HEARING DATE:02/26/14 HEARING TIME:1:15PM HEARING DIV/DEPT:BR |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) WHAT:MODIF CC/V COURT DATE:3/12/14 COURT TIME:9:00AM COURT DEPT/DIV:BR |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR EX PARTE HEARING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: UPON REVIEW OF THE EX PARTE DECLARATIOAN AND REQUEST FOR HEARING BY THE RESPONDENT THE COURT GRANTS THE REQUEST BASED ON THE PLEADINGS. MOTHER SHALL HAVE TEMPORARY SOLE LEGAL AND SOLE PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD WITH NO VISITATION TO THE FATHER THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING WITH AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME. SERVICE MUST BE ON OR BEFORE 3/5/14, ANY RESPONSIVE DECLARATION SHALL BE SERVED ON OR BEFORE 3/10/14. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 3/12/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED ON 2/25/14. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12217. Receipt #764696 for amount of $205.00. |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application / Petition FOR:MODIFY CC/V HEARING DATE:02/26/14 HEARING TIME:1:15PM HEARING DEPT/DIV:BR |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12217. Receipt #764696 for amount of $205.00. |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 Amount of $85.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12217. Receipt #764696 for amount of $205.00. |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt PETITIONERS |
|
February 19, 2014 | hearing |
NP1105 FILED ON 1/16/14. Department: BR |
|
February 19, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
February 19, 2014 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED 01/15/14. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY FILED ON 1/30/14. PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. FILED ON 1/16/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS SERVICE OF PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 1/30/14. THE RESPONDENT WAIVES ANY DEFECT IN SERVICE OF THE PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 1/30/14. MOTION FOR EXCLUDING ANY WITNESSES FROM THE COURT ROOM IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY RESPONDENT NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) MOTION FOR CONTINUING THE PETITIONER REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 1/30/14 WITH AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, MR. CASTRO OBJECTS) PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM. MOTION FOR DROPPING THE REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. CASTRO, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) CAUSE DROPPED IN COURT RESPONDENT ACKNOWLEDGES HER RIGHTS AS ADVISED AND WAIVES SAID RIGHT. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) 1, 2, & 3. : THE PARTIES ARE READY TO PROCEED TODAY WITH THE CONTEMPT; MR. STEIN INFORMS THE COURT THAT HIS CLIENT WILL NOT BE TESTIFYING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS COUNT ONE. MOTION FOR DISMISSING COUNT ONE IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COUNT ONE OF PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 SHALL BE DISMISSED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: AS TO COUNTS TWO AND THREE OF THE PETITIONERS CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, THE MATTER SHALL BE TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION WITH A RULING TO BE GIVEN ON 3/5/14. RESPONDENT SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR RULING ON PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY FILED ON 1/30/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 19, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 21485797165. Receipt #763629 for amount of $30.00. |
|
February 19, 2014 | hearing |
4110 OSC Re Contempt (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
February 19, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Petitioner)
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1105 FILED ON 1/16/14. Department: BR |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED 01/15/14. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY FILED ON 1/30/14. PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. FILED ON 1/16/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS SERVICE OF PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 1/30/14. THE RESPONDENT WAIVES ANY DEFECT IN SERVICE OF THE PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 1/30/14. MOTION FOR EXCLUDING ANY WITNESSES FROM THE COURT ROOM IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY RESPONDENT NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) MOTION FOR CONTINUING THE PETITIONER REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON 1/30/14 WITH AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, MR. CASTRO OBJECTS) PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM. MOTION FOR DROPPING THE REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. CASTRO, NO OBJECTION BY MR. STEIN) CAUSE DROPPED IN COURT RESPONDENT ACKNOWLEDGES HER RIGHTS AS ADVISED AND WAIVES SAID RIGHT. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) 1, 2, & 3. : THE PARTIES ARE READY TO PROCEED TODAY WITH THE CONTEMPT; MR. STEIN INFORMS THE COURT THAT HIS CLIENT WILL NOT BE TESTIFYING. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS COUNT ONE. MOTION FOR DISMISSING COUNT ONE IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COUNT ONE OF PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14 SHALL BE DISMISSED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: AS TO COUNTS TWO AND THREE OF THE PETITIONERS CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, THE MATTER SHALL BE TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION WITH A RULING TO BE GIVEN ON 3/5/14. RESPONDENT SIGNS OWN RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE WITH A PROMISE TO APPEAR ON 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR RULING ON PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/15/14, PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED ON 1/17/14 AND PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY FILED ON 1/30/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 21485797165. Receipt #763629 for amount of $30.00. |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
4110 OSC Re Contempt (Pet) Hearing Entered. |
|
February 18, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED MISSING ATTACHMENT #8D TO FL410 |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED MISSING ATTACHMENT #8D TO FL410 |
|
February 11, 2014 | hearing |
Responsive Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
February 10, 2014 | hearing |
Mediation Report no agreement no recomendations |
|
February 10, 2014 | hearing |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear promise to appear on 3/5/14 at 9:00 am |
|
February 10, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - #1B INCOMPLETE |
|
February 10, 2014 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT 2ND AMENDED SERVED 02/06/14 | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report no agreement no recomendations |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Own Recognizance Release Received with a Promise to Appear promise to appear on 3/5/14 at 9:00 am |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - #1B INCOMPLETE |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT 2ND AMENDED SERVED 02/06/14 | |
February 04, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS SECOND AMENDED |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS SECOND AMENDED |
|
January 30, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) PETITIONERS OST GRANTED, SERVE BY 02/14/14 & RESPOND BY 02/18/14 MEDIATION SET FOR 02/19/14 AT 1:15PM |
|
January 30, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 21485795578. Receipt #760659 for amount of $30.00. |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 21485795578. Receipt #760659 for amount of $30.00. |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) PETITIONERS OST GRANTED, SERVE BY 02/14/14 & RESPOND BY 02/18/14 MEDIATION SET FOR 02/19/14 AT 1:15PM |
|
January 29, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance COURT DATE: 2/19/14 COURT TIME: 9:00 am COURT DEPT/DIV: br |
|
January 29, 2014 | hearing |
NP1105 FILED ON 1/8/14. Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. FILED ON 1/8/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS UPCOMING COURT HEARINGS. MOTION FOR CONTINUING THE MATTER TO 2/19/14 IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING ON 2/19/14 AT 9:00 AM. MR. STEIN INFORMS THE COURT THAT HE HAS A MATTER SET IN BAKERSFIELD ON 2/19/14 AND WILL NOT BE AVAILABLE UNTIL 1:30 PM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING AT 9:00 AM ON 2/19/14; HOWEVER IT WILL BE TRAILED UNTIL 1:30PM DUE TO MR. STEINS HEARING IN BAKERSFIELD. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 2/19/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED ON 1/18/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 29, 2014 | hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. |
|
January 29, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1105 FILED ON 1/8/14. Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. FILED ON 1/8/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS UPCOMING COURT HEARINGS. MOTION FOR CONTINUING THE MATTER TO 2/19/14 IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY THE PETITIONER) THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING ON 2/19/14 AT 9:00 AM. MR. STEIN INFORMS THE COURT THAT HE HAS A MATTER SET IN BAKERSFIELD ON 2/19/14 AND WILL NOT BE AVAILABLE UNTIL 1:30 PM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING AT 9:00 AM ON 2/19/14; HOWEVER IT WILL BE TRAILED UNTIL 1:30PM DUE TO MR. STEINS HEARING IN BAKERSFIELD. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 2/19/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED ON 1/18/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance COURT DATE: 2/19/14 COURT TIME: 9:00 am COURT DEPT/DIV: br |
|
January 28, 2014 | hearing |
Response to Temporary Restraining Order RESPONDENTS |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Temporary Restraining Order RESPONDENTS |
|
January 24, 2014 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing VOLUME #1 CLOSED ON 1/24/14 (date) FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 2/25/13 AND 12/27/13. VOLUME #2 OPENED FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BEGINNING 1/3/14. |
|
January 24, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL300 PAGE 1 MODIFY CHILD CUSTODY IS MARKED HOWEVER PAGE 2 MODIFY CHILD VISITATION IS MARKED - DOES NOT MATCH COURT CANT DETERMINE WHAT IS BEING ASKED. 2. FL300 PAGE 4 #9 INCOMPLETE- MANDATORY 3. ORDER SHORTENING TIME DECLARATION NOT ATTACHED 4. FL150 #3D INCOMPLETE 5. FL150 DOES NOT GET ATTACHED IF YOU ARE NOT ASKING FOR ANY FEES, COSTS OR SUPPORT |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing VOLUME #1 CLOSED ON 1/24/14 (date) FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 2/25/13 AND 12/27/13. VOLUME #2 OPENED FOR DOCUMENTS FILED BEGINNING 1/3/14. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL300 PAGE 1 MODIFY CHILD CUSTODY IS MARKED HOWEVER PAGE 2 MODIFY CHILD VISITATION IS MARKED - DOES NOT MATCH COURT CANT DETERMINE WHAT IS BEING ASKED. 2. FL300 PAGE 4 #9 INCOMPLETE- MANDATORY 3. ORDER SHORTENING TIME DECLARATION NOT ATTACHED 4. FL150 #3D INCOMPLETE 5. FL150 DOES NOT GET ATTACHED IF YOU ARE NOT ASKING FOR ANY FEES, COSTS OR SUPPORT |
|
January 23, 2014 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO SERVED 01/17/14 | |
January 23, 2014 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 01/21/14 | |
January 23, 2014 | hearing |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $1.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONERS. Receipt #759408 for amount of $1.00. Detail: 1 X $1.00 CHANGE $0.00. |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO SERVED 01/17/14 | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 01/21/14 | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $1.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONERS. Receipt #759408 for amount of $1.00. Detail: 1 X $1.00 CHANGE $0.00. |
|
January 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
January 22, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 1/28/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR TRIAL ON REMAINING ISSUED OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT. RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/8/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO JUDICIAL UNAVAILABILITY THE SPECIAL SETTING SCHEDULED FOR 1/28/14 CANNOT BE CONFIRMED, THEREFORE THE MATTER SHALL BE RESET. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 3/6/14 AT 9:00 AM IN DIVISION BR FOR TRIAL ON REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT AND RESPONDENTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/8/14 WITH CONFIRMATION ON 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PARTIES MAY APPEAR BY PHONE FOR THE CONFIRMATION HEARING ONLY. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 3/6/14 AT 9:00 AM IN DIVISION BR FOR TRIAL ON REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT AND RESPONDENTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/8/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 22, 2014 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 01/21/14 | |
January 22, 2014 | hearing |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
January 22, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 22, 2014 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 1/28/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR TRIAL ON REMAINING ISSUED OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT. RESPONDENT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/8/14. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROGER I STEIN APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO JUDICIAL UNAVAILABILITY THE SPECIAL SETTING SCHEDULED FOR 1/28/14 CANNOT BE CONFIRMED, THEREFORE THE MATTER SHALL BE RESET. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 3/6/14 AT 9:00 AM IN DIVISION BR FOR TRIAL ON REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT AND RESPONDENTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/8/14 WITH CONFIRMATION ON 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PARTIES MAY APPEAR BY PHONE FOR THE CONFIRMATION HEARING ONLY. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 3/5/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR CONFIRMATION OF HALF DAY SPECIAL SETTING ON 3/6/14 AT 9:00 AM IN DIVISION BR FOR TRIAL ON REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT AND RESPONDENTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 1/8/14. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1045 Department: BR |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
4140 Confirm Special Setting Hearing Entered. |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 01/21/14 | |
January 21, 2014 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
January 21, 2014 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO & OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 01/17/14 | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO & OSC RE: CONTEMPT SERVED 01/17/14 | |
January 17, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS AMENDED OSC RE: CONTEMPT |
|
January 17, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONDENTS INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION - REJECTED BECAUSE #16B INCOMPLETE - MANDATORY FIELD. |
|
January 17, 2014 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration PETITIONERS |
|
January 17, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order (FL-300) PETITIONERS |
|
January 17, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER. Receipt #758854 for amount of $30.00. Detail: 2 X $5.00 1 X $20.00 CHANGE $0.00. |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONDENTS INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION - REJECTED BECAUSE #16B INCOMPLETE - MANDATORY FIELD. |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS AMENDED OSC RE: CONTEMPT |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration PETITIONERS |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER. Receipt #758854 for amount of $30.00. Detail: 2 X $5.00 1 X $20.00 CHANGE $0.00. |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) PETITIONERS |
|
January 15, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt PETITIONERS |
|
January 15, 2014 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PETITIONERS |
|
January 15, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 21485790077. Receipt #758346 for amount of $30.00. |
|
January 15, 2014 | hearing |
Request to Waive Court Fees PETITIONERS |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt PETITIONERS |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 21485790077. Receipt #758346 for amount of $30.00. |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PETITIONERS |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees PETITIONERS |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) next hearing date is 1/29/14 |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: PETITIONER'S EX PARTE HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY PRESENTED THE COURT FINDS THE SITUATION IN QUESTION IS NOT AN EMERGENCY. THEREFORE, THE REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY ORDERS SHALL BE DENIED AT THIS TIME. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE REQUEST FOR A DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING ON 1/29/14 AT 9:00 AM. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 1/29/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED ON 1/8/14. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL PREPARE THE NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PETITIONER. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
4037 Ex Parte Hearing Entered. |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) next hearing date is 1/29/14 |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: PETITIONER'S EX PARTE HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED ON THE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY PRESENTED THE COURT FINDS THE SITUATION IN QUESTION IS NOT AN EMERGENCY. THEREFORE, THE REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY ORDERS SHALL BE DENIED AT THIS TIME. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE REQUEST FOR A DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL BE SET FOR HEARING ON 1/29/14 AT 9:00 AM. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 1/29/14 AT 9:00 AM FOR PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED ON 1/8/14. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK SHALL PREPARE THE NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROVIDE A COPY TO THE PETITIONER. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
4037 Ex Parte Hearing Entered. |
|
January 07, 2014 | hearing |
NP1085 Department: NONE Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: PETITIONERS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST CLERK REFERRED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST TO THE COURT. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: DO TO THE ALLEGATIONS STATED IN THE ATTACHED DECLARATION TO THE PETITIONERS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST THIS MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR AN EX PARTE HEARING ON 01/08/14 AT 1:30PM. THE COURT CLERK SHALL NOTIFY BOTH PARTIES AND OR ATTORNEYS OF THE EX PARTE HEARING. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 01/08/14 AT 1:30PM FOR EX PARTE ON PETITIONERS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST. AFTER REVIEW BY THE COURT BOTH PARTIES AND OR ATTORNEY HAS BEEN NOTIFIED BY THE COURT CLERK TODAY 01/07/14 AT 9:43AM AND 9:50AM OF THE EX PARTE HEARING CALENDARED FOR 01/08/14. |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: NONE Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: PETITIONERS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST CLERK REFERRED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST TO THE COURT. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: DO TO THE ALLEGATIONS STATED IN THE ATTACHED DECLARATION TO THE PETITIONERS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST THIS MATTER SHALL BE SET FOR AN EX PARTE HEARING ON 01/08/14 AT 1:30PM. THE COURT CLERK SHALL NOTIFY BOTH PARTIES AND OR ATTORNEYS OF THE EX PARTE HEARING. TIME SET FOR HEARING: 01/08/14 AT 1:30PM FOR EX PARTE ON PETITIONERS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST. AFTER REVIEW BY THE COURT BOTH PARTIES AND OR ATTORNEY HAS BEEN NOTIFIED BY THE COURT CLERK TODAY 01/07/14 AT 9:43AM AND 9:50AM OF THE EX PARTE HEARING CALENDARED FOR 01/08/14. |
|
January 06, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order PETITIONERS |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order PETITIONERS |
|
January 03, 2014 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONDENTS OSC RE: CONTEMPT - COMMISSIONER DPG DECLINED TO SIGN THE CONTEMPT BECAUSE THE LAST COUNT OF THE CONTEMPT IS OUT DO TO THE TIME FRAME. |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONDENTS OSC RE: CONTEMPT - COMMISSIONER DPG DECLINED TO SIGN THE CONTEMPT BECAUSE THE LAST COUNT OF THE CONTEMPT IS OUT DO TO THE TIME FRAME. |
|
January 02, 2014 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12060. Receipt #756266 for amount of $90.00. |
|
January 02, 2014 | hearing |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12060. Receipt #756266 for amount of $90.00. |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12060. Receipt #756266 for amount of $90.00. |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 12060. Receipt #756266 for amount of $90.00. |
|
December 27, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RFO-FL-300 DOES NOT ADDRESS CHILD CUSTODY. REMOVE "PENDING" FROM FL-300 #2, #1 FL-300INCOMPLETE, NO OST DECLARATION ROAH IS ONLY ATTACHED IF IT IS FROM ANOTHER CASE. THIS ROAH IS FROM THIS CASE AND IS IN THE FILE. FYI- YOU ARE STILL ASKING FOR A STAY AWAY WHICH IS DONE IN A CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RFO-FL-300 DOES NOT ADDRESS CHILD CUSTODY. REMOVE "PENDING" FROM FL-300 #2, #1 FL-300INCOMPLETE, NO OST DECLARATION ROAH IS ONLY ATTACHED IF IT IS FROM ANOTHER CASE. THIS ROAH IS FROM THIS CASE AND IS IN THE FILE. FYI- YOU ARE STILL ASKING FOR A STAY AWAY WHICH IS DONE IN A CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
December 26, 2013 | hearing |
Proposed Judgment for status only from hearing on 11/20/13 |
|
December 26, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RFO-CAPTION AND FL-300 DO NOT ADDRESS CUSTODY, HOWEVER FL-311 HAS ADDRESSED CUSTODY. FL-300 #2B NEEDS A DATE WHEN THE JUDICIAL OFFICER MADE THE ORDER. WHY IS THERE AN ROAH ATTACHED? THIS IS ALREADY IN OUR FILE AS IT HAS THE SAME CASE NUMBER. YOU ARE ASKING FOR A "STAY AWAY" THAT IS DONE WITH A CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
December 26, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice CONTEMPT - $90.00 FEE -THERE WAS A CONTEMPT FILED 10/24/13 WHICH WAS ALSO CALENDARED 11/6/13 WHICH THAT RECIEPT WAS FOR. |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment for status only from hearing on 11/20/13 |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice CONTEMPT - $90.00 FEE -THERE WAS A CONTEMPT FILED 10/24/13 WHICH WAS ALSO CALENDARED 11/6/13 WHICH THAT RECIEPT WAS FOR. |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RFO-CAPTION AND FL-300 DO NOT ADDRESS CUSTODY, HOWEVER FL-311 HAS ADDRESSED CUSTODY. FL-300 #2B NEEDS A DATE WHEN THE JUDICIAL OFFICER MADE THE ORDER. WHY IS THERE AN ROAH ATTACHED? THIS IS ALREADY IN OUR FILE AS IT HAS THE SAME CASE NUMBER. YOU ARE ASKING FOR A "STAY AWAY" THAT IS DONE WITH A CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
December 02, 2013 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys FORMER ATTORNEY:ROBERT F. CARBONE NEW ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys FORMER ATTORNEY:ROBERT F. CARBONE NEW ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER |
|
November 20, 2013 | hearing |
NP1860 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CHAMBERS CONFERENCE ON THE MATTER AND WAIVE THE VERBATIM RECORD OF THE CHAMBERS CONFERENCE. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES SHALL KEEP ANY BELONGS THEY CURRENTLY HAVE IN THEIR POSSESSION AS THEIR OWN PROPERTY. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: SPOUSAL SUPPORT SHALL BE TERMINATED AS TO BOTH PARTIES PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED SPECIAL SETTING ON 1/28/14 FOR A COURT TRIAL ON THE REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 1/22/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COUNSEL MAY APPEAR BY PHONE FOR THE CONFIRMATION HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES SHALL FILE AND SERVE UPDATED INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS TEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE SPECIAL SETTING. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED - STATUS ONLY. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - RESPONDENT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). CAUSE CONTINUED TO 1/28/14 9:00 AM FOR COURT TRIAL ON THE REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 1/22/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. MR. CARBONE TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 20, 2013 | hearing |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
November 20, 2013 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1860 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CHAMBERS CONFERENCE ON THE MATTER AND WAIVE THE VERBATIM RECORD OF THE CHAMBERS CONFERENCE. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES SHALL KEEP ANY BELONGS THEY CURRENTLY HAVE IN THEIR POSSESSION AS THEIR OWN PROPERTY. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: SPOUSAL SUPPORT SHALL BE TERMINATED AS TO BOTH PARTIES PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED SPECIAL SETTING ON 1/28/14 FOR A COURT TRIAL ON THE REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 1/22/14 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COUNSEL MAY APPEAR BY PHONE FOR THE CONFIRMATION HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES SHALL FILE AND SERVE UPDATED INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS TEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE SPECIAL SETTING. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED - STATUS ONLY. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - RESPONDENT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). CAUSE CONTINUED TO 1/28/14 9:00 AM FOR COURT TRIAL ON THE REMAINING ISSUES OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT, WITH CONFIRMATION HEARING ON 1/22/14 AT 9:00 AM FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. MR. CARBONE TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
November 15, 2013 | hearing |
NP1820 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE CLERK NOTES THAT THE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING DATED 3/29/13 CONNFLICTS WITH THE RULING MADE ON 10/15/13. THE MATTER IS REFFERED TO THE COURT. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE CLERK IS TO PREPARE A 2ND AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING BIFURCATING CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE EACH PARTY WITH A CERTIFIED COPY AND SUBMIT IT FOR ENTRY INTO CLETS. |
|
November 15, 2013 | hearing |
Protective Order Entered into CLETS System 2ND AMENDED |
|
November 15, 2013 | hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS 2ND AMENDED |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE CLERK NOTES THAT THE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING DATED 3/29/13 CONNFLICTS WITH THE RULING MADE ON 10/15/13. THE MATTER IS REFFERED TO THE COURT. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE CLERK IS TO PREPARE A 2ND AMENDED RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING BIFURCATING CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE EACH PARTY WITH A CERTIFIED COPY AND SUBMIT IT FOR ENTRY INTO CLETS. |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Entered into CLETS System 2ND AMENDED |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS 2ND AMENDED |
|
November 13, 2013 | hearing |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
November 08, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL410 MISSING PAGES 3 & 4 2. FL411 SUMMARY OF CONTEMPT BOX IS INCOMPLETE 3. FL150 PAGE 1 # OF PAGES ATTACHED INCOMPLETE |
|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL410 MISSING PAGES 3 & 4 2. FL411 SUMMARY OF CONTEMPT BOX IS INCOMPLETE 3. FL150 PAGE 1 # OF PAGES ATTACHED INCOMPLETE |
|
November 07, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Continuance HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/20/13 |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/20/13 |
|
November 06, 2013 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
November 06, 2013 | hearing |
NP1440 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 10/24/13 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. ROGER STEIN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ROBERT F CARBONE ON BEHALF OF RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN ESQ APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). MR. STEIN REPRESENTS THAT HE HAS SPOKEN WITH OPPOSING COUNSEL AND THEY AGREE TO CONTINUE THE MATTER FOR TWO WEEKS. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON COUNSELS REPRESENTATIONS THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 11/20/13 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF AN AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED BY THE RESPONDENT; THEREFORE THE CONTEMPT THAT WAS ON CALENDAR TODAY SHALL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE RULING MADE BY THIS COURT ON 10/15/13 DID NOT INDICATE WHAT DATE SUPPORT WOULD BE SET AT ZERO, BASED ON THE PLEADING THE ZERO ORDER FOR SUPPORT SHALL BE EFFECTIVE RETROACTIVE TO 9/1/13. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. STEIN SHALL PROVIDE NOTICE OF THE CONTINUED HEARING. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 11/20/2013 AT 9:00 AM FOR MSC/TRIAL SETTING ON THE REMAINING ISSUES. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 06, 2013 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: BR |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1440 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CONTEMPT FILED ON 10/24/13 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. ROGER STEIN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ROBERT F CARBONE ON BEHALF OF RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1). ROGER I STEIN ESQ APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1). MR. STEIN REPRESENTS THAT HE HAS SPOKEN WITH OPPOSING COUNSEL AND THEY AGREE TO CONTINUE THE MATTER FOR TWO WEEKS. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON COUNSELS REPRESENTATIONS THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 11/20/13 AT 9:00 AM. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF AN AMENDED CONTEMPT FILED BY THE RESPONDENT; THEREFORE THE CONTEMPT THAT WAS ON CALENDAR TODAY SHALL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE RULING MADE BY THIS COURT ON 10/15/13 DID NOT INDICATE WHAT DATE SUPPORT WOULD BE SET AT ZERO, BASED ON THE PLEADING THE ZERO ORDER FOR SUPPORT SHALL BE EFFECTIVE RETROACTIVE TO 9/1/13. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. STEIN SHALL PROVIDE NOTICE OF THE CONTINUED HEARING. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 11/20/2013 AT 9:00 AM FOR MSC/TRIAL SETTING ON THE REMAINING ISSUES. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 05, 2013 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENT'S |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration RESPONDENT'S |
|
October 24, 2013 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re Contempt RESPONDENTS |
|
October 23, 2013 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11904. Receipt #744754 for amount of $30.00. |
|
October 23, 2013 | hearing |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11896. Receipt #744753 for amount of $60.00. |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11896. Receipt #744753 for amount of $60.00. |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11904. Receipt #744754 for amount of $30.00. |
|
October 22, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONDENTS OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED BECAUSE $30.00 COURT REPORT FEE NOT SUBMITTED |
|
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONDENTS OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED BECAUSE $30.00 COURT REPORT FEE NOT SUBMITTED |
|
October 17, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED -COMMISSIONER GLENNON DECLINE TO SIGN THE OSC RE: CONTEMPT DO TO FL411 #1A 2ND COLUMN DOES NOT LIST DATE THE ORDER WAS FILED. |
|
October 17, 2013 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11885. Receipt #743928 for amount of $30.00. |
|
October 17, 2013 | hearing |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11876. Receipt #743927 for amount of $60.00. |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED -COMMISSIONER GLENNON DECLINE TO SIGN THE OSC RE: CONTEMPT DO TO FL411 #1A 2ND COLUMN DOES NOT LIST DATE THE ORDER WAS FILED. |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11885. Receipt #743928 for amount of $30.00. |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 Amount of $60.00 for ROSENBERG, MILAN (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 11876. Receipt #743927 for amount of $60.00. |
|
October 15, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. NO COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30 PROVIDED 2. NOT DATED BY PARTY ON FL411 3. CASE NUMBER INCORRECT |
|
October 15, 2013 | hearing |
NP1820 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. COURT HAS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION THE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND VISITATION AT THE HEARING ON OCTOBER 2, 2013. THE ISSUE OF TAX EXEMPTIONS WAS CONTINUED TO THE TRIAL DATE. FINDINGS: FATHER TESTIFIED THAT HE IS NOT NOW EMPLOYED, BUT IS ACTIVELY SEEKING EDUCATION TO IMPROVE HIS SKILLS. HE IS SEEKING WORK IN SOME TEMPORARY JOBS, BUT WITH NO SUCCESS, YET. HE NOW RECEIVES UNEMPLOYMENT INCOME OF $1,950 PER MONTH. FATHER SUBMITTED AN INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION. HE WAS LAID OFF FROM THE BRIGGS MINING CO. IN JULY 2013. AT THAT TIME HIS GROSS MONTHLY INCOME WAS $8,000 + . HE IS 32 YEARS OLD AND HAS A HIGH SCHOOL EDUCATION. THIS IS A LARGE INCOME FOR HIS AGE AND EDUCATIONAL BACKGROUND. THIS SPEAKS GREATLY OF HIS SKILLS AND ABILITIES TO EARN A GOOD LIVING. NO REQUEST FOR IMPUTING OF INCOME WAS MADE BY THE MOTHER; HOWEVER, THE COURT WILL MAKE SOME DETERMINATION IN THIS CASE. FATHER WANTS A CHANGE IN THE AMOUNT OF ORDERED CHILD SUPPORT DUE TO HIS CHANGE OF CIRCUMSTANCE. FATHER ALSO WANTS A CHANGE IN THE PERCENTAGE OF HIS VISITATION TIME WITH HIS DAUGHTER, CALAIT ROSENBERG-CASTRO, DATE OF BIRTH 11-3-2011, AGE 1 YEAR AND 10 MONTHS. HE STATES THAT HE HAS MORE AT HOME TIME DUE TO HIS UNEMPLOYMENT STATUS. FATHER WAS FOUND TO HAVE COMMITTED A DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ACT AGAINST MOTHER, SEE ORDERS SIGNED MARCH 29, 2013. FATHER WAS GRANTED VISITATION AMOUNTING TO 15% NCP TIME. THE VISITATIONS WERE UNSUPERVISED, BUT NO OVERNIGHTS. BOTH MOTHER AND FATHER APPEAR TO BE IN GOOD HEALTH. THEY EXPRESSED THEMSELVES WELL IN COURT. CLEARLY, THEY BOTH CARE FOR THE CHILD BUT HAVE A DIFFICULT TIME DEALING WITH EACH OTHER. THEY HAVE A SERIOUS PROBLEM WITH CO-PARENTING. BOTH HAVE CHILDREN WITH OTHER PERSONS. IT IS CLEAR THEIR LIVES ARE COMPLEX AND STRESSFUL. TODAY'S TESTIMONY DID NOT REVEAL ANY ABUSE TO THE CHILD BY EITHER PARENT. THERE WAS NO PROOF OF ALCOHOL ABUSE BY EITHER PARENT. THERE WERE MULTIPLE ATTEMPTS BY BOTH PARENTS TO SMEAR THE OTHER'S REPUTATION RELATIVE TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS. THE MOTHER HAS SOLE PHYSICAL CUSTODY, WITH JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY WITH THE FATHER. THIS STATUS AROSE FROM THE DV FINDINGS AND ORDERS. THE PARTIES ARE NOT GETTING ALONG, AT ALL. THIS PERSONAL SITUATION IS IMPACTING HOW THE PARTIES TREAT THE CHILD. DECISIONS RANGING FROM WHO THE DOCTOR SHOULD BE TO THE LENGTH OF THE CHILD'S HAIR HAVE BECOME BITTER EVENTS. BOTH PARTIES ARE RESISTIVE TO ANY COUNSELING WHATSOEVER. THE COURT BELIEVES THAT COUNSELING WILL ASSIST THEM IN BECOMING BETTER PARENTS AND OBTAIN AN AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF THE CHILD AND THEIR NEW RELATIONSHIP. THE COURT BELIEVES THAT THE FATHER SHOULD HAVE MORE TIME WITH HIS DAUGHTER AS THE STATE POLICY IS TO ENCOURAGE, WHEN APPROPRIATE, A CONTINUING AND CONSTANT CONTACT BETWEEN THE PARENTS AND THE CHILD IN ORDER KEEP AND FOSTER THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN PARENT AND CHILD. IN ITS DECISIONS, THE COURT DOES CONSIDER ALL THE EVIDENCE RECEIVED AT THE HEARING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: CUSTODY: NO CHANGES. VISITATION: THE FATHER SHALL HAVE ALTERNATE WEEKENDS BEGINNING ON OCTOBER 18, 2013 AT 5PM ON FRIDAY TO 5PM ON SUNDAY; PLUS, ONE OVERNIGHT PER WEEK BEGINNING OCTOBER 22, 2013 FROM 5PM ON TUESDAY TO 5PM ON WEDNESDAY; PLUS, ALTERNATE HOLIDAYS DURING THE YEAR BEGINNING ON VETERAN'S DAY, NOVEMBER 11, 2013. IF THE HOLIDAY FALLS ON THE BEGINNING OR THE END OF THE DESIGNATED WEEKEND, THEN THE FATHER'S VISITATION EXTENDS TO 5PM ON THAT DAY. THE OTHER HOLIDAYS OF THE YEAR TO BE SPLIT ARE AS FOLLOWS: , THANKSGIVING DAY, CHRISTMAS DAY, NEW YEAR'S DAY, MEMORIAL DAY, JULY FOURTH AND LABOR DAY AND COLUMBUS DAY. THE COURT SPECIFICALLY MAKES NO MENTION OF SPRING BREAK, FRIDAY AFTER THANKSGIVING, CHRISTMAS BREAK DUE TO THE AGE OF THE CHILD. CHILD SUPPORT: SEE ATTACHED DISSO MASTER. NCP IS 30%. THIS NUMBER DETERMINED BY THE AMOUNT OF DAYS OF CUSTODY (110 ) DIVIDED BY 365 DAYS. THE MONTHLY AMOUNT OF CHILD SUPPORT DETERMINED BY THE DISSO MASTER IS $168.00. HOWEVER BASED ON THE COURT'S COMMENTS REGARDING HIS ABILITY TO SEEK AND OBTAIN A LARGE MONTHLY INCOME, THE AMOUNT OF CHILD SUPPORT WILL BE SET AT "ZERO". COUNSELING: THE COURT ORDERS THAT BOTH PARENTS ATTEND 16 WEEKS OF PARENTING CLASSES. THEY ARE TO BEGIN THE CLASSES WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER AND PROVIDE PROOF TO EACH OTHER OF THEIR ENTRY AND COMPLETION. |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice OSC RE: CONTEMPT - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. NO COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30 PROVIDED 2. NOT DATED BY PARTY ON FL411 3. CASE NUMBER INCORRECT |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. COURT HAS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION THE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND VISITATION AT THE HEARING ON OCTOBER 2, 2013. THE ISSUE OF TAX EXEMPTIONS WAS CONTINUED TO THE TRIAL DATE. FINDINGS: FATHER TESTIFIED THAT HE IS NOT NOW EMPLOYED, BUT IS ACTIVELY SEEKING EDUCATION TO IMPROVE HIS SKILLS. HE IS SEEKING WORK IN SOME TEMPORARY JOBS, BUT WITH NO SUCCESS, YET. HE NOW RECEIVES UNEMPLOYMENT INCOME OF $1,950 PER MONTH. FATHER SUBMITTED AN INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION. HE WAS LAID OFF FROM THE BRIGGS MINING CO. IN JULY 2013. AT THAT TIME HIS GROSS MONTHLY INCOME WAS $8,000 + . HE IS 32 YEARS OLD AND HAS A HIGH SCHOOL EDUCATION. THIS IS A LARGE INCOME FOR HIS AGE AND EDUCATIONAL BACKGROUND. THIS SPEAKS GREATLY OF HIS SKILLS AND ABILITIES TO EARN A GOOD LIVING. NO REQUEST FOR IMPUTING OF INCOME WAS MADE BY THE MOTHER; HOWEVER, THE COURT WILL MAKE SOME DETERMINATION IN THIS CASE. FATHER WANTS A CHANGE IN THE AMOUNT OF ORDERED CHILD SUPPORT DUE TO HIS CHANGE OF CIRCUMSTANCE. FATHER ALSO WANTS A CHANGE IN THE PERCENTAGE OF HIS VISITATION TIME WITH HIS DAUGHTER, CALAIT ROSENBERG-CASTRO, DATE OF BIRTH 11-3-2011, AGE 1 YEAR AND 10 MONTHS. HE STATES THAT HE HAS MORE AT HOME TIME DUE TO HIS UNEMPLOYMENT STATUS. FATHER WAS FOUND TO HAVE COMMITTED A DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ACT AGAINST MOTHER, SEE ORDERS SIGNED MARCH 29, 2013. FATHER WAS GRANTED VISITATION AMOUNTING TO 15% NCP TIME. THE VISITATIONS WERE UNSUPERVISED, BUT NO OVERNIGHTS. BOTH MOTHER AND FATHER APPEAR TO BE IN GOOD HEALTH. THEY EXPRESSED THEMSELVES WELL IN COURT. CLEARLY, THEY BOTH CARE FOR THE CHILD BUT HAVE A DIFFICULT TIME DEALING WITH EACH OTHER. THEY HAVE A SERIOUS PROBLEM WITH CO-PARENTING. BOTH HAVE CHILDREN WITH OTHER PERSONS. IT IS CLEAR THEIR LIVES ARE COMPLEX AND STRESSFUL. TODAY'S TESTIMONY DID NOT REVEAL ANY ABUSE TO THE CHILD BY EITHER PARENT. THERE WAS NO PROOF OF ALCOHOL ABUSE BY EITHER PARENT. THERE WERE MULTIPLE ATTEMPTS BY BOTH PARENTS TO SMEAR THE OTHER'S REPUTATION RELATIVE TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS. THE MOTHER HAS SOLE PHYSICAL CUSTODY, WITH JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY WITH THE FATHER. THIS STATUS AROSE FROM THE DV FINDINGS AND ORDERS. THE PARTIES ARE NOT GETTING ALONG, AT ALL. THIS PERSONAL SITUATION IS IMPACTING HOW THE PARTIES TREAT THE CHILD. DECISIONS RANGING FROM WHO THE DOCTOR SHOULD BE TO THE LENGTH OF THE CHILD'S HAIR HAVE BECOME BITTER EVENTS. BOTH PARTIES ARE RESISTIVE TO ANY COUNSELING WHATSOEVER. THE COURT BELIEVES THAT COUNSELING WILL ASSIST THEM IN BECOMING BETTER PARENTS AND OBTAIN AN AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF THE CHILD AND THEIR NEW RELATIONSHIP. THE COURT BELIEVES THAT THE FATHER SHOULD HAVE MORE TIME WITH HIS DAUGHTER AS THE STATE POLICY IS TO ENCOURAGE, WHEN APPROPRIATE, A CONTINUING AND CONSTANT CONTACT BETWEEN THE PARENTS AND THE CHILD IN ORDER KEEP AND FOSTER THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN PARENT AND CHILD. IN ITS DECISIONS, THE COURT DOES CONSIDER ALL THE EVIDENCE RECEIVED AT THE HEARING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: CUSTODY: NO CHANGES. VISITATION: THE FATHER SHALL HAVE ALTERNATE WEEKENDS BEGINNING ON OCTOBER 18, 2013 AT 5PM ON FRIDAY TO 5PM ON SUNDAY; PLUS, ONE OVERNIGHT PER WEEK BEGINNING OCTOBER 22, 2013 FROM 5PM ON TUESDAY TO 5PM ON WEDNESDAY; PLUS, ALTERNATE HOLIDAYS DURING THE YEAR BEGINNING ON VETERAN'S DAY, NOVEMBER 11, 2013. IF THE HOLIDAY FALLS ON THE BEGINNING OR THE END OF THE DESIGNATED WEEKEND, THEN THE FATHER'S VISITATION EXTENDS TO 5PM ON THAT DAY. THE OTHER HOLIDAYS OF THE YEAR TO BE SPLIT ARE AS FOLLOWS: , THANKSGIVING DAY, CHRISTMAS DAY, NEW YEAR'S DAY, MEMORIAL DAY, JULY FOURTH AND LABOR DAY AND COLUMBUS DAY. THE COURT SPECIFICALLY MAKES NO MENTION OF SPRING BREAK, FRIDAY AFTER THANKSGIVING, CHRISTMAS BREAK DUE TO THE AGE OF THE CHILD. CHILD SUPPORT: SEE ATTACHED DISSO MASTER. NCP IS 30%. THIS NUMBER DETERMINED BY THE AMOUNT OF DAYS OF CUSTODY (110 ) DIVIDED BY 365 DAYS. THE MONTHLY AMOUNT OF CHILD SUPPORT DETERMINED BY THE DISSO MASTER IS $168.00. HOWEVER BASED ON THE COURT'S COMMENTS REGARDING HIS ABILITY TO SEEK AND OBTAIN A LARGE MONTHLY INCOME, THE AMOUNT OF CHILD SUPPORT WILL BE SET AT "ZERO". COUNSELING: THE COURT ORDERS THAT BOTH PARENTS ATTEND 16 WEEKS OF PARENTING CLASSES. THEY ARE TO BEGIN THE CLASSES WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER AND PROVIDE PROOF TO EACH OTHER OF THEIR ENTRY AND COMPLETION. |
|
October 09, 2013 | hearing |
Findings and Orders FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM 4/24/13 |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM 4/24/13 |
|
October 02, 2013 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
October 02, 2013 | hearing |
NP1860 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER ORDERS FILED ON 8/28/13. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS ISSUES BEFORE THE COURT TODAY. MR. STEIN REPRESENTS THAT HE WOULD LIKE A CONTINUANCE BECAUSE HE INTENDS TO FILE CONTEMPT AGAINST THE PETITIONER. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT WILL HEAR THE ISSUES OF CHILD SUPPORT MODIFICATION AND VISITATION TODAY. MOTION FOR EXCLUDING ANY WITNESS IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MR. CARBONE) MR. CARBONE CALLS MILAN ROSENBERG UNDER 776 THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE RESPONDENT SHALL PROVIDE THE PETITIONER WITH A COPY OF THE CHILDS MEDICAL INSURANCE CARD. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT CAITLYN SULLIVAN MOTION FOR ADMITTING PETITIONERS EXHIBITS 1-10 INTO EVIDENCE IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. CARBONE, MR. STEIN OBJECTS) PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: RESPONDENTS EXHIBITS A AND B SHALL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MR. STEIN CALLS MR. CASTRO UNDER 776 . PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES MOST RECENT INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS SHALL COME INTO EVIDENCE SUBJECT TO CROSS EXAMINATION. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION WITH A RULING TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: AS TO THE MSC/ TRIAL SETTING THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 11/6/13 AT 9:00 AM. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 11/6/13 AT 9:00 AM FOR MSC/TRIAL SETTING ON ALL REMAINING ISSUES. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
October 02, 2013 | hearing |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. |
|
October 02, 2013 | hearing |
Review
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: BR |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1860 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER ORDERS FILED ON 8/28/13. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS ISSUES BEFORE THE COURT TODAY. MR. STEIN REPRESENTS THAT HE WOULD LIKE A CONTINUANCE BECAUSE HE INTENDS TO FILE CONTEMPT AGAINST THE PETITIONER. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT WILL HEAR THE ISSUES OF CHILD SUPPORT MODIFICATION AND VISITATION TODAY. MOTION FOR EXCLUDING ANY WITNESS IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. STEIN, NO OBJECTION BY MR. CARBONE) MR. CARBONE CALLS MILAN ROSENBERG UNDER 776 THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE RESPONDENT SHALL PROVIDE THE PETITIONER WITH A COPY OF THE CHILDS MEDICAL INSURANCE CARD. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT CAITLYN SULLIVAN MOTION FOR ADMITTING PETITIONERS EXHIBITS 1-10 INTO EVIDENCE IS GRANTED. (MOTION BY MR. CARBONE, MR. STEIN OBJECTS) PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: RESPONDENTS EXHIBITS A AND B SHALL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MR. STEIN CALLS MR. CASTRO UNDER 776 . PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES MOST RECENT INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS SHALL COME INTO EVIDENCE SUBJECT TO CROSS EXAMINATION. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER SHALL BE TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION WITH A RULING TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: AS TO THE MSC/ TRIAL SETTING THE MATTER SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 11/6/13 AT 9:00 AM. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 11/6/13 AT 9:00 AM FOR MSC/TRIAL SETTING ON ALL REMAINING ISSUES. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
September 25, 2013 | hearing |
NP1040A Department: AR |
|
September 25, 2013 | hearing |
NP1440 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER ORDERS FILED ON 8/28/13. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MR. STEINS REPRESENTS THAT HIS CLIENTS LEGAL NAME IS MILAN ROSENBERG AND HE WOULD LIKE IT REFLECTED IN THE COURTS RECORDS. PARTIES ARE REFERRED TO MEDIATION. PARTIES RETURN FROM MEDIATION WITHOUT AN AGREEMENT. MR. CARBONE DULY SWORN AND MAKES DECLARATION OF PREJUDICE AGAINST JUDGE/COMMISSIONER Kenneth G Pritchard PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 170.6. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES WAIVE FINAL DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT'S NAME SHALL BE CHANGED IN THE COURT RECORDS TO MILAN ROSENBERG, AS SHE HAS NEVER USED THE LAST NAME CASTRO. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THAT THE MATTER BE SET ON 10/2/13 AT 9:00 AM FOR MSC TRIAL SETTING OR HEARING. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 10/2/2013 AT 9:00AM FOR MSC/TRIAL SETTING AND PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, AND OTHER ORDERS FILED 08/28/13. MR. CARBONE TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
September 25, 2013 | hearing |
Mediation Report NO AGREEMENT AND NO RECOMENDATIONS |
|
September 25, 2013 | hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
September 25, 2013 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report NO AGREEMENT AND NO RECOMENDATIONS |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1040A Department: AR |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1440 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER ORDERS FILED ON 8/28/13. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN ROSENBERG (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MR. STEINS REPRESENTS THAT HIS CLIENTS LEGAL NAME IS MILAN ROSENBERG AND HE WOULD LIKE IT REFLECTED IN THE COURTS RECORDS. PARTIES ARE REFERRED TO MEDIATION. PARTIES RETURN FROM MEDIATION WITHOUT AN AGREEMENT. MR. CARBONE DULY SWORN AND MAKES DECLARATION OF PREJUDICE AGAINST JUDGE/COMMISSIONER Kenneth G Pritchard PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 170.6. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE PARTIES WAIVE FINAL DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE RESPONDENT'S NAME SHALL BE CHANGED IN THE COURT RECORDS TO MILAN ROSENBERG, AS SHE HAS NEVER USED THE LAST NAME CASTRO. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THAT THE MATTER BE SET ON 10/2/13 AT 9:00 AM FOR MSC TRIAL SETTING OR HEARING. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 10/2/2013 AT 9:00AM FOR MSC/TRIAL SETTING AND PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, AND OTHER ORDERS FILED 08/28/13. MR. CARBONE TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
September 18, 2013 | hearing |
Responsive Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
September 18, 2013 | hearing |
Mediation Report BOTH PARENTS FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESPONDENTS |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report BOTH PARENTS FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION |
|
September 10, 2013 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO SERVED 09/04/13 | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RFO SERVED 09/04/13 | |
August 28, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Order (FL-300) PETITIONERS HEARING SET FOR 09/25/13 MEDIATION SET FOR 09/18/13 AT 9:30AM |
|
August 28, 2013 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 0182. Receipt #735531 for amount of $115.00. |
|
August 28, 2013 | hearing |
171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 Amount of $85.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 0182. Receipt #735531 for amount of $115.00. |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 0182. Receipt #735531 for amount of $115.00. |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 Amount of $85.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 0182. Receipt #735531 for amount of $115.00. |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) PETITIONERS HEARING SET FOR 09/25/13 MEDIATION SET FOR 09/18/13 AT 9:30AM |
|
August 20, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT & TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ALL PARTIES AND ALL ATTORNEYS MUST ATTEND To each party and to the attorney of record for each party in this action: THIS CASE IS SET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY THE HON. [~Person:CalJudgeName], ON 9/25/2013 AT 9:00AM IN DIVISION BR OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. ALL PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A JOINT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT MUST BE FILED WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE. REFER TO UNIFORM RULES OF THE COURT, FAMILY LAW RULE 6.9.2. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT & TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ALL PARTIES AND ALL ATTORNEYS MUST ATTEND To each party and to the attorney of record for each party in this action: THIS CASE IS SET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY THE HON. DONALD P GLENNON JR, ON 9/25/2013 AT 9:00AM IN DIVISION BR OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. ALL PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A JOINT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT MUST BE FILED WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE. REFER TO UNIFORM RULES OF THE COURT, FAMILY LAW RULE 6.9.2. |
|
August 20, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER AFTER HEARING FOR 04/24/13 - REJECTED FOR THE FLOLLOWING REASONS: 1. MISSING REQUIRED FORM FL192 2. FL340 #1 INCORRECT DIVISION 3. FL340 #1A & B ATTORNEYS ARE SWAPPED FYI MISSING ITEMS LISTED ON THE MINUTE ORDER |
|
August 20, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR ORDER - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL300 PAGE 2 #2B(1) INCOMPLETE 2. FL300 PAGE 2 #3D(1) INCOMPLETE 3. FL311 HEADER BOX FOR APPLICATION FOR ORDER NOT MARKED 4. FL311 #2E INCOMPLETE 5. FL341(C) #2 INCOMPLETE 6. FL150 #3D INCOMPLETE 7. FL150 #13 BOX FOR ESTIMATED, ACTUAL OR PROPOSED EXPENSES NOT MARKED 8. INCORRECT FILING FEE SUBMITTED, CORRECT AMOUNT IS $115.00 |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT & TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ALL PARTIES AND ALL ATTORNEYS MUST ATTEND To each party and to the attorney of record for each party in this action: THIS CASE IS SET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY THE HON. [~Person:CalJudgeName], ON 9/25/2013 AT 9:00AM IN DIVISION BR OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. ALL PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A JOINT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT MUST BE FILED WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE. REFER TO UNIFORM RULES OF THE COURT, FAMILY LAW RULE 6.9.2. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT & TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ALL PARTIES AND ALL ATTORNEYS MUST ATTEND To each party and to the attorney of record for each party in this action: THIS CASE IS SET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY THE HON. DONALD P GLENNON JR, ON 9/25/2013 AT 9:00AM IN DIVISION BR OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. ALL PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A JOINT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT MUST BE FILED WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE. REFER TO UNIFORM RULES OF THE COURT, FAMILY LAW RULE 6.9.2. |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR ORDER - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL300 PAGE 2 #2B(1) INCOMPLETE 2. FL300 PAGE 2 #3D(1) INCOMPLETE 3. FL311 HEADER BOX FOR APPLICATION FOR ORDER NOT MARKED 4. FL311 #2E INCOMPLETE 5. FL341(C) #2 INCOMPLETE 6. FL150 #3D INCOMPLETE 7. FL150 #13 BOX FOR ESTIMATED, ACTUAL OR PROPOSED EXPENSES NOT MARKED 8. INCORRECT FILING FEE SUBMITTED, CORRECT AMOUNT IS $115.00 |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER AFTER HEARING FOR 04/24/13 - REJECTED FOR THE FLOLLOWING REASONS: 1. MISSING REQUIRED FORM FL192 2. FL340 #1 INCORRECT DIVISION 3. FL340 #1A & B ATTORNEYS ARE SWAPPED FYI MISSING ITEMS LISTED ON THE MINUTE ORDER |
|
August 07, 2013 | hearing |
At Issue Court Trial < 1 Day RESPONDENTS |
|
August 07, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure RESPONDENTS |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
At Issue Court Trial < 1 Day RESPONDENTS |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure RESPONDENTS |
|
May 10, 2013 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration | |
May 06, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Change Name/Address ROBERT CARBONE |
|
May 06, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION RETURNED TO FILING PARTY RE: MISSING ATTACHMENT 10G |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change Name/Address ROBERT CARBONE |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION RETURNED TO FILING PARTY RE: MISSING ATTACHMENT 10G |
|
April 24, 2013 | hearing |
NP1045A Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CHILD SUPPORT/SPOUSAL SUPPORT/ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS/PERMISSION TO LEAVE STATE WITH CHILD THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN CASTRO (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RUBEN CASTRO DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 776. MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: AS TO OUT OF STATE TRAVEL, BOTH PARTIES MUST PROVIDE REASONABLENOTICE TO THE OTHER PARENT BEFORE THE OUT OF STATE TRAVEL WITH THE MINOR CHILD. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: MILAN ROSENBERG HAS NEVER USED THE NAME CASTRO AND MR. STEIN REQUESTS THE COURT DOCKET IS CORRECTED. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS WILL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE AND SUBJECT TO CROSS EXAMINATION. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE COURT PREPARES A DISSOMASTER AND DISTRIBUTES IT TO COUNSEL. CHILD SUPPORT SHALL BE PAID BY PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $236.50, TWICE A MONTH, TO EQUAL $473.00 PER MONTH. CHILD SUPPORT SHALL BEGIN APRIL 15, 2013, AND IS PAYABLE ON THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER. PETITIONER MUST SUBMIT A PAYSTUB TO MR. STEIN WITHIN 1 WEEK OF RECEIPT OF EACH PAY STUB. ANY EXTRA PAY ABOVE 80 HOURS, PETITIONER SHALL PAY 20 PERCENT FROM NET PAY TO THE MOTHER FOR CHILD SUPPORT. AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, $3500.00 SHALL BE PAID BY PETITIONER TO MR. STEIN AT $400.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING MAY 1, 2013. SEE DISSOMASTER ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MR. STEIN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 24, 2013 | hearing | Responsive Declaration | |
April 24, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. |
|
April 24, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1045A Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CHILD SUPPORT/SPOUSAL SUPPORT/ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS/PERMISSION TO LEAVE STATE WITH CHILD THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN CASTRO (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RUBEN CASTRO DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 776. MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: AS TO OUT OF STATE TRAVEL, BOTH PARTIES MUST PROVIDE REASONABLENOTICE TO THE OTHER PARENT BEFORE THE OUT OF STATE TRAVEL WITH THE MINOR CHILD. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: MILAN ROSENBERG HAS NEVER USED THE NAME CASTRO AND MR. STEIN REQUESTS THE COURT DOCKET IS CORRECTED. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS WILL BE ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE AND SUBJECT TO CROSS EXAMINATION. PARTIES STIPULATE AND THEREFORE THE COURT ORDERS: THE COURT PREPARES A DISSOMASTER AND DISTRIBUTES IT TO COUNSEL. CHILD SUPPORT SHALL BE PAID BY PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $236.50, TWICE A MONTH, TO EQUAL $473.00 PER MONTH. CHILD SUPPORT SHALL BEGIN APRIL 15, 2013, AND IS PAYABLE ON THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER. PETITIONER MUST SUBMIT A PAYSTUB TO MR. STEIN WITHIN 1 WEEK OF RECEIPT OF EACH PAY STUB. ANY EXTRA PAY ABOVE 80 HOURS, PETITIONER SHALL PAY 20 PERCENT FROM NET PAY TO THE MOTHER FOR CHILD SUPPORT. AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, $3500.00 SHALL BE PAID BY PETITIONER TO MR. STEIN AT $400.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING MAY 1, 2013. SEE DISSOMASTER ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. MR. STEIN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. |
|
April 22, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONSIVE DECLARATION RETURNED TO FILING PARTY RE: CASE NUMBER IS INCORRECT; #3d OF PROOF OF SERVICE INCOMPLETE; FL-320 #3c.(2), #4c, #5c, #8c INCOMPLETE (BOXES ARE NOT MARKED); MISSING ATTACHMENT "QUESTION 10g" OF INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESPONSIVE DECLARATION RETURNED TO FILING PARTY RE: CASE NUMBER IS INCORRECT; #3d OF PROOF OF SERVICE INCOMPLETE; FL-320 #3c.(2), #4c, #5c, #8c INCOMPLETE (BOXES ARE NOT MARKED); MISSING ATTACHMENT "QUESTION 10g" OF INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION |
|
April 16, 2013 | hearing |
Proof of Service POS |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS |
|
April 15, 2013 | hearing | Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered | |
April 12, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) WHAT:CHILD SUPPORT/SPOUSAL SUPPORT/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS/PERMISSION TO LEAVE STATE WITH CHILD COURT DATE:4-24-13 COURT TIME:9:00 A.M. COURT DEPT/DIV:BR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO:4-15-13/4-19-13 |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) WHAT:CHILD SUPPORT/SPOUSAL SUPPORT/ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS/PERMISSION TO LEAVE STATE WITH CHILD COURT DATE:4-24-13 COURT TIME:9:00 A.M. COURT DEPT/DIV:BR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO:4-15-13/4-19-13 |
|
April 11, 2013 | hearing |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, MILAN (RE-1). Received from ROGER STEIN, check no(s) 11358. Receipt #711789 for amount of $30.00. |
|
April 11, 2013 | hearing | Response | |
April 11, 2013 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding Amount of $30.00 for CASTRO, MILAN (RE-1). Received from ROGER STEIN, check no(s) 11358. Receipt #711789 for amount of $30.00. |
|
April 10, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES; ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER; RESPONSE-MARRAIGE; REQUEST FOR ORDER RETURNED TO FILING PARTY RE: CASE STYLE DOES NOT MATCH SUMMONS AND PETITION; NO COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30 SUBMITTED |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES; ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER; RESPONSE-MARRAIGE; REQUEST FOR ORDER RETURNED TO FILING PARTY RE: CASE STYLE DOES NOT MATCH SUMMONS AND PETITION; NO COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30 SUBMITTED |
|
March 29, 2013 | hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING EXPIRES 3/20/16 |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING EXPIRES 3/20/16 |
|
March 20, 2013 | hearing |
NP1820 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT'S RULING WITH REGARDS TO THE MATTER HEARD ON 3/20/2013 AND TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF 3/20/2013 IS ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREIN. |
|
March 20, 2013 | hearing |
NP1105 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN CASTRO (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. MR. STEIN HAS BEEN RETAINED AND IS APPEARING WITH MILAN CASTRO AND HE ADVISES THE COURT HIS CLIENT HAS NEVER GONE BY THE NAME OF CASTRO. COUNSEL FOR RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES IS GRANTED. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT DAMARIS DIAZ MILAN ROSENBERG DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 776. MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT WILL TAKE THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION AND WILL ISSUE A RULING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 20, 2013 | hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. |
|
March 20, 2013 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT'S RULING WITH REGARDS TO THE MATTER HEARD ON 3/20/2013 AND TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF 3/20/2013 IS ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREIN. |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1105 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE. MILAN CASTRO (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROGER I STEIN ESQ. MR. STEIN HAS BEEN RETAINED AND IS APPEARING WITH MILAN CASTRO AND HE ADVISES THE COURT HIS CLIENT HAS NEVER GONE BY THE NAME OF CASTRO. COUNSEL FOR RUBEN CASTRO (PE-1) MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES IS GRANTED. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. WITNESS(ES) SWORN AND TESTIFIED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT DAMARIS DIAZ MILAN ROSENBERG DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 776. MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT WILL TAKE THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION AND WILL ISSUE A RULING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 14, 2013 | hearing |
Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation REFERRED BACK TO FAMILY LAW DEPARTMENT AS MR. CASTRO CHOOSE TO PAY FILING FEE IN FULL. |
|
March 14, 2013 | hearing |
805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) Amount of $435.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from RUBEN CASTRO, check no(s) 400804909. Receipt #707050 for amount of $435.00. |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) Amount of $435.00 for CASTRO, RUBEN (PE-1). Received from RUBEN CASTRO, check no(s) 400804909. Receipt #707050 for amount of $435.00. |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation REFERRED BACK TO FAMILY LAW DEPARTMENT AS MR. CASTRO CHOOSE TO PAY FILING FEE IN FULL. |
|
March 13, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure PETITIONERS |
|
March 13, 2013 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER NEW ATTORNEY:ROBERT F. CARBONE |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER NEW ATTORNEY:ROBERT F. CARBONE |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure PETITIONERS |
|
March 04, 2013 | hearing |
Proof of Service POS |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS |
|
March 01, 2013 | hearing | Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment | |
March 01, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR ORDER RETURNED TO FILING PARTY FOR CORRECTIONS RE: FL-300 #1, #2B, COURT ORDER BOX, AND #4 INCOMPLETE; VISITATION IS REQUESTED ON APAGE 2, BUT NOT INDICATED AS A REQUEST ON PAGE 1 IN HEADER; PAGE 2, #1 INCOMPLETE AS TO CUSTODY BOX AND CHILD'S AGE; MISSING REQUIRED FORM UCCJEA, ATTACHMENTS INDICATED ON FL-300 ARE NOT ATTACHED (FL-311, FL-312, FL-341(C), FL-142(D), FL-341(E)) |
|
March 01, 2013 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 749 |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR ORDER RETURNED TO FILING PARTY FOR CORRECTIONS RE: FL-300 #1, #2B, COURT ORDER BOX, AND #4 INCOMPLETE; VISITATION IS REQUESTED ON APAGE 2, BUT NOT INDICATED AS A REQUEST ON PAGE 1 IN HEADER; PAGE 2, #1 INCOMPLETE AS TO CUSTODY BOX AND CHILD'S AGE; MISSING REQUIRED FORM UCCJEA, ATTACHMENTS INDICATED ON FL-300 ARE NOT ATTACHED (FL-311, FL-312, FL-341(C), FL-142(D), FL-341(E)) |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 749 |
|
February 28, 2013 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
February 28, 2013 | hearing | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage | |
February 28, 2013 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
February 28, 2013 | hearing | Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service |