Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BAILEY VS BAILEY
A Dissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children case was filed by Bailey, Jason Christopher, against Bailey, Jessica Carole, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Kenneth G. Pritchard presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 21, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Webster, Jason;Category
Dissolution of Marriage With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
6 years and 2 months
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: LESLIE ANDERSON New Attorney:IN PRO PER |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: LESLIE ANDERSON New Attorney:IN PRO PER |
|
April 17, 2019 | hearing |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
April 17, 2019 | hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
April 10, 2019 | hearing | Mediation Appointment | |
April 09, 2019 | hearing | Declaration of Due Diligence Filed | |
April 08, 2019 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
March 15, 2019 | hearing | Request for Order (FL-300) | |
March 15, 2019 | hearing |
Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305)
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
March 15, 2019 | hearing | Ex Parte Hearing | |
March 14, 2019 | hearing |
Declaration Regarding Notice and Service of Request for Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders |
|
March 14, 2019 | hearing | Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Notice and Service of Request for Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders |
|
January 02, 2014 | hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
December 27, 2013 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
December 27, 2013 | hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) KP- STATUS DATE 12/27/2014 |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) KP- STATUS DATE 12/27/2014 |
|
December 02, 2013 | hearing | Declaration for Default | |
December 02, 2013 | hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
November 22, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT PACKET - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: AS TO PROPOSED & ORIGINAL JUDGMENT 1. FL180 #4H INCOMPLETE - MANDATORY TO ADDRESS IF MINOR CHILDREN 2. FL180 #4H ATTACHMENT FL192 NOT ATTACHED MANDATORY IF MINOR CHILDREN 3. FL180 #4K INCOMPLETE - MANDATORY TO ADDRESS IF MINOR CHILDREN 4. FL180 #4K ATTACHMENT FL342 NOT ATTACHED MANDATORY IF MINOR CHILDREN 5. FL180 #5 INCORRECT - RE-ADDRESS AFTER CORRECTIONS HAVE BEEN MADE |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT PACKET - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: AS TO PROPOSED & ORIGINAL JUDGMENT 1. FL180 #4H INCOMPLETE - MANDATORY TO ADDRESS IF MINOR CHILDREN 2. FL180 #4H ATTACHMENT FL192 NOT ATTACHED MANDATORY IF MINOR CHILDREN 3. FL180 #4K INCOMPLETE - MANDATORY TO ADDRESS IF MINOR CHILDREN 4. FL180 #4K ATTACHMENT FL342 NOT ATTACHED MANDATORY IF MINOR CHILDREN 5. FL180 #5 INCORRECT - RE-ADDRESS AFTER CORRECTIONS HAVE BEEN MADE |
|
November 05, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure PETITIONERS |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure PETITIONERS |
|
October 31, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT PACKET - REJECTED - PLEASE SEE ATTACHMENT TO PINK REJECTION SLIP FOR A LIST OF REJECTION/CORRECTION REASONS. |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT PACKET - REJECTED - PLEASE SEE ATTACHMENT TO PINK REJECTION SLIP FOR A LIST OF REJECTION/CORRECTION REASONS. |
|
August 30, 2013 | hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration PETITIONERS |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration PETITIONERS |
|
May 24, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) DCSS AS TO 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) DCSS AS TO 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT |
|
May 14, 2013 | hearing |
Amended Proof of Service AMENDED POS |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service AMENDED POS |
|
March 20, 2013 | hearing | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
March 18, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice CHECK NO. 25297 RETURNED TO SUBMITTING PARTY RE: THERE IS NO FILING FEE FOR A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice CHECK NO. 25297 RETURNED TO SUBMITTING PARTY RE: THERE IS NO FILING FEE FOR A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
March 15, 2013 | hearing | Amended Complaint | |
March 15, 2013 | hearing | Amended Summons Filed | |
March 07, 2013 | hearing |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $2.00 for BAILEY, JESSICA CAROLE (RE-1). Received from WAYNE SILVA, check no(s) 25263. Receipt #705986 for amount of $2.00. |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $2.00 for BAILEY, JESSICA CAROLE (RE-1). Received from WAYNE SILVA, check no(s) 25263. Receipt #705986 for amount of $2.00. |
|
October 05, 2012 | hearing |
Summons & Complaint Parental Obligations-Existing FL/PT Case DCSS |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons & Complaint Parental Obligations-Existing FL/PT Case DCSS |
|
December 22, 2009 | hearing |
805J Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (7/28/09) Amount of $355.00 for BAILEY, JASON CHRISTOPHER (PE-1). Received from JASON CHRISTOPHER BAILEY, check no(s) 6970. Receipt #497630 for amount of $355.00. |
|
December 22, 2009 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 585 |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 585 |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
805J Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (7/28/09) Amount of $355.00 for BAILEY, JASON CHRISTOPHER (PE-1). Received from JASON CHRISTOPHER BAILEY, check no(s) 6970. Receipt #497630 for amount of $355.00. |
|
December 21, 2009 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
December 21, 2009 | hearing | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |