Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE ESTATE OF MYRA M. ISHIKAWA
On October 08, 2008 a petition for probate of will and for letters testamentary case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge John Dearman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 08, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 10, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Case Duration
10 months and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT
Date: Aug 18, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Jun 03, 2009NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Jun 02, 2009WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Jun 02, 2009ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (LAWRENCE C. LEE) FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Dec 16, 2008WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE
Date: Nov 05, 2008PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: Oct 17, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Oct 09, 2008NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Oct 08, 2008DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON
Date: Oct 08, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT | |
August 18, 2009 | hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-18-2009, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON HEARING SET FOR AUG-18-2009 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL SUPPLEMENTAL, $8,400.00 FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL, $1,086,972.68 FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (LAWRENCE C. LEE) FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED NODA, JON APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED NODA, JON APPOINTED | |
November 05, 2008 | hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, CALENDAR OF NOV-05-2008, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) | |
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER NODA, JON AS TO DECEDENT ISHIKAWA, MYRA M. HEARING SET FOR NOV-05-2008 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 |