Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WINROW, DARRELL DEVON VS. WINROW, SELWYN RONEA
On April 08, 2014 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Winrow Darrell Devon, against Winrow Selwyn Ronea, represented by Lizarraga Rebecca Dolores, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Louise E. Halevy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 08, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 07, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Halevy Louise |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Louise |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO/MTN - Modification (- Hearing Set on 2016-09-19 ) | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Request - Telephonic Appearance | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO/MTN - Mod (- Hearing Set on 2016-09-19 ) | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | DCSS - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL-632 (Substitution of Payee ) | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | DCSS - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL-632 (Substitution of Payee ) | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 08-06-15 ) | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 08-06-15 ) | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Chatsworth Dept. - F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Lopez-Giss Susan |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (Income Withholding Order - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (Income Withholding Order - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Chatsworth Dept. - F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Susan |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn - Service Date on 2015-05-22 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn - Service Date on 2015-05-22 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (REPLY - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (REPLY - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (PENDING ACTION - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (PENDING ACTION - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Rebecca D. Lizarraga - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Pending Action (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Custody, Support and Fees (CSUPP, SSUPP, ATTY FEES, OTHER - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn - Hearing Set on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Rebecca D. Lizarraga - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Pending Action (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Custody, Support and Fees (CSUPP, SSUPP, ATTY FEES, OTHER - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn - Hearing Set on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (to Health Ins. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Termination - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Termination - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (to Health Ins. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Service Date on 2015-01-20 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell - Service Date on 2015-01-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (RELATED CASE - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice (RELATED CASE - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (Response - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (Response - On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Winrow, Selwyn ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-14 ) | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-14 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Winrow, Darrell ) Filed by Petitioner |