Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. YVETTE R. WILSON, ET AL
On December 05, 2006 an other promissory note/collections case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Chatsworth Courthouse
Category
Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Req. for Dismissal - Entire Action
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F46 Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F46 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F46 (Request for Dismissal; ENTERED) - |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F46, CLERK, Presiding Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION) - ENTERED Judge: CLERK |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Clerk |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF Application for Writ of Possession HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com Filed by Court |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F46 Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) (Application for Writ of Possession; Matter continued) - |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F46, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Application for Writ of Possession - Matter continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) Filed by KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by null |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |