Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Matter of: Donald W. Monson 2002 Trust udt 8/15/2002
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 18, 2022
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2024
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST U/D/T 08/15/2002 9:01 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: TO DETERMINE TRUST ASSETS FOR COURT ORDER FREEZING VANGUARD ACCOUNTS FILED 11/02/2023 BY SUSAN T. M... | |
January 19, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST U/D/T 08/15/2002 9:01 AM HEARING IN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COURT SHOULD NOT IMPOSE SANCTIONS AGAINST MICHAEL J. MONSON FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR 12/14... | |
December 14, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST UDT 8/15/2002 10:30 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: THE COURT ISSUES AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST MICHAEL J. MONSON... | |
October 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST UDT 8/15/2002 9:00 AM HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: THE COURT ISSUES AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST MICHAEL... | |
July 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST UDT 8/15/2002 9:00 AM ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE THE COURT ISSUES AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST MICHAEL J. MONSON, PURSU... | |
April 24, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST UDT 8/15/2002 9:01 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: FOR SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE POWERS REMOVAL FILED 11/18/22 BY SUSAN MONSON Need: 1. Appearances to repo... | |
February 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01886 MATTER OF: DONALD W. MONSON 2002 TRUST UDT 8/15/2002 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: FOR SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE POWERS REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE FILED ON 11/18/23 BY SUSAN T. MONSON Need: 1. Ap... |