Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHERYL CHONG VS PATRICK CAVALIER/DINAPOLI
On March 12, 2015 a dv prevention w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Chong Cheryl, against Cavaliere Dinapoli Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Ana Maria Luna presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 12, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 09, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
DV Prevention w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 22, 2015 | hearing |
at 8:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - S14, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Ana Maria |
|
April 03, 2015 | hearing |
at 8:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - S14, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued Judge: Ana Maria |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Chong, Cheryl ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Chong, Cheryl - Granted on 2015-03-12 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Chong, Cheryl ) Filed by Petitioner |