Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARIANA RIVERA VS ANTHONY VARGAS
On April 08, 2014 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Rivera Mariana, against Vargas Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 08, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 08, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
4 months and 11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-07-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (of FL120;FL311;FL105;FL150;FL160;FL140 - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Service Date on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response (and Request for Dissolution of Marriage - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response (and Request for Dissolution of Marriage - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (of FL120;FL311;FL105;FL150;FL160;FL140 - On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Service Date on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Vargas, Anthony - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-14 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (FILED BY PETITIONER ) | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FILED BY PETITIONER - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-10 ) | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (FILED BY PETITIONER ) | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FILED BY PETITIONER - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-10 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In Whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Granted on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (of Marriage - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (of Marriage - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (of Marriage - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In Whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Granted on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rivera, Mariana - Filed and Entered on 2014-04-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |