Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NICHOLAS A GOUVIS VS CITY OF LONG BEACH ET AL
On December 05, 2006 a premises liability (e.g.slip & fall) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Judith Vander Lans presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 07, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse
Category
Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
LEGACY DISPOSITION TYPE
Status
Closed
Case Duration
6 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Reclassified-Limited-Long Beach 191 Days | |
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2007-06-14 00:00:00 | |
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:Further Status Conference Transferred to Other Department | |
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Further Status Conference Judith Vander Lans 8:30 am | |
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Further Status Conference (Further Status Conference; Transferred to Other Department) - Further Status Conference (Further Status Conference; Transferred to Other Department) - |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Further Status Conference (Further Status Conference; Transferred to Other Department) - |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) |
|
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Conference Date Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conference Date Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conference Date Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) |
|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORP (DOE 6) (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Judith Vander Lans 8:30 am | |
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:Conference-Case Management Matter continued | |
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 10, 2007 | hearing | Calendaring:Further Status Conference Judith Vander Lans | |
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2007-05-10 00:00:00 | |
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff | |
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Amended Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff | |
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff); LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff); LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff); LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff | |
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:Miscellaneous Court Makes Order | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Miscellaneous Judith Vander Lans 8:30 am | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2007-04-03 00:00:00 | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Miscellaneous; Court Makes Order) - (Miscellaneous; Court Makes Order) - |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Miscellaneous; Court Makes Order) - |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant | |
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by LONG BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff | |
December 05, 2006 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Judith Vander Lans | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall) | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by NICHOLAS A GOUVIS (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Plaintiff |