Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LYNDA MARIE HILBERT VS MICHAEL JEROME WHITE, DOES 1-25
On December 05, 2006 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Hilbert Lynda Marie, represented by Barens Arthur H., against White Michael Jerome, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Joseph E. DiLoreto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack of Prosecution
Status
Want of Prosecution
Case Duration
10 months and 25 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department H (Motion; Denied) - |
|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by LYNDA MARIE HILBERT (Plaintiff) |
|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department B Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv.; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by LYNDA MARIE HILBERT (Plaintiff) |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Previously Dismissed) - |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv.; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by LYNDA MARIE HILBERT (Plaintiff) |