Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GARRY BURIANEK VS LEAKHANA KIM ET AL
On October 22, 2003 a motor vehicle - pi/pd/wd (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge TRACY GRANT presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2003
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 months
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2004 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (with prej entire action including lien on behalf of republic indemnity * signed by plntf cnsl and lien holder cnsl) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 29, 2004 | hearing |
Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 29, 2004 | hearing |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 24, 2004 | hearing |
Notice of Lien (NTC OF CLAIM OF LIEN OF REPUBLIC INDEMNITY CO OF AMERICA ) Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant |
|
March 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department SP86, TRACY GRANT, Presiding Conference-Case Management (no answer filed) - Matter is continued Judge: TRACY GRANT |
|
March 12, 2004 | hearing |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 19, 2003 | hearing |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (p/s leakhana khim sub served- jane doe 12/7/3 + decl of dill + decl of mail) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 17, 2003 | hearing |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSON SERVED LEAKHANA KHIM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 22, 2003 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |