Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The People of the State of California vs. Kevin William Szalonek Print
On November 10, 2021 a misdemeanor case was filed by The People Of The State Of California, against Szalonek, Kevin William, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Ingrid A Uhler presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Misdemeanor
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | hearing | Pretrial View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Camber, Michael Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment 45th: 3/25 | |
February 16, 2022 |
Department R12 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Camber, Michael |
||
February 08, 2022 | hearing | Public Defender Notified | |
February 08, 2022 | hearing | District Attorney Notified | |
February 08, 2022 | hearing | 45th day is: | |
February 08, 2022 | hearing | Defendant Advised of Rights | |
February 08, 2022 | hearing | Defendant Arraigned on Citation | |
February 08, 2022 | hearing | Arraignment View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Uhler, Ingrid A Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment WARRANT | |
February 08, 2022 |
Department R11 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ferguson, Jon |
||
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | District Attorney Notified | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Public Defender Notified | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Advised of Rights | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Citation | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 45th day is: | |
February 07, 2022 | hearing | Arraignment View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Uhler, Ingrid A Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held | |
February 07, 2022 |
Department R11 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Uhler, Ingrid A |
||
November 10, 2021 | hearing | Confidential Document Filed Comment DISCOVERY ENTERED & SCANNED 11/10/21 | |
November 10, 2021 | hearing | Citation Filed | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Document Filed DISCOVERY ENTERED & SCANNED 11/10/21 |