Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROBIN THOMAS -V- JOHNNY THOMAS
A Dissolution Of Marriage case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Diane I. Anderson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 21, 2001
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 28 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE DESTROYED Not Applicable |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN JOSHUA TREE Not Applicable |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
UPDATE COMPLAINT OF ADDED FCS DESTRUCTION DATE OF 03/14/2013 Not Applicable |
|
August 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
FILE RECD IN JOSHUA TREE Not Applicable |
|
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO MORONGO Not Applicable |
|
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 08/09/04 IN DEPT SDA. Not Applicable |
|
August 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED FROM MORONGO Not Applicable |
|
August 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO - Minutes Pre-D Complete HONORABLE DIANE ANDERSON PRESIDING CLERK: JANET DEAN NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JEFFREY SCHROER PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBIN THOMAS, JOHNNY THOMAS - PROCEEDINGS: THE COURT DOES ACCEPT AND APPROVE ORDER AFTER HEARING. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: HONORABLE DIANE ANDERSON PRESIDING |
|
August 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE CASE FILE SENT TO SB C/S DIV ATT K FARLEY Not Applicable |
|
July 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MODIFY CS & VISITATION FILED BY ROBIN THOMAS. - Minutes Dismissed BERT L SWIFT PRESIDING\. CLERK: TINA MONTANO REPORTER: STORMY HINKLE PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBIN THOMAS, JOHNNY THOMAS - PROCEEDINGS: OSC IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FAILURE TO APPEAR BY MOVING PARTY ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: BERT L SWIFT PRESIDING. |
|
July 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. Not Applicable |
|
July 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DCSS FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC/UCCJEA/IE BY PERSONAL ON 06/21/04 AS TO JOHNNY THOMAS, FILED. Not Applicable |
|
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: MODIFY CS & VISITATION FILED BY ROBIN THOMAS Not Applicable |
|
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M3 | |
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ATTEND ORIENTATION, 6/28/04, 3:00 P.M. AND MEDIATION 6/29/04, 8:30 A.M. FILED. Not Applicable |
|
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ROBIN THOMAS Not Applicable |
|
November 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
RECD FILE IN JOSHUA TREE Not Applicable |
|
November 03, 2003 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MOD OF CHILD SPPT/MED SPPT FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. - Minutes Off Calendar DEBORAH A DANIEL PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN REPORTER: LAURA SANDERS BAILIFF: B CASTILLO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY CHARLES DUNBAR PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBIN THOMAS, JOHNNY THOMAS - PROCEEDINGS: OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: UNABLE TO LOCATE DEFENDANT === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: DEBORAH A DANIEL PRESIDING. |
|
September 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HRG FROM 090803 TO 110303/DEPT S3 FILED. Not Applicable |
|
September 08, 2003 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MOD OF CHILD SPPT/MED SPPT FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. - Minutes Continued JUDGE: COMMISSIONER DEBORAH DANIEL CLERK: JANET DEAN REPORTER: LAURA SANDERS BAILIFF: BLANCA CASTILLO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY CHARLES DUNBAR PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBIN THOMAS, JOHNNY THOMAS - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/03/03 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT S3. REASON: FOR SERVICE ON DEFENDANT === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: COMMISSIONER DEBORAH DANIEL |
|
September 03, 2003 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE CASE FILE SENT TO BILL FREER/CERT MAIL Not Applicable |
|
August 26, 2003 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC/SUPPORTING DOCS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/16/03 AS TO ROBIN THOMAS, FILED. Not Applicable |
|
July 30, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE BEFORE COURT AND TO BRING DOCUMENTS FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. Not Applicable |
|
July 30, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: MOD OF CHILD SPPT/MED SPPT FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO Not Applicable |
|
July 30, 2003 | Docket Event |
ON THE FAMILY LAW FILED 12/21/2001 OF ROBIN THOMAS, THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF. Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2003 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY THE COURT TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY/CHILD SUPPORT OFFICE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: DATE WRONG. Not Applicable |
|
January 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RE: PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED. Not Applicable |
|
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/23/02. | |
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT FILING . Not Applicable |
|
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION BY DEFAULT FILED 06/19/02 Not Applicable |
|
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL. Not Applicable |
|
May 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT HEARING SET. - Minutes Pre-D Complete BERT L SWIFT PRESIDING\. CLERK: PEGGY JIMENEZ REPORTER: CONNIE RAMIREZ BAILIFF STEVE JONES - PLAINTIFF ROBIN THOMAS PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHNNY THOMAS - PROCEEDINGS: JOHNNY THOMAS NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT. THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED OF COMPLAINT ON 12/22/01. BY FILING OF SERVICE OF PROCESS. DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES MARITAL STATUS TERMINATE 06/23/02, OR UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT, WHICHEVER LATER OCCURS. - MINOR CHILDREN: SHAWNYCE, DOB: 07/09/91 MINOR CHILDREN: JOHNNY, DOB: 03/14/95 JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN SHALL BE AWARDED TO BOTH PARTIES. MOTHER TO HAVE PRIMARY PHYSICAL CUSTODY. - FATHER TO HAVE REASONABLE VISITATION INCLUDING ALTERNATE WEEKENDS FROM 6PM FRIDAY TO 6PM SUNDAY BEGINNING 05/17/02. FATHER IS TO GIVE MOTHER 48 HOURS ADVANCE NOTICE OF INTENT TO VISIT. IF FATHER DOES NOT GIVE 48 HOURS NOTICE, MOTHER MAY ASSUME FATHER WILL GIVE UP HIS VISITATION THAT WEEKEND. - THERE ARE NO COMMUNITY DEBTS SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT. THERE IS NO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT. - FATHER TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT THE SUM OF $317 PER MONTH, 1/2 ON THE 8TH AND 1/2 ON THE TWENTY-SECOND OF EACH MONTH BEGINNING 05/22/02. DURATION OF SUPPORT PAYMENTS: ALL CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL CONTINUE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT OR UNTIL THE CHILD MARRIES, DIES, IS EMANCIPATED, REACHES AGE 18, OR REACHES AGE 19 AND IS A FULL-TIME HIGH SCHOOL STUDENT WHO IS NOT SELF-SUPPORTING, WHICHEVER FIRST OCCURS. CHILD SUPPORT IS BASED ON RESPONDENTS SALARY OF $1385 PER MONTH. - RESPONDENT TO PAY AS AND FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT THE SUM OF $59 PER MONTH, 1/2 ON THE 8TH AND 1/2 ON THE 22ND OF EACH MONTH BEGINNING 05/22/02. SPOUSAL SUPPORT WILL TERMINATE ON 05/06/03 UNLESS A MODIFICATION IS REQUESTED PRIOR TO THAT DATE. - PETITIONER TO PREPARE JUDGMENT. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: BERT L SWIFT PRESIDING. |
|
May 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED-JOHNNY THOMAS PERSONALY SERVED ON 12/22/01 . Not Applicable |
|
April 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT HEARING SET. - Minutes Continued CATHERINE A VINCENT JUDGE PRO TEM CLERK: PEGGY JIMENEZ REPORTER: CONNIE RAMIREZ BAILIFF: DAVE HENLEY - PLAINTIFF ROBIN THOMAS PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHNNY THOMAS - PROCEEDINGS: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/06/02 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M3. CONTINUED FOR FILING OF AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE. COURT NOTES FIRST PROOF OF SERVICE WAS FILED WITH AN INCOMPLETE DATE AND SECOND PROOF OF SERVICE WAS FILED WITH A DIFFERENT DATE AND ADDRESS. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: CATHERINE A VINCENT JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
April 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON JOHNNY THOMAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/24/01 Not Applicable |
|
March 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT HEARING SET. - Minutes Continued BERT L SWIFT PRESIDING\. CLERK: PEGGY JIMENEZ REPORTER: KIM MORROW BAILIFF: STEVE JONES - PLAINTIFF ROBIN THOMAS PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHNNY THOMAS - PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SHOWING COMPLETE DATE OF SERVICE. ALL EXISTING TEMPORARY ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL UNTIL FURTHER ORDER. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/08/02 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT M3. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: BERT L SWIFT PRESIDING. |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED ON FAMILY LAW FILED 12/21/2001 OF ROBIN THOMAS AS TO JOHNNY THOMAS. Not Applicable |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHNNY THOMAS FILED. Not Applicable |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER Not Applicable |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY & FINAL DISCLOSURE FILED BY ROBIN THOMAS Not Applicable |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: DISSOLUTION FILED BY ROBIN THOMAS. Not Applicable |
|
December 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON JOHNNY THOMAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/22/01 Not Applicable |
|
December 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Summons ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. Not Applicable |
|
December 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ROBIN THOMAS Not Applicable |
|
December 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE OF ASSETS AND DEBTS BY ROBIN THOMAS FILED. Not Applicable |
|
December 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT FILED Not Applicable |