Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BOKIS VS GARCIA BOKIS
A Legal Separation Without Minor Children case was filed by Bokis, Rickey D., against Garcia Bokis, Nancy L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Bittleston, Dawn;Category
Legal Separation Without Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Time To Trial
10 months and 5 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
October 27, 2017 | hearing |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
October 27, 2017 | hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
October 11, 2017 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
October 05, 2017 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
September 20, 2017 | hearing |
Court Trial
Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
September 18, 2017 | hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
July 31, 2017 | hearing | Declaration | |
July 03, 2017 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2017 | hearing | Settlement Conference Statement | |
June 26, 2017 | hearing | Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure | |
June 06, 2017 | hearing | Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
May 31, 2017 | hearing | Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted | |
May 26, 2017 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
May 25, 2017 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
May 22, 2017 | hearing | At-Issue Memorandum | |
May 22, 2017 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
May 22, 2017 | hearing | Response | |
May 18, 2017 | hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
May 16, 2017 | hearing | Proof of Service of Summons | |
May 16, 2017 | hearing | Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure | |
December 08, 2016 | hearing | Amended Summons Issued and Filed | |
December 08, 2016 | hearing | Amended Petition | |
November 21, 2016 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PER COURT CLERK |
|
November 21, 2016 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PER COURT CLERK |
|
November 14, 2016 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
November 14, 2016 | hearing | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |