Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HIGGINS VS HIGGINS
A Domestic Violence Without Minor Children case was filed by Higgins, Bobbie, against Higgins, Russell Theodore, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Stainfield, Bryan K. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 16, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Green, Kenneth R., Jr.;Category
Domestic Violence Without Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
12 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 28, 2016 | hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS
Judge: Stainfield, Bryan K. |
|
March 28, 2016 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
March 17, 2016 | hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 16, 2016 | hearing | Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) | |
March 16, 2016 | hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) | |
March 16, 2016 | hearing | Request for DV Restraining Order New No Children |