Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JENSEN vs MURRIETA GARDENS I LLC
An Unlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Angel M. Bermudez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
June 02, 2022
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Unlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulated Protective Order |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Stipulated Protective Order |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel: Answer/Response to Special Interrogatories Set Two by LYKKE JENSEN |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Reply Memo of Points |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Compel |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Responses to Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Answer/Response to Special Interrogatories, Set Two on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Motion to Compel and supporting documents |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement ISO Motion to Compel |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Lukas I. Pick ISO Motion to Compel |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN by MURRIETA GARDENS I LLC, A&A SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT LLC |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN by MURRIETA GARDENS I LLC, A&A SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT LLC |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
April 15, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | The Demurrer is OVERRULED. 1COA (Elder Abuse): Alleged is that the decedent suffered from multiple falls, culminating in a fall which broke her leg, hip and tailbone and that defendants facility fail...
Judge: Angel Bermudez |
|
April 12, 2021 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) | ||
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Demurrer |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service re: Opposition to Demurrer; Opposition to Motion to Strike on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of CMC Statement; Notice of Jury Fees |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
February 10, 2021 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) | ||
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of LYKKE JENSEN |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of LYKKE JENSEN |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of LYKKE JENSEN |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of LYKKE JENSEN |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | 1st Amended Complaint of JENSEN Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT) |
|
October 29, 2020 |
1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LYKKE JENSEN FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT) Not Applicable |
||
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest) |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint of JENSEN and filed. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 13, 2020 |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST) Not Applicable |
||
October 13, 2020 | CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S302. (SOUTHWEST) | ||
October 13, 2020 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) SET 4/12/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S302. | ||
October 13, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/13/2020 OF LYKKE JENSEN AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 13, 2020 |
CHANGE ATTORNEY ON LYKKE JENSEN FROM PICK LAW TO PICK LAW ON ALL COMPLAINTS. Not Applicable |
||
October 13, 2020 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/10/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES | ||
October 13, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562. Not Applicable |
||
October 13, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
October 13, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 12, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Compel: Answer/Response to Special Interrogatories Set Two by LYKKE JENSEN Held - Discovery hearing Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Compel Held - Discovery hearing Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
June 03, 2020 | hearing |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
June 03, 2020 | hearing |
Jury Trial
Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
May 18, 2020 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Vacated Judge: Assigned Judge |
|
May 18, 2020 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Assigned Judge |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN by MURRIETA GARDENS I LLC, A&A SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT LLC Held - Demurrer/Motion to Strike hearing Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN by MURRIETA GARDENS I LLC, A&A SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT LLC Held - Demurrer/Motion to Strike hearing Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint LYKKE JENSEN Held - Demurrer/Motion to Strike hearing Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
April 12, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) Vacated Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |
|
April 12, 2020 | hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) | |
April 01, 2020 | hearing |
Court on its Own Motion Complete Judge: Angel M. Bermudez |