Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WALSH VS THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC
A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Craig G. Riemer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 27, 2020
Last Refreshed
January 05, 2023
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Raquel A Marquez;OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Tentative Rulings Dated March 8, 2022 |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs by THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC |
|
March 08, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | WALSH VS THE CHOPPER MOTION TO TAX COSTS BY THE MCC2001381 GALLERY, INC CHOPPER GALLERY, INC Tentative Ruling: Deny motion, except for the following: strike the 550 court reporter fee and 414.99 in ...
Judge: Sam Lavorato, Jr. |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Attorney Fees |
|
March 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | WALSH VS THE CHOPPER MCC2001381 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES GALLERY, INC Tentative Ruling: The Court does not rule on the plaintiffs evidentiary objections because the evidence to which they are directe...
Judge: Sam Lavorato, Jr. |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Michelle Cook In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Tax Costs on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant The Chopper Gallery, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs Sought by Plaintiff on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC.S MOTION TO TAX COSTS on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC.S MOTION TO TAX COSTS on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC.S MOTION TO TAX COSTS |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Attorney's Fees by CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore |
|
February 17, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | WALSH VS THE CHOPPER MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES BY MCC2001381 GALLERY, INC CHRISTOPHER WALSH No Tentative Ruling: Appearances required.
Judge: Sam Lavorato, Jr. |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, EXPENSES, AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPENDIUM OF FURTHER EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, EXPENSES, AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, EXPENSES, AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, EXPENSES, AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; [PROPOSED] ORDER on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Daniel J. Ratajczak in Support of Defendant The Chopper Gallery, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expenses and Prejudgment Interest |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Objections to Declaration of Christopher P. Barry in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expenses and Prejudgment Interest on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice. |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Anna Sacco-Miller Re Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Objections to Declaration of Michelle Cook in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expenses and Prejudgment Interest on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant The Chopper Gallery, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expenses and Prejudgment Interest on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment on |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Tax Costs |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant The Chopper Gallery, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Tax Costs Sought by Plaintiff on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Off Calendar |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re: Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Prejudgment Interest on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Prejudgment Interest |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christopher P. Barry in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Prejudgment Interest |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses and Prejudgment Interest on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary) on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney’s Fees Costs, and Expenses and Prejudgment Interest |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses and Prejudgment Interest |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants' Objection to Proposed Judgment |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Offer to Compromise (CCP § 998) on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment received 12/10/2021 |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel by CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses from Defendant Suretec Insurance Company to Form Interrogatories, Set One on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Rulings for December 9, 2021 |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel |
|
December 09, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | WALSH VS THE CHOPPER MOTION TO COMPEL BY MCC2001381 GALLERY, INC CHRISTOPHER WALSH Tentative Ruling: The plaintiffs motion to compel the defendant SureTec to serve further responses to form interroga...
Judge: Sam Lavorato, Jr. |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection(s) to Evidence filed in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A Cook in support of Reply in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses From Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Request For Production Set One |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses From Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form Interrogatories, Set One |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses From Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Requests For Admissions, Set One |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Further Responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, & Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Defendant’s Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Anna Sacco-Miller RE Opposition to Motion to Compel |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Anna Sacco-Miller Re Opposition to Motion to Compel; Defendant's Request for Sanctions |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Suretec Insurance Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses from Defendant Suretec Insurance Company to Form Interrogatories, Set One; Defendant's Request for Sanctions Against Plaintiff on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Appendix of exhibits in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail re: please see document list |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Kraig Kavanagh in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Leonard Harrington in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Luke Wiles in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate statement of undisputed facts in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice. |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Edward J. Miller in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of motion for summary judgment |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Compendium of exhibits in support of Plaintiff's Motion to compel further responses from defendant to form interrogatories, set one |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate statement in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant Suretec Insurance Company to Form Interrogatories, set one on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant Suretec Insurance Company to Form Interrogatories, set one |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant Suretec Insurance Company to Form Interrogatories on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel further responses from Defendant Suretec Insurance Company to Form Interrogatories, set one on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Requests for admissions, set one on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate statement in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Compendium of Exhibits in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to form interrogatories, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form Interrogatories, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | [Proposed] order granting Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Compendium of Exhibits in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christopher M. Walsh in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form Interrogatories, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christopher M. Walsh in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate statement in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further resposnes from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form interrogatories, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for production of documents, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | [Proposed] Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form Interrogatories, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Form Interrogatories, set one on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | [Proposed] Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for admissions, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to form interrogatories, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Compendium of Exhibits in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for admissions, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christopher M. Walsh in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for admissions, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for admissions, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate statement in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to requests for admissions, set one |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum in support of Plaintiffs Motion to compel further responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to request for admissions, set one |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Order |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories by CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling dated September 2, 2021 |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories |
|
September 02, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO WALSH VS THE CHOPPER MCC2001381 SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES BY GALLERY, INC CHRISTOPHER WALSH Tentative Ruling: The plaintiffs request for an order compelling the defendant ... | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence in Support of Defendant Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Monetary Sanctions; [Proposed] Order |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses From Defendant to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request Monetary Sanctions |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses from Defendant to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Monetary Sanctions |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Daniel J. Ratajczak re Opposition to Motion to Compel |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Monetary Sanctions |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Informal Discovery Conference |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel responses from Defendant LBS Financial Credit Union to Special Interrogatories, set one, and Request for Monetary Sanctions |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order re: Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A Cook in support of Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum in support of Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response (CRC 3.110(g)) as to ROSNER, BARRY, & BABBITT LLP, CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Suretec Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A Cook re order to show cause concerning failure to request entry of default |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c) as to ROSNER, BARRY, & BABBITT LLP, CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response (CRC 3.110(g)) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A Cook Re: OSC Concerning Case Management Statement |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | 2nd Amended Complaint CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
January 27, 2021 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) Continued Not Heard |
||
January 27, 2021 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) | ||
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PROCEEDING: Order re Demurrer to First Amended Complaint |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Quality Assurance |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Rulings Dated January 13, 2021 |
|
January 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | The defendants request for judicial notice is granted. The plaintiffs request for judicial notice is denied. The defendants demurrer is sustained as to the 2nd and 3rd causes of action with 28 days...
Judge: Craig G. Riemer |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Case Management Statement as to Michelle Cook, Esq served on 01/12/21 |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of Payment of Jury Fees |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for judicial notice in support of pltf's opposition to defendants demurrer to first amended complaint |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michelle A. Cook in support of pltf's opposition to defendants demurrer to first amended complaint |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to defendants demurrer to first amended complaint |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to 1st Amended Compl; Memo of P&A's in Support of Demurrer to 1st Amended Compl; Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to 1st Amended Compl; Decl of Daniel J Ratajczak Re: Inability to Comply with Meet & Confer |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service |
|
December 09, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Compel Held - Discovery hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
December 08, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Compel Hearing Off-Calendar Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Defendants The Chopper Gallery and LBS FInancial Credit Union's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants The Chopper Gallery and LBS FInancial Credit Union's Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Daniel J. Ratajczak Re: Compliance with Meet and Confer Requirement |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
November 20, 2020 |
NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) Vacated |
||
November 20, 2020 |
NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) Continued Not Heard |
||
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Cross-Complaint |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of 1st Amended Complaint of WALSH as to SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY with receipt date of 10/07/20 |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of 1st Amended Complaint of WALSH as to THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC with receipt date of 10/07/20 |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on 1st Amended Complaint of WALSH as to LBS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION; mailing date of 10/14/20 filed. |
|
October 30, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH AS TO LBS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION; MAILING DATE OF 10/14/20 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 30, 2020 |
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH AS TO THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/07/20 Not Applicable |
||
October 30, 2020 |
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH AS TO SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/07/20 Not Applicable |
||
October 23, 2020 |
RETURNED DOCUMENT: 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 10/21/20 SUBMITTED BY CHRISTOPHER WALSH. Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | 1st Amended Complaint of WALSH Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT) |
|
October 02, 2020 |
1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT) Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 |
RETURNED DOCUMENT: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT VIA ESUBMIT RECEIVED ON 10/02/20 SUBMITTED BY CHRISTOPHER WALSH. Not Applicable |
||
September 23, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of WALSH as to LBS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION; mailing date of 08/03/20 filed. |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on the Complaint of WALSH served on THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC with service date of 07/29/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on the Complaint of WALSH served on SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY with service date of 07/27/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of CHRISTOPHER WALSH |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Compel Taken off calendar Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
September 02, 2020 |
--AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH SERVED ON LBS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/03/20 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
September 02, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH SERVED ON THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/29/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE) Not Applicable |
||
September 02, 2020 |
--AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH SERVED ON SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/27/20 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
September 02, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH SERVED ON SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/27/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE) Not Applicable |
||
September 02, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH AS TO LBS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION; MAILING DATE OF 08/03/20 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
September 02, 2020 |
--AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH SERVED ON THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/29/20 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
August 23, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to Compel Taken off calendar Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Mail of NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURP on SEE SERVICE LIST with a mailing date of 08/17/20 filed. (non-complaint) |
|
August 17, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURP ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/17/20 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT) Not Applicable |
||
August 17, 2020 |
RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 08/17/20 SUBMITTED BY CHRISTOPHER WALSH. Not Applicable |
||
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Continuance of Hearing set for 01/27/21. |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case reassigned to Department 01 for all purposes. |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | 170.6 CCP filed by CHRISTOPHER WALSH against Judge RAQUEL A MARQUEZ is granted. |
|
August 04, 2020 |
170.6 CCP FILED BY CHRISTOPHER WALSH AGAINST JUDGE RAQUEL A MARQUEZ IS GRANTED. Not Applicable |
||
August 04, 2020 | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01 FOR ALL PURPOSES. | ||
August 04, 2020 |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET FOR 01/27/21. Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Damages filed |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint of WALSH and filed. |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Venue by CHRISTOPHER WALSH filed |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92590. |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest) |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment. |
|
July 23, 2020 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) SET 1/27/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303. | ||
July 23, 2020 | CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303. (SOUTHWEST) | ||
July 23, 2020 |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST) Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY CHRISTOPHER WALSH FILED Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2020 OF CHRISTOPHER WALSH AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
July 23, 2020 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/20/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES | ||
July 23, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590. Not Applicable |
||
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Informal Discovery Conference Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
July 07, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) Vacated Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 11, 2020 | hearing |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 11, 2020 | hearing |
Jury Trial
Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 08, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs by THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 08, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs by THE CHOPPER GALLERY, INC
Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 04, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion for Attorney Fees Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 04, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference Held - Other pre-disposition hearing Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 04, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion for Attorney Fees
Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 04, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 01, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion for Attorney's Fees Taken off calendar Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
March 01, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion for Attorney's Fees
Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
February 01, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment on
Judge: Craig Riemer |
|
January 27, 2020 | hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) | |
January 27, 2020 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) Continued Not Heard |