Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MCDANIEL VS LEONARD
An Unlimited Civil Auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 01, 2018
Last Refreshed
January 24, 2022
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Unlimited Civil Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
7 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2020 | hearing |
BLANCA MCDANIEL/BANAFSHEH DANESH & JAVID PC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on all parties. Vacated |
|
March 20, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c). Vacated |
|
January 28, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest) Vacated |
|
March 20, 2019 | hearing |
HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C). Vacated |
|
January 28, 2019 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST) Vacated |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal WITH prejudice Entire Action filed |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
FAX FILING BY BLANCA MCDANIEL ($2.00 PER PAGE). Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 14, 2018 | hearing |
BLANCA MCDANIEL/BANAFSHEH DANESH &JAVID PC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES. Vacated |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Legacy Minute Order: BLANCA MCDANIEL/BANAFSHEH DANESH & JAVID PC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on all parties. |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCON) Form CM-200. |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 3/20/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303. |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200. Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: OSC Failure to File Proof of Service. |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 11/14/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303. |
|
October 02, 2018 | hearing |
NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) Vacated |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint of MCDANIEL and filed. |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT. |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92591. |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest) |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2018 OF BLANCA MCDANIEL AND FILED. Not Applicable |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303. (SOUTHWEST) |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) SET 1/28/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303. |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591. Not Applicable |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT. Not Applicable |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/02/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST) Not Applicable |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
|