Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MOHSENZADEH, HELEN VS. xxxxxxxxxxxx, xxxxx ALEKSANDR
On January 08, 2016 a civil harassment prevention (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Mohsenzadeh Helen, represented by Terterov Mary, against Xxxxxxxxxxxx Xxxxx Aleksandr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Alicia Y. Blanco presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Civil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2016 | hearing |
in Van Nuys East Dept. - L, Blanco, Alicia Y., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both Judge: Blanco Alicia Y. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-27 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2016 | hearing |
at 8:30 AM in Van Nuys East Dept. - L, Blanco, Alicia Y., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both Judge: Alicia Y. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-27 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Service Date on 2016-01-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Service Date on 2016-01-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Granted on 2016-01-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition - Civil Harassment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Granted on 2016-01-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mohsenzadeh, Helen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |