Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FIGUEROA, EDMUNDO JOSE VS ZUMAETA, GINETTE OLIUSKA
On August 19, 2014 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Figueroa Edmundo Jose, against Zumaeta Ginette Oliuska, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
3 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 11-20-14 ) | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 11-20-14 ) | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 10-16-14 ) | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 10-16-14 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Issued on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo - Issued on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Figueroa, Edmundo ) Filed by Petitioner |