Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALFARO, SHAYNA KEORA VS ALFARO, JIMMY MAURICIO
On August 19, 2014 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Alfaro Shayna Keora, against Alfaro Jimmy Mauricio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Reva G. Goetz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
1 year, 9 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-06 ) | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-06 ) | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-06 ) | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-16 ) | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 04-28-16 ) | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 06-18-15 ) | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Northwest Van Nuys Dept. - X, Goetz, Reva, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Reva |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 01-01-15 ) | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (DEPT. NW-X, ROOM 350 ON 01/09/15 - Service Date on 2014-12-31 ) | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 04-28-16 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna - Granted on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alfaro, Shayna - Issued on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |