Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DCFS TRUST VS MARTIN STEPANYAN, ET AL
On December 05, 2006 a breach of rental/lease contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Van Nuys Courthouse East
Judge
Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer
Category
Breach of Rental/Lease Contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
6 months and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filed by Clerk |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filed by Clerk |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Plaintiff |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filed by Clerk |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filed by Clerk |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filed by Clerk |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filed by Clerk |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Plaintiff |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ-Other Issued Filed by Creditor |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Cost Bill After Judgment | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for and Renewal of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for and Renewal of Judgment Filed by Clerk |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department D (OSC-Dismissal; Discharged) - |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request-Enter Judgment Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department D Case Management Conference - Held |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department D Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department D Initial Status Conference - Held |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Order-After Hearing | |
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department D (Hearing-Application Writ of Posses; Granted) - |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by null |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by DCFS TRUST, (Plaintiff) |