Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAURA ELENA MONJARAZ VS. JORGE ALBERTO PAREDES
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Monjaraz Laura Elena, against Paredes Jorge Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 16, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
1 month and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-17 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (DISSOLUTION - Filed By: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura - Granted on 2015-07-17 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-17 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (DISSOLUTION - Filed By: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura - Granted on 2015-07-17 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Dept. L - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Dept. L - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-18-15 ) | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-18-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Monjaraz, Laura ) Filed by Petitioner |