Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Hopson VS Vigilant private Security, Inc.
On May 10, 2021 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Other Employment
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order re Case Management Filed |
|
September 28, 2021 |
Complaint - Other Employment
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Granted |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: To Stay Matter and Continue Case Management Confere |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Case Management Order |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
September 28, 2021 |
Judge: Complaint - Other Employment |
||
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | TR - Motion Granted | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Unavailability Of Counsel Filed |
|
August 17, 2021 |
Complaint - Other Employment
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 09/28/2021 time: 03:00 PM | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
August 17, 2021 |
Judge: Complaint - Other Employment |
||
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | TR - Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled | |
August 10, 2021 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 10/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
August 10, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Case Management Order |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Vigilant private Security, Inc. Filed | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Vigilant private Secur |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Vigilant private Security, Inc. |
|
July 13, 2021 |
Complaint - Other Employment
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 08/17/2021 time: 03:00 PM | |
July 13, 2021 |
Complaint - Other Employment
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
July 13, 2021 |
Judge: Complaint - Other Employment |
||
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | TR - Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Vigilant private Security, Inc. Filed |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference 08/10/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Determination Hearing 07/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other Employment Filed |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Designation Requested | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jasmine Hopson |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|