Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK VS VASQUEZ
On December 30, 2015 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Collections
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Entered | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (Money) Entered |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (Money) | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Entered as to ALICIA VASQUEZ. Judgment Routed to Judge | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To ALICIA VASQUEZ Filed |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 08/15/2016 09:01 AM D- 14 | |
July 27, 2016 |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 14 date: 01/23/2017 time: 09:01 AM | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to ALICIA VASQUEZ Filed |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 08/15/2016 09:01 AM D- 14 |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 07/27/2016 09:00 AM D- 14 |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint - Collections Filed |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration PURSUANT TO CCP 395 (b) : VENUE OF PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS Filed |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for DISCOVER BANK |
|