Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Thomas VS Tucker
On August 19, 2014 a civil case was filed by Thomas, Gayle, against Tucker, Marissa, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Unlawful Detainer
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Duration
2 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed |
|
September 24, 2014 |
Demurrer to Complaint
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Demurrer to Complaint - Dropped |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Order on Fee Waiver Filed |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Marissa Tucker |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Marissa Tucker Granted | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Marissa Tucker | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 09/24/2014 01:30 PM D- 31 | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gayle Thomas |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|