Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vo VS FJM Truck Repair, Inc.
On August 12, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 12, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Auto Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 27 days
Time To Trial
4 months and 17 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/13/2016 09:30 AM D- 14 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Motion for Summary Judgment 12/29/2015 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 01/06/2016 03:00 PM D- 23 |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed for Thien Vo |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Motion to Amend 11/10/2015 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2016 02:00 PM D- 23 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 01/29/2016 09:00 AM D- 23 | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Filed for Plaintiff |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Hearing Confirmed for 11/10/2015 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
October 27, 2015 |
Order Shortening Time
Judge: Stephen Kaus |
||
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte 10/27/2015 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Thien Vo |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Shortening Time Reservation Set for dept: 23 date: 10/27/2015 time: 03:00 PM | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Motion |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for United Van Lines, LLC |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Confirmed for 12/29/2015 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
September 09, 2015 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Kaus |
||
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/13/2016 09:30 AM D- 14 | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of FJM Truck Repair, Inc., United Van Lines, LLC, Robert Eric Geipel, Sudd |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Thien Vo Filed |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Court File Transfer to Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/09/2015 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2016 02:00 PM D- 23 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 01/29/2016 09:00 AM D- 23 | |
December 29, 2014 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Kaus |
||
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2016 02:01 PM D- 23 | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial 01/29/2016 09:01 AM D- 23 | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/09/2015 03:01 PM D- 23 | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of FJM Truck Repair, Inc., United Van Lines, LLC, Robert Eric Geipel, Sudd |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Thien Vo Filed |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for United Van Lines, LLC, Suddath Relocation Systems of Northern Californ |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed |
|
November 13, 2014 |
Motion to Amend Complaint
Judge: Stephen Kaus |
||
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Granted |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | First Amended Complaint Filed |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Thien Vo |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 11/13/2014 03:00 PM D- 514 | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for FJM Truck Repair, Inc. |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Robert Eric Geipel |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to FJM Truck Repair, Inc. Filed |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to United Van Lines, LLC Filed |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Robert Eric Geipel Filed |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2014 03:00 PM D- 514 |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint - Auto Tort Filed (Amended) |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Thien Vo |
|