Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS COSBY
On August 05, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Collections
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
October 22, 2015 |
Limited Collections
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Default : Court Filed |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/22/2015 01:35 PM D- 14 | |
September 14, 2015 |
Limited Collections OSC 360 Day
Judge: Evelio Grillo |
||
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause Filed |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 10/21/2015 01:35 PM D- 14 | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Limited Collections Order |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 09/14/2015 09:01 AM D- 14 |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Default Entered as to RICHARD COSBY JR. Judgment Routed to Judge | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To RICHARD COSBY JR Filed |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to RICHARD COSBY JR Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint - Collections Filed |
|