Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: Kathryn Noland
On August 05, 2014 a civil case was filed by Noland, Kathryn Helene, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Jason J. Elter presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Change of Name
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Case Duration
3 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name
Judge: Jason Elter |
||
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing name Filed |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested Commenced and Completed |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Granted |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Stipulation for Court-Appointed Temp Judge Filed |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name Filed |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kathryn Helene Noland |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Uncontested 11/14/2014 08:45 AM D- 504 | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner |
|