Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Norsworthy VS Brodkey
On October 20, 2016 a civil case was filed by Norsworthy, Angela, against Brodkey, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Stephen F. Houghton presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Judge
Category
DV-100 Request for Order, Domestic Violence Prevention
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Duration
20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2016 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Stephen F Houghton |
||
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 11/09/2016 09:30 AM D- 512 | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing Denied | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Firearms Turned In or Sold Filed | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Filed for Jesse Brodkey | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 11/09/2016 09:30 AM D- 507 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (CLETS) on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Jesse Br | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 11/09/2016 09:30 AM D- 511 | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Angela Norsworthy |