Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Arzate Ruelas VS Arzate
On January 05, 2016 a civil case was filed by Arzate Ruelas, Salvador, against Arzate, Jahir, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Alison M. Tucher presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Sue Alexander;Category
DV-100 Request for Order, Domestic Violence Prevention
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 month and 0 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2016 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Alison Tucher |
||
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dismissed | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
January 22, 2016 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Sue Alexander |
||
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 02/05/2016 09:03 AM D- 507 | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Granted TRO Filed | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Salvador Arzate Ruelas | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 01/22/2016 09:03 AM D- 508 | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued |