Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ho VS Chan (DCSS)
On December 30, 2015 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2015
Last Refreshed
May 15, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Sue Alexander;Category
Dissolution of Marriage
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 |
Judge: Order to Show Cause re |
||
April 30, 2021 |
Order to Show Cause re
Judge: Somnath Raj Chatterjee |
||
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 503 date: 05/14/2021 time: 08:45 AM | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
April 30, 2021 |
Judge: Order to Show Cause re |
||
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Edward Ho | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 04/30/2021 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 04/12/2021 03:30 PM D- 503 | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of RE: Progress of Family Law Action Filed | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Ka Ying Chan Granted | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Ka Ying Chan | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Ka Ying Chan | |
January 12, 2016 |
Request for Order Family Law Hearing
Judge: Sue Alexander |
||
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 01/12/2016 09:00 AM D- 508 | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Ka Ying Chan Filed | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed |