Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jang VS Lee (Non-DCSS)
On August 05, 2014 a family law (statement for registration of...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
June 27, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Registration of California Support Order
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Case Duration
6 months and 7 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed Filing |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion for Modification Filed | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion for Modification Filed Filing |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed Hearing |
|
October 07, 2014 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 10/07/2014 09:00 AM D- 508 | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion for Modification Health Insurance Filed by Petitioner | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion for Modification Health Insurance Filed by Petitioner Filing |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC - Family Law 10/07/2014 09:00 AM D- 508 ScheduleHearing |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Statement for Registration of California Support Order Filed | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed Filing |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed Filing |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Statement for Registration of California Support Order Filed Filing |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |