Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ejaz VS Rahman (Non-DCSS)
On January 08, 2013 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Rebekah B. Evenson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2013
Last Refreshed
October 05, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 03/14/2022 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
October 04, 2021 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 10/04/2021 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Non-Jury Trial Commenced and Completed | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing Filed | |
May 27, 2021 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Rebekah Evenson |
||
May 27, 2021 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Rebekah Evenson |
||
May 27, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Order Filed | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
November 30, 2020 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Non-Jury Trial 05/27/2021 01:00 PM D- 522 | |
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Non-Jury Trial 11/30/2020 02:00 PM D- 522 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Non-Jury Trial 05/06/2020 02:00 PM D- 522 | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Non-Jury Trial 11/06/2019 02:00 PM D- 522 | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Non-Jury Trial 06/26/2019 02:00 PM D- 522 | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Non-Jury Trial 12/07/2018 02:00 PM D- 522 | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Non-Jury Trial Commenced and Completed | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Non-Jury Trial 07/13/2018 02:00 PM D- 522 | |
February 06, 2018 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Jennifer Madden |
||
February 06, 2018 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Jennifer Madden |
||
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Pretrial Order Filed | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 522 date: 09/21/2017 time: 01:30 PM | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Non-Jury Trial 02/06/2018 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Pretrial Order Filed | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
September 21, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
September 21, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
September 21, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
September 21, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 09/21/2017 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 522 date: 09/21/2017 time: 01:30 PM | |
July 03, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
July 03, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous sign in sheet Filed | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Memo to Case Filed | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 18, 2017 |
Settlement Conference - Family Law
Judge: Brenda Harbin-Forte |
||
May 18, 2017 |
Settlement Conference - Family Law
Judge: Brenda Harbin-Forte |
||
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference - Family Law 05/18/2017 02:00 PM D- 1A | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Visitation,.. Filed | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Mohammed Ejaz | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Dept. 1A Sign-In Sheet Filed | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Judge's Memo to Clerk Filed | |
April 13, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Brenda Harbin-Forte |
||
April 13, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Brenda Harbin-Forte |
||
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement of Mohammed Ejaz Filed | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service /Electronically of Petitioner's Settlement Conference Statement Filed | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Settlement Conference - Family Law 04/13/2017 02:00 PM D- 1A | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 07/03/2017 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Settlement Conference - Family Law 04/04/2017 02:00 PM D- 31 | |
March 22, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
March 22, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Separate Property Declaration Filed | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Settlement Conference - Family Law 04/10/2017 02:00 PM D- 31 | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 03/22/2017 09:00 AM D- 522 | |
February 22, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
February 22, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Settlement Conference - Family Law 04/04/2017 02:00 PM D- 31 | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 01/31/2017 09:00 AM D- 522 | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 522 date: 02/22/2017 time: 09:00 AM | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 522 date: 04/12/2017 time: 01:30 PM | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference - Family Law 04/04/2017 01:30 PM D- 1C | |
January 31, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
January 31, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
January 31, 2017 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
January 31, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Separate Property Declaration | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Questionnaire Filed by Mohammed Ejaz | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Status Conference Questionnaire Filed | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 01/31/2017 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
November 03, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
November 03, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Status Conference Qustionnaire Filed | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status Questionnaire of Mohammed Ejaz Filed | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
October 20, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
October 20, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 11/03/2016 01:30 PM D- 522 | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 522 date: 10/20/2016 time: 01:30 PM | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 522 date: 01/31/2017 time: 09:00 AM | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
July 13, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
July 13, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Other/Additional Orders Filed | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 522 date: 07/13/2016 time: 09:00 AM | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 07/13/2016 09:00 AM D- 522 | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued | |
May 24, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
May 24, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter re Finding and Order After Hearing from May 9, 2016 Filed | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Supplemental Points & Authorities ISO The Courts Jurisdiction to Enter Orders File | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Supplemental Points and Authorities ISO The Court's Jurisdiction To Enter Orders F | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Supplemental Polints of Authorties ISO The Courts Jurisdiction To Enter Ord | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Supplemental Points & Authorities ISO The Court's Jurisdiction To Enter Orders Pertain | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 522 date: 05/24/2016 time: 09:00 AM | |
May 09, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
May 09, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 522 date: 05/09/2016 time: 09:05 AM | |
April 11, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
April 11, 2016 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Court's Jurisdiction to Enter Orders Filed | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of MPA Re Court's Jurisdiction to Enter Orders Filed | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 04/11/2016 09:00 AM D- 522 | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Notice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes to Dept. 522 Filed | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Notice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes to Dept. 503 Filed | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 04/11/2016 09:05 AM D- 503 | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Neelofur Rahman Filed | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Continued Hearing Filed | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 04/05/2016 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Mohammed Ejaz | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Other/Additional Orders Filed | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Minutes | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of of Continued Hearing Filed | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 01/25/2016 10:00 AM D- 302 | |
November 17, 2015 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
November 17, 2015 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Continued Hearing Filed | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of of Continued Hearing Filed | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 11/17/2015 10:00 AM D- 302 | |
August 17, 2015 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
August 17, 2015 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail OAH Filed | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Re: FOAH Filed | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 08/17/2015 10:00 AM D- 302 | |
July 02, 2015 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
July 02, 2015 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 07/02/2015 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
June 19, 2015 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
June 19, 2015 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 06/19/2015 10:00 AM D- 302 | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 06, 2015 |
Request for Order Family Law Hearing
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
May 06, 2015 |
Request for Order Family Law Hearing
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 302 date: 05/06/2015 time: 09:00 AM | |
January 15, 2015 |
Request for Order Family Law Hearing
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
January 15, 2015 |
Request for Order Family Law Hearing
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail re: FOAH Filed | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Neelofur Rahman | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
November 16, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 01/15/2015 time: 09:05 AM | |
November 16, 2014 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 01/15/2015 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 302 date: 01/15/2015 time: 09:05 AM | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
October 02, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Modification
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
October 02, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Modification
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
October 02, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
October 02, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous -Respondent's Case Update Filed | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Granted | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 10/02/2014 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 302 date: 10/02/2014 time: 09:05 AM | |
September 02, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
September 02, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Granted | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Neelofur Rahman | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Mohammed Ejaz | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Filed | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 302 date: 10/02/2014 time: 09:05 AM | |
June 27, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Modification
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
June 27, 2014 |
Order to Show Cause re Modification
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Telephone Standby Granted | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Request for Order Filed | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Supplemental Attachments ti Request for Order Filed | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 06/27/2014 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting OST/Partly Granting Temporary Orders Filed | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Modification Child Custody,.. Filed by Respondent | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration re Notice Upon Exparte Application for Orders Filed by Neelofur Rahman | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 302 date: 09/02/2014 time: 09:05 AM | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 20, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
May 20, 2014 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
May 20, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
May 20, 2014 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Tara M. Flanagan |
||
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting Application And Order To Appear By Telephone Filed | |
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 05/20/2014 09:05 AM D- 303 | |
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 02/21/2014 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 05/20/2014 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 05/20/2014 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting OST Filed | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration re Notice Upon Exparte Application for Orders Filed by Neelofur Rahman | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Visitation,.. Filed by Respondent | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Case Update Filed | |
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Proposed Order | |
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Denying Finding And Order After Hearing Filed | |
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Denying Findings And Order After Hearing Filed | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
January 02, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
January 02, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Response of Employee Benefit Plan Filed for Sutter Health | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 302 date: 01/02/2014 time: 09:05 AM | |
December 05, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
December 05, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Long-Cause Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 12/05/2013 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 08/05/2014 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
November 26, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
November 26, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan Filed | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan and Order Filed | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Respondent's Case Update Filed | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting application to appear by telephone Filed | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Filed | |
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Long-Cause Hearing Commenced and Continued | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Long-Cause Hearing dept: 302 date: 11/26/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
August 29, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
August 29, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting application to appear by telephone Filed | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Request/Application to Appear by Telephone Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: to Appeary by Telephone | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Long-Cause Hearing dept: 302 date: 08/29/2013 time: 02:00 PM | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Long-Cause Hearing Commenced and Continued | |
August 22, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
August 22, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting Telephone Appearance Filed | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting Telephone Appearance Filed | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 08/08/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Petitioner's Witness List Filed | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Statement Of Issues Filed | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Filed | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Long-Cause Hearing Commenced and Continued | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Long-Cause Hearing dept: 302 date: 08/22/2013 time: 02:00 PM | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Filed | |
July 30, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
July 30, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration of Counsel For A Child Regarding Quallifications Filed | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Counsel For A Child Filed | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Support Filed | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 07/25/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting Application and Order To Appear By Telephone Filed | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
July 11, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
July 11, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: to Appear by Telephone | |
July 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Dissomaster Report Filed | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Long-Cause Hearing 07/30/2013 02:00 PM D- 302 | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Re: Pretrial Filed | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 302 date: 07/11/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
June 27, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
June 27, 2013 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by mail on Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting application to appear by telephone Filed | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Granted | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 06/27/2013 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous DissoMaster Report Filed | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
June 06, 2013 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
June 06, 2013 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Court File Transfer to George E. McDonald Hall of Justice | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 08/08/2013 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Continuance Filed | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Reissuance of Order to Show Cause Filed for Respondent | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 07/25/2013 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Support,.. Filed by Respondent | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration re: Notice of Motion for Modification Filed | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Re: Income & Expense Filed | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Granted | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Continuance Filed | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Initial Family Law Status Conference 06/27/2013 09:01 AM D- 302 | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference Filed for Neelofur Rahman | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 06/06/2013 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Order for Reassignment Filed | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Initial Family Law Status Conference 06/18/2013 09:01 AM D- 302 | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Neelofur Rahman Granted | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Neelofur Rahman | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Alice Vilardi Filed for Neelofur Rahman | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Neelofur Rahman | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Alice Vilardi Granted | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Neelofur Rahman Filed | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Questionnaire Filed by Mohammed Ejaz | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Confirmed for dept: 503 date: 05/29/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion for Modification Child Custody,.. Filed by Petitioner | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Reservation Set for dept: 503 date: 03/15/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference 05/09/2013 10:30 AM D- 503 | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed |