Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YUNXIA LIU VS STEPHEN EARL WALKER
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Liu Yunxia, against Walker Stephen Earl, represented by Champon Into Bo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mary Thornton House presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 08, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
1 year and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (AND FINAL - On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (Dissolution - On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (AND FINAL - On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (Dissolution - On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-28-16 ) | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-28-16 ) | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walker, Stephen - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-22 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Pasadena Dept. - 300, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: House Mary Thornton |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Pasadena Dept. - 300, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Mary Thornton |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- Hearing Set on 2015-12-16 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- Hearing Set on 2015-12-16 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons - Amended (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Amended (1st) (Summons Issued - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Amended (1st) (Summons Issued - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons - Amended (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Liu, Yunxia ) Filed by Petitioner |