Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALINE HERNANDEZ VS LOUIS HERNANDEZ
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Hernandez Aline, against Hernandez Louis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 3 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline - Signed on 2017-01-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-22-16 ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- Filed By: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- Filed By: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- Filed By: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- Notice to:: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline, Mailed on 05-06-16 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-12-16 ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Hearing Off Calendar. POS Filed On 09-18-2015 - Hearing Set on 2015-12-16 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
May 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hernandez, Aline ) Filed by Petitioner |