Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TUDSANEE PATSRIVONG VS PUNYA KOMOLNILA
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Patsrivong Tudsanee, against Komolnila Punya, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
7 months and 0 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 3 Completed/No Disposition (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request (for Copies ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- Notice to:: Respondent: Komolnila, Punya, Mailed: 09-23-15 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Request | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- Notice to:: Respondent: Komolnila, Punya, Mailed: 09-23-15 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 3 Completed/No Disposition (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final Declaration - Filed By: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final Declaration - Filed By: Respondent: Komolnila, Punya ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Hearing set off calendar. POS file d on 09-04-15. - Hearing Set on 2015-12-16 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Hearing set off calendar. POS file d on 09-04-15. - Hearing Set on 2015-12-16 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) PROCEEDINGS HELD | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Patsrivong, Tudsanee ) Filed by Petitioner |