Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TINA KRANTZ VS. ROSEMARY ROSS BARBUS
On December 05, 2006 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge C. EDWARD SIMPSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Pasadena Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior) - |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (With prejudice complt ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department R, C. EDWARD SIMPSON, Presiding Post Mediation Status Conference - Trial and MSC Set Judge: C. EDWARD SIMPSON |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department R Post-Mediation Status Conference (Post Mediation Status Conference; Trial and MSC Set) - |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE PMSC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department R, C. EDWARD SIMPSON, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Status Conference Held Judge: C. EDWARD SIMPSON |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department R Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Status Conference Held) - |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Rosemary Ross Barbus an individual (Defendant); MUNEMURA, MARSHA LAW OFFICES OF (Legacy Party) |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Rosemary Ross Barbus an individual (Defendant); MUNEMURA, MARSHA LAW OFFICES OF (Legacy Party) |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Rosemary Ross Barbus an individual (Defendant) |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement of Damages Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Tina Krantz an individual (Plaintiff) |