Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOSE A. GUZMAN VS PATRICIA D. RODRIGUEZ DE GUZMAN
A Dissolution With Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. Judge Wendy McGuire Coats presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 22, 2018
Last Refreshed
December 16, 2021
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Joni T. Hiramoto;Category
Dissolution With Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 32 TO 17. Not Applicable Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
5F18F4 CALENDARED ON 12/19/19 IN DEPT. 32. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/19/19 IN DEPT. 17. Not Applicable |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
5F5YF4 CALENDARED ON 06/21/23 IN DEPT. 32. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 06/21/23 IN DEPT. 17. Not Applicable |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
5F12F4 CALENDARED ON 06/24/19 IN DEPT. 32. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 06/24/19 IN DEPT. 17. Not Applicable |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF PATRICIA D RODRIGUEZ DE GUZMAN FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/19/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/20/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/19/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 6/21/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/24/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. Summons IS ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): PURPLE Not Applicable |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
(FAMILY LAW) Summons ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/22/2018 OF JOSE GUZMAN FILED Not Applicable |