Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRANDI WALDECKER VS. ERIC VEIRS
A Domestic Violence Without Children case was filed in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2007
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Category
Domestic Violence Without Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY BRANDI WALDECKER - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. EXPIRES ON 02/03/14; PROTECTED PARTY IS BRANDI WALDECKER Not Applicable |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY ERIC M. VEIRS Not Applicable |
|
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
(F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 07/31/2007 OF BRANDI WALDECKER AS TO ERIC M. VEIRS (SERVED ON 01/15/09) Not Applicable |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ORDER (SUB D.V.) FILED BY BRANDI WALDECKER AGAINST ERIC M. VEIRS Not Applicable |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 2/04/09 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. PITT | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BRANDI WALDECKER Not Applicable |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY ERICM VEIRS - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ORDER (SUBSEQUENT) BY ERIC M. VEIRS FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 8/08/08 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 54 | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ERIC VEIRS Not Applicable |
|
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY BRANDI WALDECKER - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 8/24/07 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 54 | |
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST AND ORDER FOR FREE SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER Not Applicable |