Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
County of Fresno vs Felipe O Balero
A Dcss Family Support case was filed in the jurisdiction of Merced County. Judge Gerald W. Corman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 25, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Merced County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Mccabe, Brian;Category
DCSS Family Support
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
11 months and 2 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential Historical Documents | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Registration Foreign Support Order | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Request | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Orientation | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice: Support Payment | |
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint: Supplemental | |
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Registration Foreign Support Order |