Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GUARDIANSHIP OF REBEKAH QUALLS-NEAL
A Guardianship Of Minor - Person Only case was filed in the jurisdiction of Butte County. Judge Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 07, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Butte County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David E Gunn;Category
Guardianship of Minor - Person Only
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 22 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW REPORT & ORDER HON. STEPHEN E\. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW HEARING Desc2: 07/09/14 Notice Date: 2013-08-13 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 399 - GUARDIANSHIP CONTINUES; NO REVIEW SET Disp Clerk: JDW Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW HEARING 07/09/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR, PERSON ONLY Desc2: FILED: 06/07/13 Desc3: *CONT FOR CSD REPORT* Disp Code: 125 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP ISSUED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY GUARDIAN HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued - Temporary LETTERS OF TEMP GUARDIANSHIP OF MINOR ISSUED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR, PERSON ONLY Desc2: FILED: 06/07/13 Disp Code: 905 - CONTINUED TO 07/31/13 Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FLD CSD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service NOTICE OF HEARING W/ PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETN FOR GUARDIANSHIP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF MINOR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | INVESTIGATOR'S INFORMATION SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | CONSENT OF PROPOSED GUARDIAN; NOMINATION OF GUARDIAN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decl Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act (UCCJEA) DECL UNDER UNIFORM C/C JURIS ACT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR, PERSON ONLY Desc2: *TEMPORARY* FILED 6/7/13 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT 6/26/13 TEMPS SIGNED Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conditional Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY GUARDIAN HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment - Temporary Conservator or Guardian PETN FOR APPT OF TEMP GUARDIAN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF [P] [X]RE NTC OF EXPARTE APP FOR ORDERS (RULE16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Duties and Liabilities of Conservator or Guardian DUTIES OF GUARDIAN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition for Guardianship-Person Only PETN FOR APPT OF GUARDIAN (PERSON ONLY) CK#5754 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 837546 Fee Amount: 225.00 Entry Clerk: JDW 549 - $225.00 |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued - Temporary LETTERS OF TEMP GUARDIANSHIP OF MINOR ISSUED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |